Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06394 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/18/2021

                     
Researcher: GM 	Page 1 	3/18/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6394  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING INTEREST ON LOTTERY SALES AGENT 
DELINQUENCY ASSESSMENTS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires that the interest charged on lottery sales agents’ 
(i.e., licensed lottery ticket retailers’) delinquency assessments be 
calculated using simple rather than compound interest, which is the 
current practice (see BACKGROUND) . By law, delinquency 
assessments are equal to 10% of the amount due or $10, whichever is 
greater, plus interest at a rate of 1.5% per month or part of a month 
that elapses between the due date and payment date.  
For delinquency assessments outstanding on June 30, 2021, the bill 
allows sales agents to request a hardship waiver from the Department 
of Consumer Protection (DCP) commissioner to reduce what is owed, 
by recalculating the interest owed using simple interest. Sales agents 
can apply beginning July 1, 2021. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021  
BACKGROUND 
Current Practice Regarding Interest Charged 
A May 5, 2010, declaratory ruling interpreting CGS § 12-569 issued 
by the executive director for the former Division of Special Revenue 
held that the statute supports imposing delinquency assessments using 
compound interest calculations. (PA 11-51 eliminated the division and 
transferred its responsibilities to DCP.) DCP currently uses compound 
interest calculations on delinquency assessments. 
Delinquency Assessments 
By law, lottery sales agents are delinquent when they fail to remit 
money due from their lottery ticket sales by the settlement dates  2021HB-06394-R000084-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 2 	3/18/21 
 
established by the Connecticut Lottery Corporation (CLC). The CLC 
president is responsible for making delinquency determinations and 
notifying the DCP commissioner, who in turn must impose the 
delinquency assessments (CGS § 12-569; Conn. Agencies Regs. §§ 12-
568a-1 and -13). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Safety and Security Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 23 Nay 0 (03/04/2021)