Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00837 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/03/2021

                        
 
LCO No. 2645  	1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 837  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 2645 
 
 
Referred to Committee on ENVIRONMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(ENV)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E USE OF PERFLUOROAL KYL OR 
POLYFLUOROALKYL SUBS TANCES IN CLASS B FIREFIGHTING 
FOAM. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) As used in this section: 1 
(1) "Perfluoroalkyl or polyfluoroalkyl substance" means a class of 2 
fluorinated organic chemicals containing at least one fully fluorinated 3 
carbon atom; 4 
(2) "Class B firefighting foam" means a foam used for the purpose of 5 
extinguishing flammable liquid fires; and 6 
(3) "Testing" includes calibration testing, conformance testing and 7 
fixed system testing as required by state or municipal law or policy. 8 
(b) On and after July 1, 2022, no person, local government or state 9 
agency may use a class B firefighting foam that contains an intentionally 10 
added perfluoroalkyl or polyfluoroalkyl substance in any amount for 11 
training purposes. 12  Raised Bill No.  837 
 
 
 
LCO No. 2645   	2 of 2 
 
(c) On or after July 1, 2023, no person shall use a class B firefighting 13 
foam that contains an intentionally added perfluoroalkyl or 14 
polyfluoroalkyl substance for any firefighting purpose unless such fire 15 
is a petroleum-based fire and the Commissioner of Energy and 16 
Environmental Protection fails to identify an alternative to such use by 17 
April 1, 2022. 18 
(d) Not later than October 1, 2022, the Commissioner of Energy and 19 
Environmental Protection shall develop a take-back program for 20 
municipal sources of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances that 21 
results in the application of best management practices for the disposal 22 
of such substances. 23 
(e) The provisions of this section may be enforced, within available 24 
appropriations, by the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental 25 
Protection. 26 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To prohibit the use of firefighting foam containing PFAS for training 
purposes and establish a take-back program for such products. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]