Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06622 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/26/2021

                     
Researcher: JKL 	Page 1 	5/26/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6622 (as amended by House "A")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING PRESCRIPTION DRUG FORMULARIES 
AND LISTS OF COVERED DRUGS.  
 
SUMMARY 
Beginning January 1, 2022, this bill prohibits health carriers (e.g., 
insurers and HMOs) offering a health benefit plan that covers 
prescription drugs and uses a formulary (i.e., a list of covered 
prescription drugs) from removing from the formulary or moving to a 
higher cost-sharing tier, any covered drug during the plan year except 
as specifically allowed (see below). This applies regardless of any other 
general statute provision (see BACKGROUND). 
Additionally, the bill requires the Office of Health Strategy (OHS), 
at least annually, to conduct a study to determine the financial impact 
of the bill’s requirements on the cost of commercial health plans in the 
state, including those offered and sold on the exchange (i.e., Access 
Health CT). Beginning by January 31, 2023, and annually thereafter, 
OHS must report the study results for the preceding year to the 
insurance commissioner and the Insurance and Real Estate Committee. 
*House Amendment “A” adds the OHS study and reporting 
provisions. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  January 1, 2022 
PERMITTED FORMULARY CHANGES 
Under the bill, a health carrier may remove a prescription drug from 
a formulary with at least 90 days’ advance notice to a covered person 
and his or her treating physician if the U.S. Food and Drug 
Administration (FDA): 
1. issues an announcement, guidance, or similar statement 
questioning the drug’s clinical safety, unless the treating  2021HB-06622-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 2 	5/26/21 
 
physician states in writing that the drug remains medically 
necessary for the covered person, or 
2. approves the drug for over-the-counter use. 
The bill allows a carrier to move a drug to a higher cost-sharing tier 
if it is available in-network for $40 or less per month in any tier. It also 
allows a carrier to move a brand name drug to a higher cost-sharing 
tier if it adds an FDA-approved generic alternative to the formulary at 
a lower cost-sharing tier than the brand name drug. 
Lastly, the bill specifies that it does not prevent or prohibit a carrier 
from adding a prescription drug to a formulary at any time. 
APPLICABILITY OF THE BILL’S PROVISIONS 
The bill generally applies to each insurer, HMO, hospital or medical 
service corporation, fraternal benefit society, or other entity that 
delivers, issues, renews, amends, or continues individual or group 
health insurance policies in Connecticut on or after January 1, 2022, 
that cover (1) basic hospital expenses, (2) basic medical-surgical 
expenses, (3) major medical expenses, or (4) hospital or medical 
services. However, it does not apply to a grandfathered health plan, 
which is a plan that existed on March 23, 2010, and has not made 
significant coverage changes since.  
Because of the federal Employee Retirement Income Security Act 
(ERISA), state insurance benefit mandates do not apply to self-insured 
benefit plans. 
BACKGROUND 
Related Law 
The law prohibits health carriers that cover outpatient prescription 
drugs from denying coverage for any drug removed from a formulary 
if (1) an insured person was using the drug to treat a chronic illness 
and had been covered for it before the removal and (2) his or her 
attending physician states in writing, after the removal, that the drug is 
medically necessary and why it is more beneficial than other formulary 
drugs (CGS §§ 38a-492f & 38a-518f).  2021HB-06622-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 3 	5/26/21 
 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Insurance and Real Estate Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 18 Nay 0 (03/22/2021)