Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06458 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/01/2021

                     
Researcher: ND 	Page 1 	6/1/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6458 (as amended by House "A")* 
 
AN ACT LOWERING THE AGE OF ELIGIBILITY FOR PROPERTY 
TAX RELIEF FOR SENIOR CITIZENS.  
 
SUMMARY 
Starting October 1, 2021, this bill expands eligibility for the local 
option Elderly Tax Freeze Program by decreasing the program’s 
minimum age requirement from 70 to 65 years.  
However, the bill allows a municipality, by vote of its legislative 
body, to set the program’s minimum age requirement at older than 65 
years. A municipality that voted to limit program eligibility to 
individuals ages 70 and older prior to this date is not required to take 
another vote unless it seeks to lower the program’s minimum age 
requirement. 
Under the program, towns may freeze the property taxes on a home 
whose owner-occupant or his or her spouse meets the minimum age 
requirement and has been a state resident for at least one year. The 
freeze continues for a surviving spouse who is at least age 62 when the 
homeowner dies. Homeowners must also meet the state’s Circuit 
Breaker Program income limits (currently, $45,800 for a married couple 
and $37,600 for an individual). Towns may also impose asset limits for 
eligibility and place a lien on the property.  
Additionally, the bill establishes a 10-member task force to study 
ways to protect seniors from fraud. The task force must report its 
findings and recommendations to the Aging and Human Services 
committees by January 1, 2022. The task force terminates that date, or 
the date it submits the report, whichever is later.  
Lastly, bill makes technical and conforming changes.  
*House Amendment “A” adds the task force provisions.  2021HB-06458-R010771-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 2 	6/1/21 
 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage for the task force provisions and 
October 1, 2021, for the tax freeze program provisions, which are 
applicable to assessment years beginning on or after this date. 
TASK FORCE  
The bill establishes a 10-member task force to study ways to protect 
seniors from fraud and requires the study to include available 
planning services for Medicaid applicants.  
Under the bill, task force members include: 
1. one member with expertise in fraud perpetrated against seniors 
and one member with expertise in Medicaid planning for 
seniors, each appointed by the House speaker; 
2. two members appointed by the Senate president pro tempore; 
3. four members, one each appointed by the House and Senate 
majority and minority leaders; and 
4. the social services and aging and disability services 
commissioners, or their designees.  
The bill requires appointing authorities to make initial 
appointments within 30 days after the bill’s passage and fill any 
vacancies. Appointed members may be legislators. 
Under the bill, the House speaker and Senate president pro tempore 
must select the task force chairperson from among the task force 
members. The chairpersons must schedule the first meeting, which 
must be held no later than 60 days after the bill’s passage. 
The administrative staff of the Aging Committee serve as the task 
force’s administrative staff.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Aging Committee 
Joint Favorable Change of Reference - PD  2021HB-06458-R010771-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 3 	6/1/21 
 
Yea 15 Nay 0 (03/02/2021) 
 
Planning and Development Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 26 Nay 0 (03/21/2021)