Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06510 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/21/2021

                     
Researcher: MK 	Page 1 	5/21/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6510 (as amended by House "A")*  
 
AN ACT REQUIRING THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION 
CONCERNING CHILDREN'S MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES IN 
HOSPITAL EMERGENCY ROOMS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Department of Children and Families (DCF), 
by December 1, 2021, to develop a document for each mental health 
region describing the behavioral and mental health evaluation and 
treatment resources available to children. DCF must do so in 
consultation with the Behavioral Health Partnership Oversight Council 
(BHPOC), the Mental Health and Addiction Services and Public Health 
departments, and DCF’s Youth Suicide Advisory Board.  
Under the bill, BHPOC must (1) distribute the documents 
electronically to each licensed hospital that has an emergency 
department and to each local and regional board of education and (2) 
make them available on the council’s website. 
Starting by December 1, 2022, the bill requires DCF to annually 
review and update the documents as necessary. DCF must provide any 
updated documents to BHPOC, and the council must distribute and 
make them available in the manner described above.  
The bill also requires hospital emergency departments, starting on 
January 1, 2022, to provide a copy of the applicable documents to the 
parents or guardians of each child upon the child’s discharge from the 
emergency department.  
It also requires each local and regional board of education to (1) 
distribute the applicable document to parents and guardians and 
certain students starting January 1, 2022, and (2) make the document 
available on its website by that date.  2021HB-06510-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MK 	Page 2 	5/21/21 
 
*House Amendment “A” (1) makes DCF, rather than BHPOC, the 
lead agency in the development, review, and update of the resource 
document; (2) makes BHPOC’s role consultative in the development of 
the document but maintains the underlying bill’s requirement for the 
council to distribute the document; (3) broadens the population of 
children covered by the hospital distribution provision by no longer 
limiting it to those showing certain behavioral health symptoms; (4) 
adds the provisions on board of education distribution of the 
document; and (5) makes other minor changes. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage, except the provisions on board 
of education distribution is effective July 1, 2021. 
DOCUMENT DESCRIBING AVAI LABLE RESOURCES 
Under the bill, each document must provide information on mental 
health evaluation and treatment resources available to children in their 
respective mental health region.  
The documents must contain contact information for the National 
Suicide Prevention Lifeline and a list of evaluation and treatment 
providers, including mobile crisis intervention services providers. The 
list must include the providers’ physical locations, if applicable; types 
of services offered; and contact information. 
EMERGENCY DEPARTMENT S’ DISTRIBUTION 
Under the bill, hospital emergency departments must provide the 
parent or guardian with the DCF documents that pertain to the mental 
health region where the (1) department is located and (2) child lives, if 
different, so long as the child lives in the state. 
The emergency departments must provide copies of the documents: 
1. in printed form or through the child’s patient chart in the 
hospital’s electronic health record system, so long as the chart 
was created before the date of the child’s discharge, and 
2. by email to the parent or guardian’s electronic mail address, if 
the parent or guardian chooses this.  2021HB-06510-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MK 	Page 3 	5/21/21 
 
SCHOOL BOARDS’ DISTRIBUTION 
The bill requires each local and regional board of education to: 
1. make the DCF document described above pertaining to its 
region available on its website by January 1, 2022, and 
2. starting January 1, 2022, distribute it (a) to any student taking a 
course in health and safety and (b) at least semiannually, in 
September and May, to the parents and guardians of each 
student in the school district. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Committee on Children 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 13 Nay 0 (03/11/2021) 
 
Public Health Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 30 Nay 0 (05/06/2021)