Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00120 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/14/2021

                     
Researcher: GM 	Page 1 	5/14/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 120 (File 275, as amended by Senate "A")*  
 
AN ACT ALLOWING POLICE OFFICERS TO WEAR RELIGIOUS 
HEAD COVERINGS AS PART OF A POLICE UNIFORM.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires each law enforcement unit, by October 1, 2021, to 
adopt or amend a policy to allow their police officers to wear religious 
head coverings that correspond to their religious beliefs while on duty 
and wearing a uniform or other authorized attire, except where the 
units require their officers to use tight-fitting protective headgear. 
Additionally, the bill requires the Police Officer Standards and 
Training Council (POST) to develop, by January 1, 2022, a model 
policy on the use of social media by law enforcement units and police 
officers while they are on duty. The policy must include at least the 
following: 
1. guidelines on using a unit’s social media account, 
2. the responsibilities of any unit employee who manages and 
approves content to post on a unit’s account, 
3. procedures for when the unauthorized use of a unit’s account is 
detected, 
4. guidelines to ensure compliance with applicable state or federal 
law, 
5. guidelines on what is and is not suitable for posting on a unit’s 
account,  
6. methods to limit indecent or obscene content on a unit’s 
account, and 
7. the personal use of social media by a police officer while on  2021SB-00120-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 2 	5/14/21 
 
duty. 
By July 1, 2022, the bill requires each law enforcement unit to adopt 
and maintain a written policy that meets or exceeds the model policy’s 
standards. 
*Senate Amendment “A” (1) removes the requirement that units 
adopt or amend a policy to establish general standards for the personal 
appearance of their officers while they are on duty and wearing a 
uniform or other authorized attire and (2) requires POST to develop a 
model social media policy for units and on-duty police officers.   
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage 
DEFINITIONS 
By law and under the bill, a “law enforcement unit” is any state or 
municipal agency or department (or tribal agency or department 
created and governed under a memorandum of agreement) whose 
primary functions include enforcing criminal or traffic laws; 
preserving public order; protecting life and property; or preventing, 
detecting, or investigating crime (CGS § 7-294a).  
“Police officers” are sworn members of an organized local police 
department or the State Police; appointed constables who perform 
criminal law enforcement duties; special police officers appointed 
under law (e.g., those appointed to investigate public assistance fraud); 
or any members of a law enforcement unit who perform police duties 
(CGS § 7-294a).  
“Social media” is an electronic medium where users may create and 
view user-generated content, such as uploaded or downloaded videos 
or photographs, blogs, video blogs, podcasts, or instant messages (CGS 
§ 9-601). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Safety and Security Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 23 Nay 2 (03/18/2021)  2021SB-00120-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: GM 	Page 3 	5/14/21