Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06464 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/11/2021

                     
Researcher: KS 	Page 1 	3/11/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6464  
 
AN ACT EXTENDING TO MAY 31, 2021, SEVERAL CHANGES 
IMPLEMENTED FOR THE 2020 STATE ELECTION AS A RESULT 
OF COVID-19.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill extends to May 31, 2021, certain changes affecting absentee 
voting eligibility and procedures implemented for the 2020 state 
election by PA 20-3, July 2020 Special Session, as a result of COVID-19.  
Generally, for a state or municipal election, primary, or referendum 
occurring before June 1, 2021, the bill does the following:  
1. expands the reasons for which electors may vote by absentee 
ballot to include the COVID-19 sickness;  
2. authorizes the secretary of the state to change absentee voting 
forms and materials to conform to the expanded eligibility; 
3. authorizes town clerks to mail absentee voting sets using a 
third-party vendor that the secretary of the state approves and 
selects;  
4. requires town clerks to designate, and authorizes absentee 
voters to return absentee ballots to, drop boxes; and 
5. authorizes the secretary of the state, subject to certain 
conditions, to waive mandatory supervised absentee voting 
requirements. 
The bill also makes technical changes. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage 
§§ 1-3 — EXPANDED ABSENTEE VOTING AUTHORIZATION AND 
UPDATED FORMS  2021HB-06464-R000046-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KS 	Page 2 	3/11/21 
 
For a state or municipal election, primary, or referendum occurring 
before June 1, 2021 (hereafter, “covered election, primary, or 
referendum”), the bill expands the reasons for which electors may vote 
by absentee ballot to include the COVID -19 sickness (see 
BACKGROUND).  Under the bill, "COVID-19" means the respiratory 
disease designated as "coronavirus 2019" by the World Health 
Organization (WHO) on February 11, 2020, and any related mutation 
of it that the WHO recognizes as a communicable respiratory disease. 
The bill requires that absentee ballots be updated for a covered 
election, primary, or referendum by inserting on the inner envelope’s 
statement “the sickness of COVID-19” as a reason for which electors 
may vote absentee. As with other types of absentee voters, those who 
vote by absentee ballot due to the COVID-19 sickness must sign the 
ballot under penalties of false statement in absentee balloting. By law, 
false statement in absentee balloting is a class D felony, punishable by 
up to five years in prison, up to a $5,000 fine, or both (CGS § 9-359a). 
The bill also gives the secretary of the state broad authority to make 
changes to absentee voting forms and materials for a covered election, 
primary, or referendum when, in her opinion, changes are necessary to 
conform to law. The authorization applies to prescribed absentee 
voting forms and printed, recorded, or electronic materials. 
§§ 4 & 5 — ABSENTEE BALLOT DELI VERY AND RETURN  
Delivery 
The bill, with certain exceptions, authorizes town clerks to mail 
absentee voting sets for a covered election, primary, or referendum 
using a third-party vendor that the secretary of the state approves and 
selects.  It also requires (1) town clerks to mail the absentee voting sets 
within 48 hours, rather than within 24 hours, after receiving an 
application and (2) that any contract between the secretary and a third-
party vendor require the vendor to mail each set within 72 hours after 
receiving it from the clerk.  
The bill’s provisions on mailing absentee ballot sets do not apply 
when a referendum is held with fewer than three weeks’ notice since,  2021HB-06464-R000046-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KS 	Page 3 	3/11/21 
 
by law, town clerks may provide absentee ballots for these referenda 
only to people who apply in person (CGS § 9-369c(a)).  
Return 
By law, voters may return completed absentee ballots via mail (e.g., 
the U.S. Postal Service) or in-person at the town clerk’s office. Under 
the bill, for a covered state or municipal election, primary, or 
referendum, they may also deposit them in secure drop boxes 
designated by their town clerk for that purpose. Town clerks must 
designate the drop boxes following instructions that the secretary of 
the state prescribes. 
Beginning 29 days before a covered election, primary, or 
referendum, and each weekday thereafter until the polls close, town 
clerks must retrieve absentee ballots from the secure drop boxes. 
(Presumably, for primaries and referenda, the requirement applies 
only after town clerks begin issuing absentee ballot sets (see 
BACKGROUND).) 
§ 6 — MANDATORY SUPERVISED ABSENTEE VOTING  
The bill authorizes the secretary of the state to waive any 
requirements under the mandatory supervised absentee voting law for 
a covered election or primary (see BACKGROUND). To waive a 
requirement, she must do so in recognition of the governor’s March 10, 
2020, declaration of public health and civil preparedness emergencies. 
Before any waiver, the secretary must (1) consult with the public 
health commissioner or the commissioner’s designee and (2) give 
written notice to the town clerk and registrars of voters in each affected 
municipality.   
BACKGROUND 
Permitted Reasons for Voting by Absentee Ballot 
The state constitution authorizes the General Assembly to pass a 
law allowing eligible voters to cast their votes by absentee ballot if they 
are unable to appear at a polling place on election day because of (1) 
absence from their city or town, (2) sickness or physical disability, or 
(3) the tenets of their religion prohibit secular activity (Art. VI, § 7). The  2021HB-06464-R000046-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KS 	Page 4 	3/11/21 
 
General Assembly exercised this authority and passed laws codified at 
CGS § 9-135. 
CGS § 9-135 permits eligible voters to vote by absentee ballot if: 
1. they are absent from the municipality in which they reside 
during all hours of voting;  
2. they are ill or have a physical disability; 
3. the tenets of their religion forbid secular activity on the day of 
the primary, election, or referendum; 
4. they are in active service in the U.S. Armed Forces; or 
5. their duties as a primary, election, or referendum official 
outside of their voting district will keep them away during all 
hours of voting. 
Issuing Absentee Ballot Sets 
By law, town clerks begin issuing absentee voting sets 31 days 
before an election and 21 days before a primary; or, if that day falls on 
a weekend or holiday, the next preceding business day. Generally, 
clerks begin issuing the sets 19 days before a referendum or when an 
elector applies for an absentee ballot, whichever is later. However, 
when a referendum is held with fewer than three weeks’ notice, clerks 
must make the sets available no later than four business days after the 
question is finalized (CGS §§ 9-140(f) and 9-369c(a) & (e)).   
Mandatory Supervised Absentee Voting  
Under the mandatory supervised absentee voting law, registrars of 
voters or their designees must supervise absentee voting at 
"institutions" (e.g., nursing homes and other residential care and 
mental health facilities) in which at least 20 patients are registered 
voters (including patients who are registered in a municipality other 
than the one where the institution is located). During these voting 
sessions, registrars or their designees deliver absentee ballots to the 
institution and jointly supervise voters while they fill out the ballots.  2021HB-06464-R000046-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KS 	Page 5 	3/11/21 
 
Voters have the right to complete their ballots in secret, but registrars 
observe the process and are available to assist upon request. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Government Administration and Elections Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 16 Nay 3 (03/05/2021)