Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00418 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/16/2021

                     
Researcher: ND 	Page 1 	3/16/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 418  
 
AN ACT INCREASING THE PERSONAL NEEDS ALLOWANCE FOR 
CERTAIN LONG -TERM CARE FACILITY RESIDENTS AND 
AUTHORIZING A DEDUCTION FOR CONSERVATOR EXPENSES 
FROM THE AMOUNT OF INCOME A MEDICAID RECIPIENT 
APPLIES TO THE COST OF CARE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Department of Social Services (DSS) 
commissioner to increase, from $60 to $72.75 per month, the personal 
needs allowance (PNA) provided to long-term care facility residents 
who receive Medicaid or certain other federal or state assistance (see 
BACKGROUND).  
The bill also requires the commissioner to amend the Medicaid state 
plan by December 31, 2021, to allow the deduction of certain 
conservator expenses when calculating a Medicaid-eligible nursing 
home resident’s applied income. In general, these residents must 
spend any income they have on their care, except for certain 
allowances (i.e., applied income).  
The bill also: 
1. requires DSS to increase a nursing home’s Medicaid payment by 
the amount of the reduced applied income; 
2. requires the DSS commissioner to annually notify the probate 
court administrator of the total conservatorship expenses 
deducted from the applied income in the preceding fiscal year; 
3. requires the probate court administrator to annually transfer 
from the Probate Court Administration Fund to DSS an amount 
equal to half of such conservatorship expenses for Medicaid-
eligible nursing home residents for that year;  2021SB-00418-R000060-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 2 	3/16/21 
 
4. requires the DSS commissioner to deduct a baseline of $125 in 
conservatorship expenses from a nursing home resident’s 
applied income and approve deductions that exceed this 
amount under certain conditions; and  
5. prohibits DSS from treating any probate court-approved 
conservator or fiduciary fees as an improper asset transfer for 
purposes of imposing a penalty period.  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021, except the provisions on Medicaid 
applied income take effect upon passage. 
APPLIED INCOME 
Medicaid State Plan Amendment 
The bill requires the DSS commissioner to amend the Medicaid state 
plan by December 31, 2021, to allow the deduction of the following 
conservatorship expenses: 
1. compensation for the individual’s conservator, in amounts 
approved by the probate court; 
2. probate court filing fees and expenses, including 
conservatorship fees, fiduciary accounting fees, and 
miscellaneous fees (see BACKGROUND); 
3. premiums for any bond the probate court requires; and  
4. any other fiduciary expenses the probate court approved that 
are permissible under federal law.  
Under the bill, whenever these conservator fees and expenses are 
deducted from the applied income, DSS must increase the nursing 
home’s Medicaid payment by the amount of the reduced applied 
income.  
The DSS commissioner must seek approval from the federal Centers 
for Medicare and Medicaid Services (CMS) for the state plan 
amendment. The bill applies to conservator expenses incurred on or 
after October 1, 2021, or the date CMS approves the state plan  2021SB-00418-R000060-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 3 	3/16/21 
 
amendment, whichever is later.  
Notification and Transfer of Funds 
The bill requires the DSS commissioner, by December 31, 2022, and 
annually thereafter, to calculate the total conservatorship expenses 
deducted from a nursing home resident’s applied income in the 
preceding fiscal year and inform the probate court administrator in 
writing of the amount.  
Within 30 days after receiving the commissioner’s calculation, the 
probate court administrator must transfer from the Probate Court 
Administration Fund to DSS funds equal to half of the conservatorship 
expenses for that year.   
Deduction Amount 
Under the bill, DSS must deduct from a conserved nursing home 
resident’s applied income a baseline of $125 per month in 
conservatorship expenses. The DSS commissioner must approve 
deductions above this amount if they are approved by the probate 
court (1) when the conserved nursing home resident is initially granted 
Medicaid benefits and (2) upon eligibility redeterminations.  
PENALTY PERIOD 
Under federal law, DSS must impose a penalty period when 
individuals transfer assets for less than fair market value in the 60 
months before applying for Medicaid coverage (i.e., improper asset 
transfer). The bill prohibits DSS from treating any probate court-
approved conservator or fiduciary fees as an improper asset transfer.  
By law, the penalty period (in months) is generally calculated by 
dividing the value of all assets transferred during the 60 months before 
application by the average monthly cost to a private patient of nursing 
facility services in the state or community. Medicaid does not pay for 
long-term care services and supports during the penalty period.  
BACKGROUND 
Medicaid Personal Needs Allowance  2021SB-00418-R000060-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 4 	3/16/21 
 
Covered facilities include nursing homes, chronic disease hospitals, 
intermediate care facilities for individuals with intellectual disabilities, 
and state humane institutions. Residents of these facilities who receive 
Medicaid apply their monthly income (e.g., Social Security) towards 
the cost of their care. But federal law allows them to keep a portion of 
this income (the PNA) to pay for incidental items, such as haircuts, 
telephone expenses, newspapers, or hobbies. Facilities deposit the 
PNA into residents’ personal fund accounts.  
Probate Court Fees 
By law, the general fee for most probate court matters related to 
conservatorship is $250 (CGS § 45a-106a). This includes filing motions 
to (1) appoint a conservator, (2) change residence or placement in a 
long-term care facility, and (3) terminate a conservatorship.  
The basic fee for a fiduciary to file an account in the probate court in 
any matter other than estate settlement is at least $50 and up to $500 
per year, based on a formula (CGS § 45a-108a). 
The law also allows the probate court to charge fees for 
miscellaneous expenses (i.e., filing or copying certain documents) 
(CGS § 45a-109).  
The law allows an indigent petitioner or applicant to the probate 
court to apply for a fee waiver (CGS § 45a-111). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Aging Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 15 Nay 0 (03/02/2021)