Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06485 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/24/2021

                     
Researcher: GM 	Page 1 	3/24/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6485  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE CONNECTICUT HYDROGEN AND 
ELECTRIC AUTOMOBILE PURCHASE REBATE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill adds electric bicycles (e-bikes) to the list of vehicles eligible 
for rebates under the Connecticut Hydrogen and Electric Automobile 
Purchase Rebate (CHEAPR) program (see BACKGROUND) , 
specifically e-bikes purchased as new or used or leased as new. Under 
current law, from January 1, 2020, until December 31, 2025, the 
CHEAPR program must provide rebates of at least $3 million annually 
to residents who (1) purchase or lease a battery, plug-in hybrid, or fuel 
cell electric vehicle or (2) purchase a used hydrogen or electric vehicle.  
By law and under the bill, rebate levels and income eligibility for 
rebates for those used vehicles are established and revised by the 
CHEAPR board, which is responsible for administering the program 
and evaluating it annually. Under the bill, the CHEAPR board must 
also conduct a study on ways to ensure the equitable distribution of 
rebates under the program. The study must consider how other states 
administering similar programs distribute rebates equitably and target 
areas most impacted by vehicle pollution. The board must report the 
study’s result to the Transportation Committee by February 1, 2022. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage  
BACKGROUND 
E-Bikes 
Existing law defines three types of e-bikes, all of which must have 
operable foot pedals and a motor of, at most, 749 watts: 
1. A Class 1 e-bike’s motor must operate only when the rider is 
peddling. The motor must disengage when the e-bike reaches 20  2021HB-06485-R000124-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 2 	3/24/21 
 
mph. 
2. A Class 2 e-bike’s motor may be used exclusively to propel the 
e-bike (i.e., without peddling). The motor must disengage when 
the e-bike rider applies the brakes or reaches 20 mph. 
3. A Class 3 e-bike’s motor must operate only when rider is 
peddling. The motor must disengage when the e-bike rider 
stops peddling or reaches 28 mph. 
State law’s definition of e-bike specifically excludes dirt bikes and 
all-terrain vehicles (CGS § 14-1). 
CHEAPR Program 
CHEAPR was created administratively in 2015 as a pilot program. It 
was developed by the Department of Energy and Environmental 
Protection in partnership with Eversource Energy, Avangrid (i.e., the 
United Illuminating Company), and the Connecticut Automotive 
Retailers Association. The 2019 state budget (PA 19-117) formally 
established the program and an administrative board to oversee it as 
well as create a General Fund account with a revenue stream 
generated by the greenhouse gas reduction fee to fund it (CGS §§ 22a-
202 and -201c). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Transportation Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 35 Nay 0 (03/10/2021)