Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00843 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/07/2021

                     
Researcher: JKL 	Page 1 	4/7/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
SB 843  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE REGULATION OF INSURANCE IN 
THIS STATE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes changes to two unrelated insurance statutes 
concerning Medicare supplement (Medigap) plans and the property 
and casualty “flex rating” law.  
The bill allows insurers, HMOs, and other related entities to issue 
Medigap policies and certificates for plan D, in addition to plans A, B, 
and C as under existing law. (These are standardized plans for which 
the federal government sets the benefits. Medigap plans generally 
cover certain expenses that Medicare does not cover.)  
By law, those entities that issue Medigap plans A, B, or C to people 
eligible for Medicare based on age must also offer them to people 
eligible for Medicare based on disability. The bill extends this 
requirement to entities that issue plan D. 
The bill exempts entities from offering plan C to any person newly 
eligible for Medicare. (As of January 1, 2020, federal law restricts the 
sale of plan C to those eligible for Medicare before that date.) 
Additionally, the bill extends the sunset date for the personal risk 
insurance (e.g., home, auto, marine, or umbrella) “flex rating” law 
from July 1, 2021, to July 1 , 2025. The flex rating law allows property 
and casualty insurers, until the law sunsets, to file new personal risk 
insurance rates with the insurance commissioner and begin using them 
immediately, without prior approval, under certain circumstances. 
Under the current flex rating law, a personal risk insurance rate 
cannot (1) increase or decrease by more than 6% statewide or (2) 
increase by more than 15% in any individual territory. The bill  2021SB-00843-R000315-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 2 	4/7/21 
 
eliminates this 15% territorial cap on rate increases. By law, if the 
insurance commissioner determines rates are inadequate or unfairly 
discriminatory, he must order the insurer to stop using the flex rating 
rate change by a specified future date. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  June 30, 2021, for the flex rating law provisions 
and July 1, 2021, for the Medigap plan provisions. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Insurance and Real Estate Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 18 Nay 0 (03/22/2021)