Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06344 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/25/2021

                     
Researcher: LRH 	Page 1 	5/25/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6344 (as amended by House "A")*  
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING THE OFFICE OF THE UNEMPLOYED 
WORKERS' ADVOCATE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the labor commissioner, within available 
appropriations, to establish the Office of the Unemployed Workers’ 
Advocate within the Department of Labor (DOL) to assist unemployed 
people. 
The bill requires the commissioner, by October 1, 2021, to designate 
an “unemployed workers’ advocate,” who serves at the pleasure of the 
commissioner, to manage the office’s daily activities and duties. The 
advocate must have the qualifications needed to perform the office’s 
duties, including expertise in unemployment benefits and advocacy 
for unemployed people’s rights. The advocate must, within available 
appropriations, appoint and employ the assistants, employees, and 
personnel needed to effectively and efficiently administer the office’s 
activities.  
*House Amendment “A” requires that the unemployed workers’ 
advocate be designated by October 1, 2021, rather than by July 1, 2021.  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage 
OFFICE POWERS 
The bill allows the Office of the Unemployed Workers’ Advocate to: 
1. help unemployed people seeking unemployment benefits; 
2. help unemployed people understand their rights and 
responsibilities related to unemployment benefits; 
3. provide information to the public, agencies, legislators, and 
others about unemployed people’s problems and concerns, and  2021HB-06344-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: LRH 	Page 2 	5/25/21 
 
make recommendations for resolving them; 
4. help unemployed people file unemployment benefit appeals; 
5. analyze and monitor the development and implementation of 
federal, state, and local laws, regulations, and policies related to 
unemployed people, and recommend changes the office deems 
necessary to the appropriate governmental entity; 
6. receive and review unemployed people’s complaints and make 
recommendations to the labor commissioner for resolving them; 
7. access an unemployed person’s prior employment records to 
the extent that state and federal law allows; 
8. establish and maintain an Internet website and a toll-free 
number, or any other free calling option, that allows 
unemployed people to access the office’s services and 
information; and 
9. take any other actions needed to fulfill the bill’s purposes.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Labor and Public Employees Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 9 Nay 4 (03/25/2021) 
 
Appropriations Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 48 Nay 0 (05/03/2021)