Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06603 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 06/02/2021

                     
Researcher: TA 	Page 1 	6/2/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6603 (as amended by House "A")* 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TOURISM.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill allows two or more municipalities to jointly appoint one 
representative to a regional tourism board of directors. Under the bill, 
the jointly appointed representative (1) is deemed present for each 
appointing municipality for purposes of a quorum at a board meeting 
and (2) may vote for each appointing municipality. By law, the state 
has three regional tourism districts (Eastern, Central, and Western). 
Regional tourism district boards consist of one representative from 
each municipality within the district, appointed by the municipality’s 
legislative body (or board of selectmen if the legislative body is a town 
meeting). 
The bill also adds a representative of the Connecticut Tourism 
Coalition to the Connecticut Tourism Council, which increases the 
council’s membership from 29 to 30. The bill requires that the 
coalition’s representative be appointed by the governor and, as with 
other gubernatorial appointees, serve a four-year term. By law, the 
council is within the Department of Economic and Community 
Development (DECD) for administrative purposes only. Among other 
things, it must (1) evaluate DECD’s biennial strategic marketing plan 
for culture and tourism and (2) annually report to the Commerce 
Committee on the plan and the state’s tourism promotion efforts. 
Lastly, the bill establishes a 15-member task force to study the 
shortage of employees in various tourism-related businesses in the 
state (e.g., shoreline businesses and marine trades). The task force must 
report its findings and recommendations to the Commerce Committee 
by January 1, 2022. It terminates on this date or when it submits its 
report, whichever is later.  2021HB-06603-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: TA 	Page 2 	6/2/21 
 
*House Amendment “A” adds four task force members whom the 
House and Senate majority and minority leaders appoint. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage, except that the provision 
allowing for joint appointments to regional tourism boards of directors 
is effective October 1, 2021. 
TASK FORCE 
Under the bill, the task force consists of 15 members: (1) two 
appointees each by the governor, House speaker, Senate president pro 
tempore, and House and Senate majority and minority leaders and (2) 
the DECD commissioner or his designee. Appointing authorities must 
make their initial appointments within 30 days after the bill’s passage 
and fill any vacancies. Members appointed by legislative leaders may 
be legislators. 
The bill requires the House speaker and Senate president pro 
tempore to select the task force’s chairpersons from among its 
members. The chairpersons must schedule the task force’s first 
meeting, which must be held within 60 days after the bill’s passage. 
The Commerce Committee’s administrative staff must serve as the task 
force’s administrative staff. 
The bill requires the task force to create an inventory and timeline of 
tourism industry employment opportunities and a mechanism for 
advertising these opportunities. It must also review the most efficient, 
cost-effective, and reliable transportation available to individuals 
seeking these opportunities. The task force must consult with (1) 
tourism-related businesses about the inventory and timelines; (2) 
public and private schools, local and regional chambers of commerce, 
and the Connecticut Tourism Council about advertising; and (3) the 
Department of Transportation about transportation availability. 
BACKGROUND 
Related Bill 
sSB 3 (File 352, § 3), reported favorably by the Commerce 
Committee, establishes a task force with a similar charge.  2021HB-06603-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: TA 	Page 3 	6/2/21 
 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Commerce Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 22 Nay 0 (03/16/2021) 
 
Planning and Development Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 25 Nay 0 (04/12/2021)