Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06105 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/27/2021

                        
 
LCO No. 1733  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6105  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 1733 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PD)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING AC CESS TO ORIGINAL BIRTH 
CERTIFICATES BY ADUL T ADOPTED PERSONS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (c) of section 7-53 of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2 
2021): 3 
(c) Upon written request, the [department shall] registrar of vital 4 
statistics of the municipality of an adopted person's birth shall, not later 5 
than thirty days after such written request, issue an uncertified copy of 6 
an original certificate of birth to (1) [an] such adopted person [who] if 7 
he or she is eighteen years of age or older, [whose adoption was 8 
finalized on or after October 1, 1983,] or (2) such adopted person's adult 9 
child or grandchild. Such certificate shall be marked with a notation by 10 
the issuer that such original certificate of birth has been superseded by 11 
a replacement certificate of birth as on file. Additionally, a notice stating 12 
that information related to the birth parents' preferences regarding 13 
contact by such adopted person or such adopted person's adult child or 14 
grandchild and a medical health history form completed by the birth 15  Raised Bill No.  6105 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1733   	2 of 4 
 
parent may be on file with the Department of Children and Families 16 
shall be printed on such certificate or attached thereto. 17 
Sec. 2. Section 7-53a of the general statutes is repealed and the 18 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021): 19 
[(a) Not later than January 1, 2016, and annually thereafter until 20 
January 1, 2021, the Commissioner of Public Health shall submit a 21 
report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, concerning 22 
the number of original birth certificates issued annually to adopted 23 
persons eighteen years of age or older whose adoption was finalized on 24 
or after October 1, 1983, or the adult children or grandchildren of 25 
adopted persons in accordance with section 7-53, to the joint standing 26 
committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 27 
relating to public health.] 28 
[(b)] Not later than January 1, [2016] 2022, and annually thereafter 29 
until January 1, [2021] 2027, the Commissioner of Children and Families 30 
shall submit a report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, 31 
concerning the number of contact preference forms and medical health 32 
history forms annually filed with the [department] Department of 33 
Children and Families in accordance with section 17a-60a to the joint 34 
standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of 35 
matters relating to public health. The report shall include the number of 36 
birth parents that selected each option described in section 17a-60a.  37 
Sec. 3. Subsection (c) of section 45a-751b of the general statutes is 38 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 39 
2021): 40 
(c) Regardless of the date parental rights were terminated, on or after 41 
July 1, [2015, the Department of Public Health shall, upon] 2021, the 42 
registrar of vital statistics of the municipality of an adopted person's 43 
birth shall, not later than thirty days after a written request, issue an 44 
uncertified copy of an original birth certificate to [an] such adopted 45 
person if he or she is eighteen years of age or older [who is] and the 46 
subject of [the] such birth certificate, [and whose adoption was finalized 47  Raised Bill No.  6105 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1733   	3 of 4 
 
on or after October 1, 1983,] or to such adopted person's adult child or 48 
grandchild, in accordance with the provisions of section 7-53, as 49 
amended by this act. 50 
Sec. 4. Section 45a-751c of the general statutes is repealed and the 51 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021, and 52 
applicable to petitions filed on and after July 1, 2020): 53 
[(a) On the petition of an adopted person who is eighteen years of age 54 
or older and whose adoption was finalized prior to October 1, 1983, or 55 
such adopted person's adult child or grandchild, the Probate Court or 56 
the Superior Court that finalized an adoption or appointed a guardian 57 
ad litem in accordance with section 45a-753 shall issue an order 58 
directing the Department of Public Health to issue an uncertified copy 59 
of an original birth certificate to such adopted person or such adopted 60 
person's child or grandchild in accordance with subsection (b) of section 61 
7-53, provided each birth parent named on the original birth certificate: 62 
(1) Consents to the release of identifying information in accordance with 63 
sections 45a-751 to 45a-751b, inclusive; (2) is deceased; or (3) a legal 64 
representative or guardian ad litem consents to the release of identifying 65 
information on behalf of the birth parent in accordance with section 45a-66 
753. Nothing in this section shall limit the right of an adopted person 67 
eighteen years of age or older whose adoption was finalized on or after 68 
October 1, 1983, or such adopted person's adult child or grandchild to 69 
obtain an uncertified copy of an original birth certificate pursuant to 70 
section 7-53.] 71 
[(b)] On the petition of an authorized applicant, as defined in section 72 
45a-743, the Probate Court or the Superior Court that finalized an 73 
adoption or appointed a guardian ad litem in accordance with section 74 
45a-753 shall issue an order directing the Department of Public Health 75 
to issue an uncertified copy of an original birth certificate to the 76 
authorized applicant in accordance with subsection (b) of section 7-53, 77 
provided the person named in the certificate of birth is deceased and (1) 78 
each birth parent named on the original birth certificate [: (1) Consents] 79 
(A) consents to the release of identifying information, in accordance 80  Raised Bill No.  6105 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1733   	4 of 4 
 
with sections 45a-751 to 45a-751b, inclusive, as amended by this act, [; 81 
(2) is deceased; or (3)] or (B) is deceased, or (2) a legal representative or 82 
guardian ad litem consents to the release of identifying information on 83 
behalf of the birth parent, in accordance with section 45a-753.  84 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 7-53(c) 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 7-53a 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2021 45a-751b(c) 
Sec. 4 July 1, 2021, and 
applicable to petitions filed 
on and after July 1, 2020 
45a-751c 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To grant access to original birth records to all adopted persons eighteen 
years of age or older who were born in Connecticut regardless of date 
of birth. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]