Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06105 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/16/2021

                     
Researcher: JO 	Page 1 	3/16/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6105  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ACCESS TO ORIGINAL BIRTH 
CERTIFICATES BY ADULT ADOPTED PERSONS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill expands access to birth certificates for adopted persons age 
18 and older and their adult children or grandchildren. It allows them 
to obtain an uncertified copy of the adoptee’s original birth certificate 
upon request. Current law provides this access only for adoptions 
finalized on or after October 1, 1983.  
For adoptions before that date, current law allows access to the 
original certificate by these individuals only through a court order. If 
the birth parents are alive, the court may issue the order only with 
their consent, or in certain circumstances, the consent of a legal 
representative or guardian ad litem.  
The bill also transfers, from the Department of Public Health (DPH) 
to municipalities, the responsibility to issue the original birth 
certificates upon an eligible individual’s request. Specifically, it 
requires the registrar of vital statistics in the municipality of the 
adopted individual’s birth to issue the uncertified copy of the 
certificate to the adoptee age 18 or older or his or her adult child or 
grandchild. The registrar must do so within 30 days after a written 
request by these individuals. Current law does not set a timeframe for 
DPH to issue these birth certificates.     
Additionally, the bill extends to January 1, 2027, the requirement for 
the Department of Children and Families (DCF) to report annually to 
the Public Health Committee on the number of birth parent contact 
preference and health history forms filed with DCF (see 
BACKGROUND). Under current law, this requirement expired on 
January 1, 2021.  2021HB-06105-R000049-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JO 	Page 2 	3/16/21 
 
The bill also makes conforming and technical changes, including 
eliminating an expired requirement for DPH to annually report on the 
number of adult adoptee birth certificates issued each year. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021, and conforming changes on court 
petitions apply to petitions filed on and after July 1, 2020. 
BACKGROUND 
Adoptee Birth Certificates 
In most cases, DPH seals the original birth certificate when a court 
notifies it that a child born in Connecticut has been adopted. It 
prepares a new certificate substituting the adoptive parents’ names for 
those appearing on the original certificate (CGS § 7-53). 
Contact Preference and Health History Forms 
By law, a biological parent may complete a DCF form indicating 
whether the parent wants to be contacted by his or her adopted adult 
child or the adoptee’s adult children or grandchildren. When receiving 
a request for a contact preference form, DCF must also provide the 
parent with a form on which to record his or her health history 
information (CGS § 17a-60a). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Planning and Development Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 26 Nay 0 (03/02/2021)