Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06524 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/25/2021

                     
Researcher: MF 	Page 1 	5/25/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6524 (as amended by House "A")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE SOLICITATION OF NEW FUEL CELL 
ELECTRICITY GENERATION PROJECTS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires each electric distribution company (EDC; i.e., 
Eversource and United Illuminating) to (1) solicit proposals to acquire 
new fuel cell electricity generation projects that begin operation on or 
after July 1, 2021, (2) select project proposals from those solicitations, 
and (3) submit their selected proposals to the Public Utilities 
Regulatory Authority (PURA). Under the bill, PURA must evaluate the 
proposals and may approve them for certain purposes, such as 
enhancing distribution system reliability.  
The bill limits the size of project facilities the EDCs may acquire to 
30 megawatts of capacity in the aggregate apportioned to each EDC 
based on its distribution load. Under the bill, costs prudently incurred 
by an EDC must be recovered from all its customers through a fully 
reconciling component of its electric rates until the company’s next rate 
case, when the company may recover its costs and investments for 
newly owned fuel cell generation through its base distribution rates, as 
determined by PURA. 
Additionally, the bill eliminates a similar provision in current law 
authorizing, but not requiring, the EDCs to submit plans to PURA to 
acquire new fuel cell electricity generation facilities that began 
operation on or after July 1, 2017.  
*House Amendment “A” (1) removes a provision in the underlying 
bill requiring EDCs to give preference to products that meet in-state 
manufacturing requirements and are on landfills or brownfields and 
instead requires preferences for projects that meet either requirement, 
(2) provides that the in-state manufacturing requirement applies to  2021HB-06524-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 2 	5/25/21 
 
projects that use equipment manufactured in the state, rather than 
projects manufactured in the state, and (3) broadens PURA’s ability to 
approve projects to provide back-up power to commercial and 
industrial customers beyond projects that provide on-site generation.      
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021 
SOLICITATION PROCESS AND PROPOSAL SUBMISS IONS 
The bill requires the EDCs to use a competitive solicitation process 
and give preference to projects (1) that use equipment manufactured in 
the state or (2) sited on landfills or brownfields (see BACKGROUND) 
when selecting new fuel cell electricity generation projects from the 
proposals they receive. Presumably, before soliciting for project 
proposals, however, the EDCs must, by August 1, 2021, jointly file 
with PURA a proposed tariff (generally, rates, terms, and conditions) 
to use in their solicitations, subject to PURA’s approval. The bill does 
not specify a timeline for PURA to review and approve the tariff. The 
bill requires each EDC to submit selected project proposals and 
associated tariffs to PURA by January 1, 2022. 
Under the bill, submitted proposals must (1) include the EDC’s full 
projected costs and (2) demonstrate to PURA that a project’s facility is 
not supported in any form of cross subsidization by affiliated entities, 
except that gas companies may recover costs associated with benefits a 
proposed project confers on the natural gas system, as determined by 
PURA. Gas companies may recover these costs from all gas customers 
through the statutory purchased gas adjustment clause in proportion 
to their revenue as reported to PURA for the most recent fiscal year.  
PROJECT EVALUATION A ND APPROVAL 
The bill requires PURA to evaluate submitted project proposals in a 
manner consistent with ratemaking principles established in state law 
(see BACKGROUND). It authorizes PURA to approve any projects for 
the following purposes: 
1. to give commercial or industrial electric or gas customers on-site 
generation that (a) increases power quality or resilience or (b)  2021HB-06524-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 3 	5/25/21 
 
reduces their energy costs; 
2. to provide emergency service facilities or commercial or 
industrial electric or gas customers with back-up power; or 
3. to enhance distribution system reliability, including making 
electric voltage or frequency improvements, supporting 
microgrids, or taking other measures that support electric or gas 
system resiliency.  
By law, “resilience” is the ability to prepare for and adapt to 
changing conditions and withstand and recover rapidly from 
deliberate attacks, accidents, or naturally occurring threats or 
incidents, such as those associated with climate change.  
USE OF ENERGY PRODUC TS 
The bill allows the EDCs to use any energy products, capacity, and 
environmental attributes (e.g., renewable energy certificates (RECs)) 
produced by a project’s facility to meet the needs of their standard 
service customers (i.e., customers who do not select a retail energy 
supplier), and as may otherwise be determined by PURA. The bill 
explicitly does not preclude companies from reselling or otherwise 
disposing of energy products, capacity, and environmental attributes 
they purchase under the bill if PURA orders them to do so.  
The state’s renewable portfolio standard (RPS) generally requires 
that a portion of the power provided by the EDCs and retail electric 
suppliers come from renewable resources. Companies may meet their 
RPS requirement through purchasing RECs. By law, the EDCs must 
contract with their wholesale suppliers to comply with the RPS. The 
bill supersedes this law and allows the EDCs to retain Class I RECs 
issued by the New England Power Pool Generation Information 
System for fuel cells acquired under the bill to meet their RPS 
requirements, as determined by PURA.  
BACKGROUND 
Brownfields 
By law, a brownfield is any abandoned or underused site where  2021HB-06524-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 4 	5/25/21 
 
redevelopment, reuse, or expansion has not occurred due to the 
presence or potential presence of pollution in the buildings, soil, or 
groundwater that requires investigation or remediation before or in 
conjunction with the property’s redevelopment, reuse, or expansion 
(CGS § 32-760(2)).  
Ratemaking Principles  
By law, PURA must generally investigate whether proposed rates 
by public service companies (including the EDCs and gas companies) 
conform to the following ratemaking principles established in law: 
1. there must be a clear public need for the service being proposed 
or provided; 
2. the public service company must be fully competent to provide 
efficient and adequate service (i.e., it is technically, financially, 
and managerially expert and efficient); 
3. PURA and all public service companies must perform their 
respective public responsibilities with economy, efficiency, and 
care for public safety and energy security, as well as promote 
economic development within the state with consideration for 
conservation, energy efficiency, development and use of 
renewable energy, and prudent management of the natural 
environment; 
4. the rate level and structure must be sufficient, but no more than 
sufficient, to allow companies to cover their operating costs, 
including appropriate staffing levels, and capital costs, to attract 
needed capital and to maintain financial integrity, and yet 
provide appropriate protection to relevant public interests; 
5. the level and structure of rates charged to customers must 
reflect prudent and efficient management of the operation; and  
6. company rates, charges, conditions of service, and categories of 
service must not discriminate against customers using 
renewable energy sources or co-generation technology to meet a  2021HB-06524-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 5 	5/25/21 
 
portion of their energy requirements (CGS § 16-19e). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Energy and Technology Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 25 Nay 0 (03/11/2021)