Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06510 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/29/2021

                     
Researcher: MK 	Page 1 	3/29/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6510  
 
AN ACT REQUIRING THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION 
CONCERNING CHILDREN'S MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES IN 
HOSPITAL EMERGENCY ROOMS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Behavioral Health Partnership Oversight 
Council (BHPOC), by December 1, 2021, to develop a document for 
each mental health region describing the resources available to 
children with psychiatric disabilities and behavioral health disorders.  
BHPOC must do so in consultation with the departments of Children 
and Families (DCF), Mental Health and Addiction Services, and Public 
Health and DCF’s Youth Suicide Advisory Board.  
Under the bill, the council must (1) distribute the documents 
electronically to each licensed hospital that has an emergency 
department; (2) make them available on the council’s website; and (3) 
starting December 1, 2022, annually review them and distribute and 
post any updates. 
The bill also requires hospital emergency departments, starting on 
January 1, 2022, to provide a copy of one or more of the documents to 
the parents or guardians of children who (1) exhibit symptoms 
consistent with a psychiatric disability or behavioral health disorder or 
(2) the department evaluated as a result of exhibiting such symptoms. 
The hospital emergency department must do so upon discharging the 
child. Under the bill, documents must be specifically developed for the 
mental health region or regions where the hospital is located and 
where the child lives.  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage 
DOCUMENT DESCRIBING AVAILABLE RESOURCES 
Under the bill, each document must provide information on mental  2021HB-06510-R000165-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MK 	Page 2 	3/29/21 
 
health evaluation and treatment resources available to children with 
psychiatric disabilities and behavioral health disorders in their 
respective mental health region.  
The documents must contain contact information for the National 
Suicide Prevention Lifeline and a list of evaluation and treatment 
providers, including mobile crisis intervention services providers. The 
list must include the providers’ physical locations, if applicable; types 
of services offered; and contact information. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Committee on Children 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 13 Nay 0 (03/11/2021)