Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06617 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/10/2021

                     
Researcher: JM 	Page 1 	5/10/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6617  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING AUTHORIZATION OF STATE GRANT 
COMMITMENTS FOR SCHOOL BUILDING PROJECTS AND 
REVISIONS TO THE SCHOOL BUILDING PROJECTS STATUTES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill authorizes 15 school construction state grant commitments 
totaling an estimated $394.9 million toward total estimated project 
costs of $659.7 million. It also reauthorizes one high school renovation 
project with additional estimated project costs of $40.7 million (see 
BACKGROUND).  
Beginning in fiscal year 2022, the bill requires water bottle filling 
stations in all significant school construction projects, requires boards 
of education to reconstitute local school building committees, and sets 
new requirements for construction managers to be eligible to self-
perform certain construction work on a school building project.  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage for the grant commitments and 
July 1, 2021, for the statutory program changes. 
§ 1 — SCHOOL CONSTRUCTION GRANT COMMITMENTS 
For each project authorized by the bill, Table 1 shows the associated 
district, school, estimates for total cost and state grant commitment, 
and state reimbursement rate, ordered by project type. 
Table 1: 2021 School Construction Grant Commitments 
District School Project 
Type 
Estimated 
Project 
Costs 
Estimated 
Grant 
Reimbursement 
Rate 
North 
Branford 
North 
Branford 
High School 
New $88,242,390  $29,100,282  32.98% 
Norwalk 
Cranberry 
Elementary 
School 
New 45,000,000  10,125,000  22.50%  2021HB-06617-R000647-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JM 	Page 2 	5/10/21 
 
South 
Windsor 
Pleasant 
Valley 
Elementary 
School 
New 58,500,000  22,148,100  37.86% 
Torrington 
Torrington 
Middle & 
High School 
New 159,575,000  100,308,845  62.86% 
West 
Haven 
Washington 
Elementary 
School 
New 38,803,926  26,052,956  67.14% 
Danbury 
Ellsworth 
Avenue 
School 
Annex 
Expansion/
Alteration 
9,600,000  6,137,280  63.93% 
Hartford 
Betances 
Learning 
Lab Magnet 
School 
Renovation 43,709,774  41,524,285  95.00% 
Hartford 
E. B. 
Kennelly 
School 
Renovation 51,416,225  48,845,414  95.00% 
Hartford 
Fred D. 
Wish 
Museum 
School 
Renovation 49,320,000  46,854,000  95.00% 
Killingly 
Killingly 
Memorial 
School 
Renovation 34,000,000  24,891,400  73.21% 
Newington 
Anna 
Reynolds 
Elementary 
School 
Renovation 35,500,000  20,792,350  58.57% 
Norwalk 
Naramake 
Elementary 
School 
Extension/
Alteration 
3,500,000  1,137,500  32.50% 
Westport 
Coleytown 
Middle 
School 
Renovation 32,372,235  8,820,830  27.25% 
Regional 
District 1 
Housatonic 
Valley 
Regional 
High School 
Vo-Ag 
Equipment 
319,533  255,626  80.00% 
LEARN 
(New 
London 
area 
regional 
educational 
service 
center) 
LEARN 
Ocean 
Avenue 
Academy 
Special 
Education 
9,851,000  7,880,800  80.00%  2021HB-06617-R000647-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JM 	Page 3 	5/10/21 
 
