Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00817 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 07/26/2021

                    O F F I C E O F L E G I S L A T I V E R E S E A R C H 
P U B L I C A C T S U M M A R Y 
 
  	Page 1 
PA 21-7—SB 817 
Aging Committee 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING SE NIOR CENTERS AND SEN IOR CRIME 
PREVENTION EDUCATION 
 
SUMMARY: This act establishes a 14-member statewide senior center working 
group to develop a coordinated plan for senior centers and municipal services for 
seniors. It also requires the Commission on Women, Children, Seniors, Equity, 
and Opportunity, within available appropriations, to assist senior centers and 
assign or appoint necessary personnel to do so.  
By law, municipalities must appoint a municipal agent for the elderly to help 
seniors learn about community resources and file for benefits. The act expands the 
list of potential appointees to include senior center staff members. Prior law 
limited potential appointees to (1) members of a municipal agency that serves the 
elderly or (2) municipal residents with a demonstrated interest in the elderly or 
who have been involved in aging programs.  
The act also authorizes any one or more municipalities, or private 
organizations that serve older adults and are designated to act as agents of one or 
more municipalities, to establish a “multipurpose senior center,” which is a 
community facility that organizes and provides a broad spectrum of senior 
services, including recreational activities and health (including mental and 
behavioral health), social, nutritional, and educational services (42 U.S.C. § 
3002).  
Additionally, the act expands the scope of the state’s Community Response 
Education Program to include resources for community programs and education 
on senior sexual assault and abuse safety, prevention, and risk reduction. This 
program, within available appropriations, offers certain resources to 
neighborhoods and municipalities that are notified that a registered sex offender is 
living there or plans to do so.  
Lastly, the act makes technical changes.  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  October 1, 2021, except the provision on the Community 
Response Education Program takes effect July 1, 2021.  
 
§ 4 — STATEWIDE SENIOR CENTER WORKGROUP  
 
 Membership  
 
The act establishes a 14-member statewide senior center working group to 
develop a coordinated plan for senior centers and municipal services for older 
adults. The group’s members must include:  
1. the aging and disability services and social services commissioners, or 
their designees;   O L R P U B L I C A C T S U M M A R Y 
 	Page 2 of 4  
2. the executive director of the Commission on Women, Children, Seniors, 
Equity and Opportunity; 
3. two representatives of the Connecticut Association of Senior Center 
Personnel, appointed by the Senate majority leader, who may be 
legislators;  
4. one representative of the Connecticut Association of Municipal Agents for 
the Elderly, appointed by the governor; 
5. one representative of the Connecticut Local Administrators of Social 
Services, appointed by the House minority leader and who may be a 
legislator;  
6. five representatives of senior centers, with one each from the state’s five 
elderly planning and services areas, two each appointed by the House 
speaker and Senate president, and one appointed by the House majority 
leader, all of whom may be legislators;  
7. one representative of a nonprofit senior center, appointed by the governor; 
and  
8. one representative, who may be a legislator, from a National Institute of 
Senior Centers (NISC)-accredited senior center, appointed by the Senate 
minority leader.  
Appointing authorities must make initial appointments by October 31, 2021, 
and fill any vacancies. The commission’s executive director serves as the working 
group’s chairperson and must hold the first meeting by November 30, 2021.  
The commission’s administrative staff serve as the working group’s 
administrative staff.  
 
Duties  
 
The act requires the working group to: 
1. develop an annual plan to support and develop senior centers and 
municipal services for older adults, including identifying training needs 
and coordinating existing resources;  
2. evaluate the feasibility of implementing standards for delivering core 
services and make recommendations for these standards, including those 
allowing for parity of core services across municipalities while 
maintaining service delivery flexibility;  
3. consult with the five area agencies on aging and other agencies; 
4. facilitate coordination and communication among senior centers and 
municipal services for older adults with executive branch departments, 
including the departments of aging and disability services, housing, mental 
health and addiction services, public health, social services, and 
transportation, as well as with community agencies and initiatives 
impacting older adults; 
5. develop and provide access to best practices and procedures for senior 
centers and municipal services for older adults; and  
6. recommend any necessary appropriations or legislative changes to the 
legislature’s Aging, Housing, Human Services, Planning and  O L R P U B L I C A C T S U M M A R Y 
 	Page 3 of 4  
Development, Public Health, and Transportation committees.  
 
Report 
 
By January 1, 2023, the working group must report its findings and 
recommendations to the Aging, Housing, Human Services, Planning and 
Development, Public Health, and Transportation committees. The working group 
terminates when it submits the report or January 1, 2023, whichever is later.  
 
§ 3 — COMMISSION ASSISTANC E TO SENIOR CENTERS  
 
The act requires the Commission on Women, Children, Seniors, Equity and 
Opportunity, within available appropriations, to provide assistance to senior 
centers and assign or appoint necessary personnel to do so. Assistance may 
include:  
1. establishing and maintaining a list of senior centers and municipal services 
for older adults, as well as a list of resources for their staff; 
2. developing technical assistance for the staff, directly or by referral to 
experts; 
3. communicating regularly with the staff about local, state, and federal 
support and services that interest them; and  
4. facilitating the statewide senior center working group, as described above.  
 
§ 2 — MULTIPURPOSE SENIOR CENTERS  
 
Under the act, a multi-purpose senior center may provide the following 
services:  
1. nutrition services, 
2. health and wellness programs, 
3. employment assistance,  
4. intergenerational initiatives,  
5. community service and civic engagement opportunities,  
6. public benefits counseling,  
7. socialization and educational opportunities,  
8. transportation,  
9. peer counseling,  
10. financial and retirement counseling,  
11. arts and recreation programs, and  
12. case management services. 
 
§ 5 — COMMUNITY RESPONSE E DUCATION PROGRAM 
 
The act expands the allowable scope of the state’s Community Response 
Education Program to include resources for: 
1. police departments and municipal officials to provide programs on senior 
citizen sexual assault and abuse safety, prevention, and risk reduction and   O L R P U B L I C A C T S U M M A R Y 
 	Page 4 of 4  
2. educating seniors, in addition to families and children as under current 
law, on preventing and avoiding sexual abuse and assault.  
Under existing law, the Court Support Services Division (in conjunction with 
experts in related fields) administers the program, within available appropriations, 
to help neighborhoods, parents, and children learn how to better protect 
themselves from sexual assault and sexual abuse. The act specifies that 
neighborhoods include senior centers or other facilities serving or housing 
seniors.