Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06617 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/29/2021

                     
 
LCO 4889  \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06617-R01-
HB.docx  
1 of 6 
  
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 6617  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 4889 
 
 
Referred to Committee on EDUCATION  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(ED)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING AU THORIZATION OF STATE GRANT 
COMMITMENTS FOR SCHO OL BUILDING PROJECTS AND 
REVISIONS TO THE SCHOOL BUILDING PROJECT S STATUTES.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective from passage) The Commissioner of Administrative 1 
Services, having reviewed applications for state grants for public school 2 
building projects in accordance with section 10-283 of the general 3 
statutes on the basis of priorities for such projects and standards for 4 
school construction established by the State Board of Education, and 5 
having prepared a listing of all such eligible projects ranked in order of 6 
priority, as determined by said commissioner together with the amount 7 
of the estimated grant with respect to each eligible project, and having 8 
submitted such listing of eligible projects, prior to December 15, 2020, to 9 
a committee of the General Assembly established under section 10-283a 10 
of the general statutes for the purpose of reviewing such listing, is 11 
hereby authorized to enter into grant commitments on behalf of the state 12 
in accordance with said section 10-283a with respect to the priority 13 
listing of such projects and in such estimated amounts as approved by 14 
said committee prior to February 1, 2021, as follows: 15  Raised Bill No. 6617 
 
 
LCO 4889  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06617-
R01-HB.docx }   
2 of 6 
 
(1) Estimated Grant Commitments. 16 
T1  School District 	Estimated Estimated 
T2  School 	Project Costs Grant 
T3  Project Number   
T4     
T5  NORTH BRANFORD   
T6  North Branford High School   
T7  21DASY099053N0621 	$88,242,390 $29,100,282 
T8     
T9  NORWALK   
T10  Cranberry Elementary School   
T11  21DASY103252N0621 	$45,000,000 $10,125,000 
T12     
T13  SOUTH WINDSOR   
T14  Pleasant Valley Elementary School   
T15  21DASY132093N0621 	$58,500,000 $22,148,100 
T16     
T17  TORRINGTON   
T18  Torrington Middle & High School   
T19  21DASY143076N0621 	$159,575,000 $100,308,845 
T20     
T21  WEST HAVEN   
T22  Washington Elementary School   
T23  21DASY156142N0621 	$38,803,926 $26,052,956 
T24     
T25  DANBURY   
T26  Ellsworth Avenue School Annex   
T27  21DASY034150EA0621 	$9,600,000 $6,137,280 
T28     
T29  HARTFORD   
T30  Betances Learning Lab Magnet 
School 
  
T31  21DASY064316RNV0621 	$43,709,774 $41,524,285 
T32     
T33  HARTFORD   
T34  E. B. Kennelly School   
T35  21DASY064317RNV0621 	$51,416,225 $48,845,414 
T36     
T37  HARTFORD   
T38  Fred D. Wish Museum School    Raised Bill No. 6617 
 
 
LCO 4889  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06617-
R01-HB.docx }   
3 of 6 
 
T39  21DASY064318RNV0621 	$49,320,000 $46,854,000 
T40     
T41  KILLINGLY   
T42  Killingly Memorial School   
T43  21DASY069069RNV0621 	$34,000,000 $24,981,400 
T44     
T45  NEWINGTON   
T46  Anna Reynolds Elementary School   
T47  21DASY094109RNV0621 	$35,500,000 $20,792,350 
T48     
T49  NORWALK   
T50  Naramake Elementary School   
T51  21DASY103253EA0621 	$3,500,000 $1,137,500 
T52     
T53  WESTPORT   
T54  Coleytown Middle School   
T55  21DASY158099RNV0621 	$32,372,235 $8,820,830 
T56     
T57  REGIONAL DISTRICT 1   
T58  Housatonic Valley Regional High 
School 
  
T59  21DASY201049VE0621 	$319,533 $255,626 
T60     
   
T61  LEARN   
T62  LEARN Ocean Avenue Academy   
T63  21DASY245089SP0621 	$9,851,000 $7,880,800 
 
