Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06435 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/09/2021

                        
 
LCO No. 2766  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6435  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 2766 
 
 
Referred to Committee on COMMERCE  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(CE)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT EXTENDING THE MANUFACTURING APPRE NTICESHIP TAX 
CREDIT TO PASS-THROUGH ENTITIES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 12-217g of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021, and 2 
applicable to income or taxable years commencing on or after January 1, 2021): 3 
(a) (1) There shall be allowed a credit for any taxpayer against the tax 4 
imposed under this chapter, chapter 228z or chapter 229, other than the 5 
liability imposed by section 12-707, for any income or taxable year with 6 
respect to each apprenticeship in the manufacturing trades commenced 7 
by such taxpayer in such year under a qualified apprenticeship training 8 
program as described in subsection (d) of this section, certified in 9 
accordance with regulations adopted in accordance with the provisions 10 
of chapter 54 by the Labor Commissioner and registered with the 11 
Connecticut State Apprenticeship Council established under section 31-12 
22n, in an amount equal to six dollars per hour multiplied by the total 13 
number of hours worked during the income or taxable year by 14 
apprentices in the first half of a two-year term of apprenticeship and the 15  Raised Bill No.  6435 
 
 
 
LCO No. 2766   	2 of 4 
 
first three-quarters of a four-year term of apprenticeship, provided the 16 
amount of credit allowed for any income or taxable year with respect to 17 
each such apprenticeship may not exceed seven thousand five hundred 18 
dollars or fifty per cent of actual wages paid in such [income] year to an 19 
apprentice in the first half of a two-year term of apprenticeship or in the 20 
first three-quarters of a four-year term of apprenticeship, whichever is 21 
less. [(2) Effective for] For income or taxable years commencing on [and] 22 
or after January 1, 2015, for purposes of this subsection, "taxpayer" 23 
includes an affected business entity, as defined in section 12-284b. [Any]  24 
(2) (A) For taxable years commencing on or after January 1, 2015, but 25 
prior to January 1 2021, any affected business entity allowed a credit 26 
under this subsection may sell, assign or otherwise transfer such credit, 27 
in whole or in part, to one or more taxpayers to offset any state tax due 28 
or otherwise payable by such taxpayers under this chapter, or, with 29 
respect to [income] taxable years commencing on or after January 1, 30 
2016, but prior to January 1, 2021, chapter 212 or 227, provided such 31 
credit may be sold, assigned or otherwise transferred, in whole or in 32 
part, not more than three times. 33 
(B) For taxable years commencing on or after January 1, 2021, (i) if a 34 
taxpayer is an S corporation or an entity that is treated as a partnership 35 
for federal income tax purposes, the shareholders or partners of such 36 
taxpayer may claim the credit under this subsection, and (ii) if a 37 
taxpayer is a single member limited liability company that is 38 
disregarded as an entity separate from its owner, the limited liability 39 
company's owner may claim the credit under this subsection. 40 
(b) There shall be allowed a credit for any taxpayer against the tax 41 
imposed under this chapter for any income year with respect to each 42 
apprenticeship in plastics and plastics-related trades commenced by 43 
such taxpayer in such year under a qualified apprenticeship training 44 
program as described in subsection (d) of this section, certified in 45 
accordance with regulations adopted in accordance with the provisions 46 
of chapter 54 by the Labor Commissioner and registered with the 47 
Connecticut State Apprenticeship Council established under section 31-48  Raised Bill No.  6435 
 
 
 
LCO No. 2766   	3 of 4 
 
22n, which apprenticeship exceeds the average number of such 49 
apprenticeships begun by such taxpayer during the five income years 50 
immediately preceding the income year with respect to which such 51 
credit is allowed, in an amount equal to four dollars per hour multiplied 52 
by the total number of hours worked during the income year by 53 
apprentices in the first half of a two-year term of apprenticeship and the 54 
first three-quarters of a four-year term of apprenticeship, provided the 55 
amount of credit allowed for any income year with respect to each such 56 
apprenticeship may not exceed four thousand eight hundred dollars or 57 
fifty per cent of actual wages paid in such income year to an apprentice 58 
in the first half of a two-year term of apprenticeship or in the first three-59 
quarters of a four-year term of apprenticeship, whichever is less. 60 
(c) There shall be allowed a credit for any taxpayer against the tax 61 
imposed under this chapter for any income year with respect to wages 62 
paid to apprentices in the construction trades by such taxpayer in such 63 
year that the apprentice and taxpayer participate in a qualified 64 
apprenticeship training program, as described in subsection (d) of this 65 
section, which (1) is at least four years in duration, (2) is certified in 66 
accordance with regulations adopted in accordance with the provisions 67 
of chapter 54 by the Labor Commissioner, and (3) is registered with the 68 
Connecticut State Apprenticeship Council established under section 31-69 
22n. The tax credit shall be (A) in an amount equal to two dollars per 70 
hour multiplied by the total number of hours completed by each 71 
apprentice toward completion of such program, and (B) awarded upon 72 
completion and notification of completion of such program in the 73 
income year in which such completion and notification occur, provided 74 
the amount of credit allowed for such income year with respect to each 75 
such apprentice may not exceed four thousand dollars or fifty per cent 76 
of actual wages paid over the first four income years for such 77 
apprenticeship, whichever is less. 78 
(d) For purposes of this section, a qualified apprenticeship training 79 
program shall require at least four thousand but not more than eight 80 
thousand hours of apprenticeship training for certification of such 81 
apprenticeship by the Connecticut State Apprenticeship Council. The 82  Raised Bill No.  6435 
 
 
 
LCO No. 2766   	4 of 4 
 
amount of credit allowed any taxpayer under this section for any 83 
income or taxable year may not exceed the amount of tax due from such 84 
taxpayer under this chapter, chapter 228z or chapter 229, with respect to 85 
such income or taxable year.  86 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021, and 
applicable to income or 
taxable years commencing 
on or after January 1, 2021 
12-217g 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To allow pass-through entities to claim the manufacturing 
apprenticeship tax credit against the personal income tax or the affected 
business entity tax. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]