Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06449 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/30/2021

                     
Researcher: JO 	Page 1 	3/30/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6449  
 
AN ACT EXPANDING ECONOMIC OPPORTUNITY IN 
OCCUPATIONS LICENSED BY THE DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC 
HEALTH.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill generally makes it easier for health care professionals 
licensed in other states to obtain a Connecticut credential if they reside 
here. It does so by generally requiring the Department of Public Health 
(DPH) to issue the appropriate license or other credential to a state 
resident, or a spouse of an active duty service member permanently 
stationed here, if that person meets specified requirements (e.g., has 
practiced under a valid credential in another jurisdiction for at least a 
year and has no disciplinary history). It allows DPH to (1) require 
these applicants to pass examinations required of other applicants and 
(2) deny a credential if the commissioner finds it to be in the state’s 
best interest. 
The bill requires the DPH commissioner to (1) convene working 
groups to determine whether Connecticut should join any interstate 
licensure compacts and (2) report to the Public Health Committee on 
the groups’ recommendations by January 15, 2022.  
Finally, the bill requires the DPH commissioner to report on 
whether it would be in the state’s best interest to (1) replace any state 
exams for certain credentialed professionals with tests by national 
organizations that DPH deems acceptable and (2) reduce any 
experience and training requirements while increasing testing of 
applicants’ knowledge or skills. Generally, this provision applies to 
DPH-credentialed professionals and other specified professionals 
credentialed by certain other agencies (principally, the Department of 
Consumer Protection). She must report to the Public Health 
Committee by January 15, 2022, and develop the report in consultation  2021HB-06449-R000203-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JO 	Page 2 	3/30/21 
 
with whatever boards or commissions she deems appropriate. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  October 1, 2021, for the credentialing provision 
and July 1, 2021, for the working group and reporting provisions.   
§ 1 — DPH CREDENTIALING  
Existing law provides for licensure by endorsement (also called 
licensure without examination) for several categories of health care 
professionals who are licensed in other states. Generally, this applies if 
DPH determines that the other state’s licensure standards are 
substantially similar to, or higher than, those of this state.  
The bill generally requires DPH to issue an occupational or 
professional license, permit, certification, or registration (hereinafter, 
“credential”) to a state resident or an accompanying spouse of an 
active duty service member permanently stationed here if that person: 
1. holds a valid credential in the applicable profession in at least 
one other jurisdiction and has practiced under that credential 
for at least a year; 
2. is in good standing in all jurisdictions where credentialed and 
has no disciplinary history (including credential revocation or 
other discipline; pending complaints, allegations, or 
investigations related to unprofessional conduct; or voluntary 
surrender of a credential during an investigation); 
3. satisfies any background, character, or fitness check required of 
other applicants; and 
4. pays any credentialing fees required of other applicants. 
These provisions apply to DPH-issued credentials.  DPH determines 
the practice level of the credential. The bill specifies that anyone 
issued a credential under these provisions is subject to Connecticut law 
and DPH jurisdiction. 
The bill also allows DPH to (1) require any such person to pass an 
examination (or part of one) required of other applicants and (2) deny  2021HB-06449-R000203-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JO 	Page 3 	3/30/21 
 
an application if the commissioner finds it to be in the state’s best 
interest (e.g., if the applicant has committed an act which would not 
conform to the accepted standards of practice of the profession).  
§ 2 — INTERSTATE LICENSURE COMPACT WORKING GROU PS 
The bill requires the DPH commissioner to convene working groups 
to determine whether the state should join any interstate licensure 
compacts. Any such groups must convene by August 30, 2021.  
The groups must include: 
1. the DPH commissioner, the Office of Policy and Management 
secretary, the Office of Health Strategy executive director, and 
the chair of the appropriate examining or advisory board, or 
their designees; 
2. a representative of the appropriate state professional 
association;  
3. a representative of the professional assistance program for 
regulated health professions (HAVEN); and 
4. anyone else the DPH commissioner deems appropriate.   
By January 15, 2022, the commissioner must report to the Public 
Health Committee on the groups’ recommendations. The working 
groups end when she submits her report. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Health Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 26 Nay 7 (03/12/2021)