Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06502 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/30/2021

                     
Researcher: JKL 	Page 1 	3/30/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6502  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE USE OF CERTAIN POLYSTYRENE 
PRODUCTS, THE AVAILABILITY OF SINGLE -USE STRAWS, THE 
RELEASE OF CERTAIN BALLOONS AND THE COMPOSTABLE 
NATURE OF SINGLE-USE PRODUCE BAGS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill: 
1. requires the phase out of expanded polystyrene trays in certain 
schools; 
2. prohibits restaurants and catering businesses from distributing 
single-use expanded polystyrene food and beverage containers 
to customers, beginning July 1, 2023; 
3. prohibits full-service restaurants from providing a customer a 
single-use plastic straw unless the customer requests it, 
beginning January 1, 2022; 
4. prohibits intentional releases of helium balloons, beginning 
October 1, 2021; and 
5. requires the Department of Energy and Environm ental 
Protection (DEEP) commissioner to ask the Connecticut 
Academy of Science and Engineering (CASE) to study whether 
a compostable single-use produce bag is available for use that 
does not adversely affect the environment. 
Under the bill, CASE must complete the study and report its 
findings to the DEEP commissioner by January 15, 2022. The 
commissioner must then review the report and forward it and CASE’s 
legislative recommendations, if any, to the Environment Committee by 
February 1, 2022.  2021HB-06502-R000209-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 2 	3/30/21 
 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage, except the provision on (1) 
helium balloons is effective October 1, 2021; (2) single-use plastic 
straws is effective January 1, 2022; and (3) single-use polystyrene 
containers is effective July 1, 2023.  
§ 1 — EXPANDED POLYSTYRENE TRAYS IN SCHOOLS 
The bill:  
1. requires each school district, regional school district, regional 
vocational technical school, and constituent unit of higher 
education to develop a plan by July 1, 2022, to discontinue use 
of expanded polystyrene trays;  
2. calls for the plans to require (a) discontinuing use of the trays by 
July 1, 2023, and (b) preparing to end or amend any purchasing 
contracts for the trays by July 1, 2022; and  
3. exempts a district or school that stops using these trays before 
July 1, 2022, from having to develop a plan.  
The “constituent units of higher education” are UConn (all 
campuses) and the Connecticut State Colleges and Universities (four 
state universities, 12 community colleges, and Charter Oak State 
College)(CGS § 10a-1). 
Under the bill, “expanded polystyrene” means blown polystyrene 
and expanded and extruded foams that are thermoplastic 
petrochemical materials utilizing a styrene monomer and processed by 
any number of techniques, including fusion of polymer spheres and 
injection, foam, or extrusion molding. 
§ 2 — SINGLE-USE POLYSTYRENE CONT AINERS 
Beginning July 1, 2023, the bill bans restaurants and caterers from 
providing or distributing single-use expanded polystyrene  food and 
beverage containers to customers. It exempts from the ban containers 
(1) filled and sealed before being received by a restaurant or caterer or 
(2) used by a butcher or store to hold raw meat.   2021HB-06502-R000209-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 3 	3/30/21 
 
Under the bill, a “restaurant” is a space in a suitable and permanent 
building that is kept, used, maintained, advertised, and held out to the 
public as a place where meals are regularly sold to the public. A 
“caterer” is a business involved in (1) selling or distributing food or 
drink prepared in bulk in one location for retail service in another 
location or (2) preparing and serving food in a venue that is not under 
the caterer’s control. 
The owner or operator of a restaurant or caterer that violates the ban 
must receive a warning for a first violation, $250 fine for a second 
violation, $500 fine for a third violation, and $1,000 fine for a 
subsequent violation. A restaurant or caterer can only be issued one 
violation per day.  
Under the bill, a local health department or health district, the 
Department of Public Health (DPH), the Department of Consumer 
Protection (DCP), or DEEP may enforce the ban. If a local health 
department or health district enforces it, then half of the imposed fine 
must be remitted to the municipality where the violation occurred. 
The bill states that it does not prohibit manufacturing single-use 
expanded polystyrene containers in the state or their sale by someone 
other than restaurants and caterers. 
By February 1, 2024, the DPH, DCP, and DEEP commissioners must 
jointly submit a report to the Environment, Public Health, and General 
Law committees on the law’s enforcement and the need to establish a 
hardship waiver for any restaurant or caterer with a demonstrated 
financial hardship directly caused by the law. 
§ 3 — SINGLE-USE PLASTIC STRAWS 
Beginning January 1, 2022, the bill prohibits a full-service restaurant 
owner or operator from providing a customer a single-use plastic 
straw unless the customer requests one. However, it allows the owner 
or operator to provide a single-use plastic straw to someone with a 
disability. The bill specifies that it does not require an owner or 
operator who does not otherwise provide these straws to do so.  2021HB-06502-R000209-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 4 	3/30/21 
 
