Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06469 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/24/2021

                     
 
LCO 3477  \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06469-R01-
HB.docx  
1 of 3 
  
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6469  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 3477 
 
 
Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(HS)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E CONNECTICUT HOME -CARE PROGRAM 
FOR THE ELDERLY.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsections (i) and (j) of section 17b-342 of the general 1 
statutes are repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof 2 
(Effective July 1, 2021): 3 
(i) (1) On and after July 1, 2015, the Commissioner of Social Services 4 
shall, within available appropriations, administer a state-funded 5 
portion of the program for persons (A) who are sixty-five years of age 6 
and older; (B) who are inappropriately institutionalized or at risk of 7 
inappropriate institutionalization; (C) whose income is less than or 8 
equal to the amount allowed under subdivision (3) of subsection (a) of 9 
this section; and (D) whose assets, if single, do not exceed one hundred 10 
fifty per cent of the federal minimum community spouse protected 11 
amount pursuant to 42 USC 1396r-5(f)(2) or, if married, the couple's 12 
assets do not exceed two hundred per cent of said community spouse 13 
protected amount. For program applications received by the 14 
Department of Social Services for the fiscal years ending June 30, 2016, 15  Raised Bill No. 6469 
 
 
LCO 3477  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06469-
R01-HB.docx }   
2 of 3 
 
and June 30, 2017, only persons who require the level of care provided 16 
in a nursing home shall be eligible for the state-funded portion of the 17 
program, except for persons residing in affordable housing under the 18 
assisted living demonstration project established pursuant to section 19 
17b-347e who are otherwise eligible in accordance with this section. 20 
[(2) Except for persons residing in affordable housing under the 21 
assisted living demonstration project established pursuant to section 22 
17b-347e, as provided in subdivision (3) of this subsection, any person 23 
whose income is at or below two hundred per cent of the federal poverty 24 
level and who is ineligible for Medicaid shall contribute nine per cent of 25 
the cost of his or her care. Any person whose income exceeds two 26 
hundred per cent of the federal poverty level shall contribute nine per 27 
cent of the cost of his or her care in addition to the amount of applied 28 
income determined in accordance with the methodology established by 29 
the Department of Social Services for recipients of medical assistance. 30 
Any person who does not contribute to the cost of care in accordance 31 
with this subdivision shall be ineligible to receive services under this 32 
subsection. Notwithstanding any provision of sections 17b-60 and 17b-33 
61, the department shall not be required to provide an administrative 34 
hearing to a person found ineligible for services under this subsection 35 
because of a failure to contribute to the cost of care. 36 
(3) Any person who resides in affordable housing under the assisted 37 
living demonstration project established pursuant to section 17b-347e 38 
and whose income is at or below two hundred per cent of the federal 39 
poverty level, shall not be required to contribute to the cost of care. Any 40 
person who resides in affordable housing under the assisted living 41 
demonstration project established pursuant to section 17b-347e and 42 
whose income exceeds two hundred per cent of the federal poverty 43 
level, shall contribute to the applied income amount determined in 44 
accordance with the methodology established by the Department of 45 
Social Services for recipients of medical assistance. Any person whose 46 
income exceeds two hundred per cent of the federal poverty level and 47 
who does not contribute to the cost of care in accordance with this 48  Raised Bill No. 6469 
 
 
LCO 3477  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06469-
R01-HB.docx }   
3 of 3 
 
subdivision shall be ineligible to receive services under this subsection. 49 
Notwithstanding any provision of sections 17b-60 and 17b-61, the 50 
department shall not be required to provide an administrative hearing 51 
to a person found ineligible for services under this subsection because 52 
of a failure to contribute to the cost of care.] 53 
[(4)] (2) The annualized cost of services provided to an individual 54 
under the state-funded portion of the program shall not exceed fifty per 55 
cent of the weighted average cost of care in nursing homes in the state, 56 
except an individual who received services costing in excess of such 57 
amount under the Department of Social Services in the fiscal year 58 
ending June 30, 1992, may continue to receive such services, provided 59 
the annualized cost of such services does not exceed eighty per cent of 60 
the weighted average cost of such nursing home care. The commissioner 61 
may allow the cost of services provided to an individual to exceed the 62 
maximum cost established pursuant to this subdivision in a case of 63 
extreme hardship, as determined by the commissioner, provided in no 64 
case shall such cost exceed that of the weighted cost of such nursing 65 
home care. 66 
(j) The Commissioner of Social Services may implement revised 67 
criteria for the operation of the program while in the process of adopting 68 
such criteria in regulation form, provided the commissioner prints 69 
notice of intention to adopt the regulations [in the Connecticut Law 70 
Journal within twenty days of implementing the policy] in accordance 71 
with section 17b-10. Such criteria shall be valid until the time final 72 
regulations are effective. 73 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 17b-342(i) and (j) 
 
HS Joint Favorable