Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06412 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/08/2021

                     
Researcher: MF 	Page 1 	6/8/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6412 (File 54, as amended by House "A")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING A LOW -CARBON FUEL BLEND OF 
HEATING OIL AND THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A BIOHEAT 
ADVISORY BOARD.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires heating oil sold in the state to be a low-carbon fuel 
blend with a specified percentage of biodiesel that increases over time, 
beginning July 1, 2022. The bill sets the minimum amount of biodiesel 
in heating oil at 5% in 2022 and increases it on a schedule to 50% in 
2035. These requirements replace a similar provision in current law 
that requires an increasing proportion of biodiesel in heating oil, but 
only if surrounding states adopt a similar requirement, a condition that 
was never met. 
The bill allows the Department of Energy and Environmental 
Protection (DEEP) commissioner to temporarily waive the blending 
requirements if she determines that they, at any time, (1) are not 
feasible due to a lack of adequate biodiesel supply or (2) would result 
in a financial hardship to consumers.  
Under the bill, low-carbon fuel blended with heating oil must be 
produced in accordance with industry-accepted quality control 
standards. The bill requires low-carbon fuel marketers and producers 
to provide a certificate of analysis before blending low-carbon fuel 
with heating oil. The certificate must verify conformity with critical 
specifications of designation D6751 of ASTM International or another 
applicable ASTM specification for low-carbon fuel blends (see 
BACKGROUND).  
The bill allows the DEEP commissioner to adopt regulations, by July 
1, 2022, on disclosure requirements for heating oil retailers regarding 
the percentage or approximate range of low-carbon fuel blend 
contained in the home heating oil delivered to consumers. The bill also  2021HB-06412-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 2 	6/8/21 
 
requires DEEP’s Comprehensive Energy Strategy (CES) to consider 
several factors related to low-carbon fuel blends for heating oil and 
effects on greenhouse gas emissions, beginning with the next CES 
approved after October 1, 2021. 
The bill eliminates the Distillate Advisory Board, which, under 
current law, is a six-member board within the Department of 
Consumer Protection (DCP). Under current law, if biodiesel blending 
requirements take effect, the board is tasked with advising the DCP 
commissioner on related issues, receiving petitions to waive biodiesel 
blending requirements in certain circumstances, and annually 
reporting to the Energy and Technology and Environment committees 
on related issues.  
*House Amendment “A” replaces the underlying bill, which 
included the same schedule for biodiesel blending but retained the 
Distillate Advisory Board (renamed as the “Bioheat Advisory Board”) 
and related provisions on DCP’s administration of the requirements. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021 
BIODIESEL REQUIREMEN T SCHEDULE 
Under the bill, minimum biodiesel percentage requirements take 
effect on the following schedule, each July 1: 
1. 5% in 2022, 
2. 10% in 2025, 
3. 15% in 2030, 
4. 20% in 2034, and 
5. 50% in 2035. 
Under the bill, heating oil meeting these requirements is a low-
carbon fuel blend, meaning a fuel meeting the standards for advanced 
biofuels under the federal Renewable Fuel Standard Program, 
requiring a 50% reduction in lifecycle greenhouse gas emissions,  2021HB-06412-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 3 	6/8/21 
 
including qualifying biodiesel meeting the most recent version of 
ASTM International designation D6751 (see BACKGROUND). 
COMPREHENSIVE ENERGY STRATEGY (CES) 
Beginning with the next CES approved after October 1, 2021, the bill 
requires DEEP’s CES to consider the following: 
1. the reduction in greenhouse gas emissions resulting from low-
carbon fuel blends used in home heating oil on a life-cycle basis 
and its possible contributions to the state’s greenhouse gas 
emissions mandated levels; 
2. the ability of a thermal portfolio standard to further emission 
reductions on a lifecycle basis; 
3. the relative value of the life-cycle emissions reductions achieved 
by biodiesel and other low-carbon blends used currently in the 
state compared to the value of future projected life-cycle 
emissions reductions achieved by the retail heating oil industry 
five, 10, and 20 years into the future using DEEP’s 
contemporaneous projection of renewable energy utilized.  
By law, the CES is required every four years and must be submitted 
to the Energy and Technology Committee. 
BACKGROUND 
Federal Renewable Fuel Standard Program 
The federal Renewable Fuel Standard program is a national policy 
that requires a certain volume of renewable fuel to replace or reduce 
the quantity of petroleum-based transportation fuel, heating oil, or jet 
fuel. The program designates four renewable fuel categories, including 
“advanced biofuels,” which are renewable fuels, other than ethanol 
derived from cornstarch, that have lifecycle greenhouse gas emissions 
that are 50% less than a 2005 petroleum baseline (40 CFR § 80.1401). 
Advanced biofuels include fuels derived from soybean oil, distillers 
corn oil and sorghum, and oil from annual cover crops.  
ASTM International Designation D6751  2021HB-06412-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 4 	6/8/21 
 
ASTM International (formerly known as the American Society for 
Testing and Materials) is a standards development organization. 
Designation D6751 covers biodiesel fuel blend stock for use as a blend 
component with certain distillate fuels. The specification generally 
prescribes the fuel’s required properties at the time and place of 
delivery.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Energy and Technology Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 25 Nay 1 (03/02/2021) 
 
Appropriations Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 37 Nay 11 (05/03/2021)