Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06462 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/11/2021

                     
Researcher: DC 	Page 1 	3/11/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6462  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING USE OF FORCE BY A PEACE OFFICER.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill delays the effective date of 2020 legislative changes 
affecting law enforcement use of force (§ 29 of PA 20-1, July Special 
Session (JSS)) from April 1, 2021, to January 1, 2022. Among other 
things, these provisions (1) limit the circumstances under which a law 
enforcement officer’s use of deadly physical force is justified and 
establish factors to consider when evaluating whether the officer’s 
action was reasonable and (2) limit when officers may use chokeholds 
or similar restraints (see BACKGROUND).  
The bill also modifies the circumstances in which officers are 
justified in using deadly physical force, established in PA 20-1, JSS (§ 
29), by, among other things, (1) basing the objective reasonableness 
standard on the officer’s given circumstances at that time; (2) requiring 
officers to have reasonably determined that no reasonable alternatives 
exist, rather than having exhausted such alternatives, if using deadly 
force when making an arrest or preventing escape; and (3) establishing 
the condition that the escaping person poses a significant threat of 
death or serious physical injury to others, among other requirements. 
The bill also makes a technical and conforming change. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  March 31, 2021, for the effective date provision 
and January 1, 2022, for the provision modifying the use of deadly 
force justification.  
USE OF DEADLY PHYSIC AL FORCE 
Objectively Reasonable 
Under PA 20-1, JSS (§ 29), one condition that justifies officers using 
deadly physical force is that the officers’ actions are objectively  2021HB-06462-R000045-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DC 	Page 2 	3/11/21 
 
reasonable under the circumstances. The bill specifies that the actions 
must be objectively reasonable given the circumstances at that time. 
PA 20-1, JSS (§ 29), allows officers to use deadly physical force to:  
1. defend themselves or a third person from the use or imminent 
use of deadly physical force or  
2. (a) arrest a person they reasonably believe has committed or 
attempted to commit a felony that involved the infliction of 
serious physical injury or (b) prevent the escape from custody of 
a person they reasonably believe has committed a felony that 
involved the infliction of serious physical injury.  
As under existing law, officers must reasonably believe the use of 
force is necessary.  
Making an Arrest or Preventing Escape 
In situations where an officer is making an arrest or preventing an 
escape, PA 20-1, JSS (§ 29), places additional conditions on when 
deadly physical force may be used. The bill modifies these conditions 
as follows.   
It eliminates the requirement for officers to exhaust reasonable 
alternatives to the use of deadly force; instead, it requires that they 
reasonably determine that there are no available reasonable 
alternatives to using deadly force. Additionally, the bill requires that 
they reasonably believe the force they used does not create 
unreasonable, rather than substantial, risk to a third party. 
Unchanged by the bill, PA 20-1, JSS (§ 29), also eliminates the 
justification of using deadly physical force on someone the officer 
reasonably believes only threatened the infliction of serious physical 
injury, both when making an arrest or preventing an escape. 
Preventing Escape. In situations where an officer is preventing an 
escape, the bill additionally establishes the condition that, to justify an 
officer’s use of deadly force, the escaping person must pose a  2021HB-06462-R000045-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DC 	Page 3 	3/11/21 
 
significant threat of death or serious physical injury to others. 
DETERMINING WHETHER DEADLY FORCE WAS REA SONABLE 
PA 20-1, JSS (§ 29), establishes factors for evaluating whether an 
officer’s use of deadly physical force was objectively reasonable. These 
factors include, among others, whether the officer’s conduct led to an 
increased risk of the situation that preceded the use of force. The bill 
narrows this factor to whether the officer’s unreasonable conduct led 
to such an increased risk. 
BACKGROUND 
Law Enforcement Officers  
For purposes of the bill, a law enforcement officer includes peace 
officers (see below), special police officers for the Department of 
Revenue Services, and authorized officials of the Department of 
Correction (DOC) or the Board of Pardons and Paroles. By law, the 
following individuals are designated peace officers: state and local 
police, Division of Criminal Justice inspectors, state marshals 
exercising statutory powers, judicial marshals performing their duties, 
conservation or special conservation officers, constables who perform 
criminal law enforcement duties, appointed special policemen, adult 
probation officers, DOC officials authorized to make arrests in a 
correctional institution or facility, investigators in the Office of the 
State Treasurer, POST-certified motor vehicle inspectors, U.S. marshals 
and deputy marshals, U.S. special agents authorized to enforce federal 
food and drug laws, and certified police officers of a law enforcement 
unit created and governed under a state-tribal memorandum (CGS § 
53a-3(9)). 
Limits on Chokeholds or Similar Restraints  
By law, law enforcement officers are justified in using physical force 
to the extent they reasonably believe it is necessary to:  
1. arrest or prevent the escape from custody of someone they 
reasonably believe has committed an offense (unless the officers 
know that the arrest or custody is unauthorized) or   2021HB-06462-R000045-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DC 	Page 4 	3/11/21 
 
2. defend themselves or a third person from the use or imminent 
use of physical force while arresting or attempting to arrest 
someone or preventing or attempting to prevent an escape.  
PA 20-1, JSS (§ 29), limits when an officer may use a chokehold or 
similar methods of restraint (i.e., those that are applied to the neck 
area, impede the ability to breathe, or restrict blood circulation to the 
brain). It does so by allowing these methods only when the officer 
reasonably believes they are necessary to defend himself or herself 
from the use or imminent use of deadly physical force. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Judiciary Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 38 Nay 0 (03/08/2021)