Under the bill, an owner or operator who violates the bill’s 
provisions must be issued a warning for a first or second violation and 
a fine for a third or subsequent violation. The fine is $25 for each day of 
violation, up to $300 in a year. A municipal or district health 
department with jurisdiction over the restaurant may enforce the bill’s 
provisions. 
The bill states that it does not prevent a municipality from adopting 
and implementing an ordinance or rule further restricting a full-service 
restaurant from providing customers single-use plastic straws. But the 
ordinance or rule cannot prohibit a restaurant from providing a single-
use plastic straw to someone with a disability. 
Full-Service Restaurant Defined 
Under the bill, a “full-service restaurant” is an establishment that 
primarily serves food that may be consumed on site and where an 
employee does the following: 
1. escorts and seats the customer, 
2. takes the customer’s food and beverage order after the customer 
is seated, 
3. delivers the order and any requested related items to the 
customer, and 
4. brings the check for the order to the customer’s table. 
§ 4 — HELIUM BALLOONS 
Beginning October 1, 2021, the bill prohibits knowingly releasing, 
organizing the release of, or intentionally causing the release of helium 
or lighter-than-air gas balloons into the atmosphere. Current law limits 
releases to fewer than 10 balloons within a 24-hour period. A violation 
of the ban is an infraction. 
§ 5 — SINGLE-USE PRODUCE BAG STUD Y 
By September 1, 2021, the bill requires the DEEP commissioner to 
accept an application on behalf of a single-use produce bag  2021HB-06502-R000209-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 5 	3/30/21 
 
manufacturer for a study at the commissioner’s request by CASE. The 
study must determine whether a compostable single-use produce bag 
is available for use that does not adversely impact the environment. A 
“single-use produce bag” is a bag provided by a store to contain meat, 
seafood, loose produce, or other unwrapped food items. 
Under the bill, the application must (1) require the manufacturer to 
disclose the bag’s chemical parts or composition and (2) be in a form 
the commissioner prescribes. 
The commissioner must ask CASE to perform the study once she 
receives the application. CASE may establish a fee for the study, which 
the manufacturer must pay through DEEP. After it receives the request 
and fee from the commissioner, CASE must begin the study, which 
must include: 
1. a CASE-appointed study committee to oversee it; 
2. a CASE-selected research team with compostable single-use 
produce bag expertise to (a) conduct relevant research, 
including the bag’s decomposition percentage and duration, 
and (b) author a study report; and 
3. study committee meetings that allow the applicant, DEEP, and 
interested people to obtain information about the study. 
The bill requires CASE to complete the study and issue the final 
study report to the DEEP commissioner by January 15, 2022. The 
commissioner must review the report and forward it and CASE’s 
legislative recommendations, if any, to the Environment Committee by 
February 1, 2022. 
The act exempts from disclosure under the Freedom of Information 
Act any study-related information or materials submitted by an 
applicant to DEEP or CASE that the applicant indicates at submission 
is a trade secret or privileged. 
COMMITTEE ACTION  2021HB-06502-R000209-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 6 	3/30/21 
 
Environment Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 22 Nay 11 (03/12/2021)