(2) Previously Authorized Projects That Have Changed Substantially 17 
in Scope or Cost which are Seeking Reauthorization. 18 
T64  School District 	Authorized Requested 
T65  School   
T66  Project Number   
T67     
T68  WINDHAM   
T69  Windham High School   
T70  163-0079 RNV   
T71     
T72  Estimated…   
T73   Total Project Costs 	$71,670,200 $112,329,500  Raised Bill No. 6617 
 
 
LCO 4889  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06617-
R01-HB.docx }   
4 of 6 
 
T74   Total Grant 	$71,670,200 $112,329,500 
 
Sec. 2. Subsection (b) of section 10-291 of the general statutes is 19 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 20 
2021): 21 
(b) The Department of Administrative Services shall not approve a 22 
school building project plan or site, as applicable, if: 23 
(1) The site is in an area of moderate or high radon potential, as 24 
indicated in the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection's 25 
Radon Potential Map, or similar subsequent publications, except where 26 
the school building project plan incorporates construction techniques to 27 
mitigate radon levels in the air of the facility; 28 
(2) The plans incorporate new roof construction or total replacement 29 
of an existing roof and do not provide for the following: (A) A minimum 30 
roof pitch that conforms with the requirements of the State Building 31 
Code, (B) a minimum twenty-year unlimited manufacturer's guarantee 32 
for water tightness covering material and workmanship on the entire 33 
roofing system, (C) the inclusion of vapor retarders, insulation, bitumen, 34 
felts, membranes, flashings, metals, decks and any other feature 35 
required by the roof design, and (D) that all manufacturer's materials to 36 
be used in the roofing system are specified to meet the latest standards 37 
for individual components of the roofing systems of the American 38 
Society for Testing and Materials; 39 
(3) In the case of a major alteration, renovation or extension of a 40 
building to be used for public school purposes, the plans do not 41 
incorporate the guidelines set forth in the Sheet Metal and Air 42 
Conditioning Contractors National Association's publication entitled 43 
"Indoor Air Quality Guidelines for Occupied Buildings Under 44 
Construction" or similar subsequent publications;  45 
(4) In the case of a new construction, extension, renovation or 46 
replacement, the plans do not provide that the building maintenance 47  Raised Bill No. 6617 
 
 
LCO 4889  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06617-
R01-HB.docx }   
5 of 6 
 
staff responsible for such facility are trained in or are receiving training 48 
in, or that the applicant plans to provide training in, the appropriate 49 
areas of plant operations including, but not limited to, heating, 50 
ventilation and air conditioning systems pursuant to section 10-231e, 51 
with specific training relative to indoor air quality; [or]  52 
(5) In the case of a project for new construction, extension, major 53 
alteration, renovation or replacement involving a school entrance for 54 
inclusion on any listing submitted to the General Assembly in 55 
accordance with section 10-283 on or after July 1, 2008, the plans do not 56 
provide for a security infrastructure for such entrance; or 57 
(6) In the case of a project for new construction, extension, major 58 
alteration, renovation or replacement on any listing submitted to the 59 
General Assembly in accordance with section 10-283 on or after July 1, 60 
2022, the plans do not provide for the installation of water bottle filling 61 
stations.  62 
Sec. 3. Section 10-292v of the general statutes is repealed and the 63 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021): 64 
[Any] (a) Notwithstanding the provisions of any special act, 65 
municipal charter, local ordinance, home rule ordinance or other 66 
ordinance, on and after July 1, 2021, the local or regional board of 67 
education for a town shall (1) establish any new school building 68 
committee [established by a town or regional school district to 69 
undertake] responsible for undertaking a school building project, as 70 
defined in section 10-282, [shall] or (2) reestablish any existing school 71 
building project committee. In establishing or reestablishing a school 72 
building committee under this section, the local or regional board of 73 
education shall appoint the members of the school building committee, 74 
provided such school building committee include at least one member 75 
who has experience in the construction industry. 76 
(b) Any school building committee reestablished under this section 77 
shall constitute a successor committee to the prior school building 78  Raised Bill No. 6617 
 
 
LCO 4889  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06617-
R01-HB.docx }   
6 of 6 
 
committee for purposes of undertaking school building projects under 79 
this chapter. 80 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 10-291(b) 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2021 10-292v 
 
ED Joint Favorable C/R 	FIN