Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06489 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/31/2021

                     
Researcher: ND 	Page 1 	3/31/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6489  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH'S 
RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING REMOTE ACCESS TO 
MEDICAL RECORDS MAINTAINED BY HOSPITALS AND HEALTH 
CARE PROVIDERS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires hospitals to provide the Department of Public 
Health (DPH) access, including remote access if technically feasible, to 
complete electronic medical records on reportable diseases and 
emergency illnesses and health conditions, in a manner the 
commissioner approves (see BACKGROUND).   
It also requires hospitals to grant DPH access, including remote 
access if technically feasible, to complete patient medical records 
related to the: 
1. Connecticut Tumor Registry, if the department deems it 
necessary to perform case findings or other quality 
improvement audits (see BACKGROUND) and  
2. Maternal Mortality Review Program, if DPH deems it necessary 
to review case information related to a death under review by 
the program (see BACKGROUND). 
(Existing law already grants DPH access to health care provider 
records for these purposes.) 
Under the bill, as under the existing law, these records generally (1) 
are confidential and not subject to disclosure, (2) are not admissible as 
evidence in any court or agency proceeding, and (3) must be used 
solely for medical or scientific research or disease control and 
prevention purposes.  
Additionally, the bill requires DPH, no earlier than July 1, 2021, to  2021HB-06489-R000228-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 2 	3/31/21 
 
establish a one-year pilot program to initially test the impact of 
providing DPH remote access to complete hospital electronic medical 
records related to birth defects, births, fetal deaths, and death 
occurrences. Within 30 days after the pilot program ends, DPH must 
determine whether it will be fully implemented. If so, hospitals must 
start providing DPH access to these records on a continual basis.  
Lastly, the bill makes technical changes. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2021, except the pilot program 
provisions take effect July 1, 2021. 
PILOT PROGRAM 
The bill requires the Connecticut Hospital Association to identify 
one hospital to participate in the one-year pilot program, which DPH 
must establish no earlier than July 1, 2021. That hospital must share 
complete electronic medical records related to birth defects, births, 
fetal deaths, and death occurrences that DPH deems necessary to 
perform quality improvement audits for related data accuracy and 
completeness of reporting. Under the bill, these records are 
confidential in the same manner as described above.  
The bill also requires DPH, no earlier than July 1, 2022, to evaluate 
the pilot program to determine any achieved (1) improvements in data 
accuracy and timeliness and (2) cost savings. Within 30 days after the 
pilot program ends, the commissioner must determine whether the 
pilot program will be fully implemented. If so, hospitals must start 
providing DPH access to these records on a continual basis.  
BACKGROUND 
DPH Reportable Disease List  
By law, DPH maintains an annual list of reportable diseases and 
emergency illnesses and conditions and reportable lab findings. Health 
care providers and clinical laboratories must report cases of the listed 
conditions within certain timeframes to the department and the local 
health director where the case occurs.  
Connecticut Tumor Registry   2021HB-06489-R000228-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 3 	3/31/21 
 
By law, the Connecticut Tumor Registry includes reports of all 
tumors and conditions that are diagnosed or treated in the state for 
which DPH requires reports. Hospitals, various health care providers, 
and clinical laboratories must provide such reports to DPH for 
inclusion in the registry. 
Maternity Mortality Review Program 
DPH’s Maternity Mortality Review Program identifies maternal 
deaths in Connecticut, and reviews related medical records and other 
relevant data, including death and birth records, the Office of the Chief 
Medical Examiner’s files, and physician office and hospital records. 
The program’s review committee conducts comprehensive, 
multidisciplinary reviews of maternal deaths to identify associated 
factors and make recommendations to reduce these deaths.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Health Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 29 Nay 4 (03/12/2021)