Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06686 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                     
 
 
House Bill No. 6686 
 
Special Act No. 21-4 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E DECLARATION AND RE NEWAL OF 
CIVIL PREPAREDNESS A ND PUBLIC HEALTH EME RGENCIES BY 
THE GOVERNOR. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (b) of special act 21-2 is amended to read as 
follows (Effective from passage): 
(b) Notwithstanding the provisions of sections 19a-131a and 28-9 of 
the general statutes, from [the effective date of this section and until May 
20, 2021] March 31, 2021, and through July 20, 2021, the Governor is 
hereby authorized to renew said public health and civil preparedness 
emergency declarations through [May 20, 2021] July 20, 2021. The 
provisions of this subsection shall not limit the Governor, or any 
department head, state agency or municipality from exercising any 
authority granted under said sections of the general statutes, from [the 
effective date of this section through May 20, 2021] March 31, 2021, and 
through July 20, 2021, provided the exercise of such authority is done in 
accordance with said sections of the general statutes. After [May 20, 
2021] July 20, 2021, nothing herein shall affect or limit any authority 
conveyed pursuant to section 19a-131a or 28-9 of the general statutes. 
Approved May 13, 2021