Totals  $659,710,983 $394,874,668 
 
Also, the bill reauthorizes one project with increased costs due to 
changes in its scope. PA 18-138 originally authorized the Windham 
High School renovation project with a total estimated project cost of 
$71,670,200 and a 79.64% state reimbursement rate for the grant. The 
bill authorizes a new total project estimated cost of $112,329,500, which 
is an increase of $40,659,300. The bill provides a total estimated grant 
commitment of $112,329,500, which is 100% of the project cost.  
§ 2 — WATER BOTTLE FILLING STATIONS 
The bill adds a requirement for water bottle filling stations to be 
included in all school building projects for new construction, 
extension, major alteration, renovation, or replacement on any project 
listing the Department of Administrative Services (DAS) submits to the 
General Assembly beginning July 1, 2022 (next year’s school 
construction priority list). It does this by prohibiting DAS from 
approving any school building project plan that does not provide for 
the installation of at least one water bottle filling station: 
1. per 100 students of the projected school building enrollment,  
2. on each new floor or wing of the school building, and  
3. in any food service area of the school building. 
§ 3 — LOCAL SCHOOL BUILDIN G PROJECT COMMITTEES 
Under current law, any school building committee established by a 
town or regional board of education to undertake a school building 
project must include at least one member who has experience in the 
construction industry. 
Beginning July 1, 2021, the bill requires local or regional boards of 
education to (1) establish a new school building committee charged 
with undertaking a school building project or (2) re-establish an 
existing school building project committee. The board of education 
must appoint the members of these committees, including at least one 
member with experience in the construction industry as under existing  2021HB-06617-R000647-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JM 	Page 4 	5/10/21 
 
law. 
The bill specifies that any committee reestablished under its 
provisions constitutes a successor committee to the prior school 
building committee for purposes of undertaking a school building 
project under the school construction statutes. 
§ 4 — CONSTRUCTION MANAGER S SELF-PERFORMING 
PROJECT WORK 
By law, most contracts and orders for school building construction 
receiving state assistance must be awarded to the lowest responsible 
qualified bidder following a public bidding invitation. The law 
provides exceptions for construction management contracts, which 
instead must be awarded from a pool of up to the four most 
responsible qualified proposers after a public selection process.  
Beginning July 1, 2021, the law also allows awarding authorities 
(e.g., boards of education), upon the written approval of the DAS 
commissioner, to permit a construction manager to self-perform part 
of the construction work if the authority and the commissioner 
determine that doing so will be more cost-effective than using a 
subcontractor. The bill additionally requires the awarding authority 
and the commissioner to determine that the construction manager has 
the requisite work experience and qualifications to self-perform the 
work. 
In order to be eligible to self-perform work, the bill requires the 
construction manager to identify the project element at the time of the 
original proposal to the owner and be (1) enrolled in a state-registered 
apprenticeship program that provides related instruction for the work 
the construction manager is seeking to self-perform and (2) 
prequalified by DAS. 
Current law requires work not done by the construction manager to 
be performed by trade subcontractors selected under a process 
approved by the DAS commissioner and the awarding authority. The 
bill instead requires the subcontractor selection to be done in 
accordance with state bidding and contracting rules that require a  2021HB-06617-R000647-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JM 	Page 5 	5/10/21 
 
competitive bidding process and awarding the job to the lowest 
responsible and qualified bidder who is prequalified by DAS. 
The bill also requires sealed bids for specific project elements, 
including from a construction manager, to be submitted 
simultaneously with the project bid and only opened at the time and 
place set in the bid solicitation notice. 
Furthermore, if the construction manager is the successful bidder 
for a project element, the manager must: 
1. not use any of the project contingency money to assist in the 
performance of self-performed work; 
2. perform the work, other than limited portions that would 
typically be done by specialty subcontractors, with employees 
who are on the construction manager’s payroll and are properly 
classified under the prevailing wage law; and  
3. submit all change orders on self-performed work to be reviewed 
by the owner or the owner’s representative. 
BACKGROUND 
State School Construction Grant Program 
Under the state school construction grant program, the state 
reimburses towns and local districts for a percentage of eligible school 
construction costs through general obligation bonds (with less wealthy 
municipalities receiving a higher reimbursement). The municipalities 
pay the remaining costs. School districts must begin project 
construction within two years of grant commitment to minimize 
potential cost increases. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Education Committee 
Joint Favorable Change of Reference - FIN 
Yea 38 Nay 0 (03/22/2021) 
 
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee  2021HB-06617-R000647-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JM 	Page 6 	5/10/21 
 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 42 Nay 4 (04/22/2021)