Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06653 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/13/2021

                     
Researcher: ND 	Page 1 	4/13/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 6653  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING HEALTHY HOMES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Department of Housing (DOH), by January 1, 
2022, to establish a pilot program that provides at least 500 residential 
dwellings with (1) energy efficiency retrofits (e.g., retrofitting existing 
HVAC systems) and (2) residential improvements that reduce health 
and safety hazards found in these dwellings, such as the removal,  
remediation, and abatement of lead, radon, or other contaminants. The 
program ends on December 31, 2031. 
Under the bill, the pilot program is funded through the Healthy 
Homes Fund (see BACKGROUND). The bill requires the DOH 
commissioner, beginning on January 1, 2022, and annually after that 
until the program ends, to spend $500,000 from the fund for the 
program and any related administrative expenses. These expenses may 
include hiring employees and entering into contracts.  
The bill also requires the DOH commissioner to report on the pilot 
program’s status and expenditures to the Appropriations, Housing, 
Energy and Technology, and Planning and Development committees. 
The commissioner must do this annually starting by January 1, 2023, 
until the pilot program ends.  
Lastly, the bill makes technical and conforming changes.  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  October 1, 2021 
PILOT PROGRAM 
Purpose 
Under the bill, the pilot program must annually provide at least 500 
residential dwellings with:  2021HB-06653-R000415-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 2 	4/13/21 
 
1. energy efficient retrofits, including retrofitting existing heating, 
ventilation, or air conditioning systems; and 
2. residential improvements that reduce health and safety hazards 
in these dwellings, including the removal, remediation, and 
abatement of lead, radon, and other contaminants. 
The bill requires energy efficiency retrofits to be consistent with 
guidelines in the Conservation and Load Management Plan that 
electric companies, in coordination with gas companies, submit to the 
Energy Conservation Management Board under existing law. 
Contracts and Employees 
The bill also authorizes the DOH commissioner to contract with 
nonprofit organizations to hire in-home environmental assessors to 
perform the energy efficiency retrofits and residential improvements 
described above.  
To qualify for this employment, an in-home environmental assessor 
must: 
1. for energy efficient retrofits, (a) be certified to perform these 
retrofits by a nationally recognized certifying organization or 
(b) have earned a certificate in energy retrofits, in-home 
environmental assessments, or a related field from an accredited 
higher education institution, or 
2. for residential improvements to reduce health and safety 
hazards, (a) be certified to remove, remediate, or abate these 
hazards by a nationally recognized certifying organization or (b) 
have earned a certificate in the removal, remediation, or 
abatement of these hazards, or a related field, from an 
accredited higher education institution.  
BACKGROUND 
Healthy Homes Fund  
By law, the Healthy Homes Fund is a separate nonlapsing General 
Fund account used to support (1) the Crumbling Foundations  2021HB-06653-R000415-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 3 	4/13/21 
 
Assistance Fund, which assists homeowners with concrete foundations 
damaged by pyrrhotite (i.e., crumbling foundations); (2) homes with 
structure subsidence or water damage in New Haven and 
Woodbridge; and (3) DOH lead removal, remediation, and abatement 
activities. The fund is capitalized by revenue from an annual $12 
surcharge on certain homeowners’ insurance policies.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Health Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 31 Nay 2 (03/26/2021)