Researcher: JSB Page 1 4/21/21 OLR Bill Analysis sHB 6645 AN ACT CONCERNING THE STATE PLAN OF CONSERVATION AND DEVELOPMENT. SUMMARY Under current law, the Office of Policy and Management (OPM) secretary must revise the State Plan of Conservation and Development (POCD) every five years and submit a final proposed plan to the Continuing Legislative Committee on State Planning and Development (Continuing Committee), which, after a public hearing, may recommend the General Assembly approve or disapprove it (CGS § 16a-30). (The POCD helps state agencies make decisions consistent with the state’s development and conservation goals.) The bill instead requires the OPM secretary to revise the plan in the year immediately before the year in which the General Assembly is expected to adopt it, but no more than four years after it was last adopted. The bill establishes a schedule for the next POCD revision, specifying that the: 1. draft revised plan is due to the Continuing Committee for preliminary review before September 1, 2022; 2. OPM secretary may begin further revisions after December 1, 2022; and 3. first revised plan must be made publicly available by March 1, 2023. After making the first revision available, as under existing law, the secretary must hold public hearings on the plan and solicit comments. Under the bill, the OPM secretary must submit the final proposed 2024-2029 POCD to the Continuing Committee by December 1, 2023. 2021HB-06645-R000549-BA.DOCX Researcher: JSB Page 2 4/21/21 Lastly, the bill specifies that the 2018-2023 POCD, once adopted by the legislature, is effective from adoption and until the next plan is adopted. (The 2018-2023 POCD has not yet been adopted.) EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage COMMITTEE ACTION Planning and Development Committee Joint Favorable Substitute Yea 26 Nay 0 (03/31/2021)