LCO No. 3873 1 of 5 General Assembly Committee Bill No. 626 January Session, 2021 LCO No. 3873 Referred to Committee on COMMERCE Introduced by: (CE) AN ACT ESTABLISHING AN ENTERPRISE ZONE IN THE TOWN OF PLYMOUTH. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. Subsection (c) of section 32-70 of the general statutes is 1 repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2 2021): 3 (c) (1) On or before September 30, 1993, the Commissioner of 4 Economic and Community Development shall approve the designation 5 of ten areas as enterprise zones, not more than four of which shall be in 6 municipalities with a population greater than eighty thousand and not 7 more than six of which shall be in municipalities with a population of 8 less than eighty thousand. 9 (2) (A) On or after October 1, 1993, the commissioner shall approve 10 the designation of two areas as enterprise zones. Each such area shall be 11 in a municipality with a population of less than eighty thousand, in 12 which there are one or more base or plant closures. Such municipalities 13 shall be in different counties. If the commissioner approves the 14 designation of an area of a municipality as an enterprise zone because 15 Committee Bill No. 626 LCO No. 3873 2 of 5 of a plant closure in the municipality and there is a closure of another 16 plant in any other municipality in the state by the same business, the 17 commissioner shall also designate an area in such other municipality as 18 an enterprise zone. If any such designated area includes a portion of a 19 census tract in which any such base or plant is located, the census tracts 20 in such area shall not be required to meet the eligibility criteria set forth 21 under subsection (a) of this section for enterprise zone designation. If 22 any such area is located elsewhere in the municipality, the census tracts 23 in such area shall meet such eligibility criteria. As used in this 24 subparagraph, (i) "base" means any United States or state of Connecticut 25 military base or facility located in whole or in part within the state; (ii) 26 "plant" means any manufacturing business or economic base business, 27 as defined in section 32-222; and (iii) "closure" means any reduction or 28 transfer in military personnel or civilian employment at one or more 29 bases or plants in a municipality, which occurred between July 1, 1989, 30 and July 1, 1993, or is scheduled to occur between July 1, 1993, and July 31 1, 1996, and exceeds two thousand persons. Such employment figures 32 shall be certified by the Labor Department. (B) On or after October 1, 33 1993, the commissioner shall approve the designation of three other 34 areas as enterprise zones, one of which shall be in a municipality with a 35 population greater than eighty thousand and two of which shall be in 36 municipalities with a population of less than eighty thousand. The 37 census tracts in such areas shall meet the eligibility criteria set forth 38 under subsection (a) of this section for enterprise zone designation. The 39 commissioner shall approve the designation of enterprise zones under 40 this subparagraph for those municipalities which he or she determines 41 to have experienced the largest increases in poverty from October 1, 42 1989, to October 1, 1993, inclusive, based on a weighted average of the 43 unemployment rate, caseload under the temporary family assistance 44 program and per capita income of less than ninety per cent of the state 45 average between 1985 and 1989. In making his determination, the 46 commissioner may also consider the vacancy rates for commercial and 47 industrial facilities in a municipality and a municipality's program for 48 the implementation of an effective enterprise zone program. To the 49 Committee Bill No. 626 LCO No. 3873 3 of 5 extent appropriate, the commissioner shall use the Regional Economic 50 Models, Inc. (REMI) system in making the calculations for such 51 determination. (C) Notwithstanding the provisions of subsection (a) of 52 this section, municipalities that were not distressed municipalities 53 under the provisions of subsection (b) of section 32-9p on February 1, 54 1986, shall be eligible to designate areas as enterprise zones under 55 subparagraph (A) or (B) of this subdivision. 56 (3) On or after July 1, 2014, the commissioner shall approve the 57 designation of two areas as enterprise zones as follows: (A) One area 58 shall be in a municipality with a population of not more than fifty 59 thousand, as enumerated in the 2010 federal decennial census, and in 60 which is located a United States Postal Service processing center that at 61 any point in time employed one thousand or more persons, except that 62 such area shall only be designated as an enterprise zone for a term of 63 five years from the date any portion of the area is transferred, provided 64 such transfer occurs on or after July 1, 2014, and (B) one area shall be in 65 a municipality with a population of not less than seven thousand eight 66 hundred and not more than seven thousand nine hundred, as 67 enumerated in the 2010 federal decennial census, and having a total area 68 of not more than 12.2 square miles. Each such enterprise zone area shall 69 consist of two contiguous United States census tracts, contiguous 70 portions of such census tracts or all or a portion of an individual census 71 tract, as determined in accordance with the most recent federal 72 decennial census and, if such area is covered by zoning, a portion of 73 such area shall be zoned to allow commercial or industrial activity. The 74 census tracts in each such enterprise zone area shall not be required to 75 meet the eligibility criteria set forth in subsection (a) of this section. 76 Notwithstanding the provisions of subsection (a) of this section, 77 municipalities that were not distressed municipalities under the 78 provisions of subsection (b) of section 32-9p on February 1, 1986, shall 79 be eligible to designate areas as enterprise zones under this subdivision. 80 (4) On or after July 1, 2021, the commissioner shall approve the 81 designation of one area, which shall be in a municipality with a 82 Committee Bill No. 626 LCO No. 3873 4 of 5 population of not less than twelve thousand two hundred and not more 83 than twelve thousand three hundred, having a total area of not more 84 than 22.34 square miles and having an average population density of 85 not more than 559.3 persons per square mile of land, as enumerated in 86 the 2010 federal decennial census. Such enterprise zone area shall 87 consist of two contiguous United States census tracts, contiguous 88 portions of such census tracts or all or a portion of an individual census 89 tract, as determined in accordance with the most recent federal 90 decennial census and, if such area is covered by zoning, a portion of 91 such area shall be zoned to allow commercial or industrial activity. The 92 census tracts in such enterprise zone area shall not be required to meet 93 the eligibility criteria set forth in subsection (a) of this section. 94 Notwithstanding the provisions of subsection (a) of this section, 95 municipalities that were not distressed municipalities under the 96 provisions of subsection (b) of section 32-9p on February 1, 1986, shall 97 be eligible to designate areas as enterprise zones under this subdivision. 98 [(4)] (5) The commissioner shall not approve the designation of more 99 than one enterprise zone in any municipality. The commissioner shall 100 adopt regulations in accordance with chapter 54 concerning such 101 additional qualifications for an area to become an enterprise zone as he 102 or she deems necessary. The commissioner may remove the designation 103 of any area he or she has approved as an enterprise zone if such area no 104 longer meets the criteria for designation as such an area set forth in this 105 section or in regulations adopted pursuant to this section, provided no 106 such designation shall be removed less than ten years from the original 107 date of approval of such zone. The commissioner may designate any 108 additional area as an enterprise zone if that area is designated as an 109 enterprise zone, empowerment zone or enterprise community pursuant 110 to any federal legislation. 111 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Section 1 July 1, 2021 32-70(c) Committee Bill No. 626 LCO No. 3873 5 of 5 Statement of Purpose: To require the designation of an area within the town of Plymouth as an enterprise zone. [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.] Co-Sponsors: SEN. MARTIN, 31st Dist.; REP. BETTS, 78th Dist. S.B. 626