Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00869 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/17/2021

                     
Researcher: JSB 	Page 1 	3/17/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
SB 869  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING COMMUNITY INVESTMENT BOARDS AND 
NEIGHBORHOOD ASSISTANCE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the chief executive officers (CEO) of certain large 
municipalities to establish neighborhood community investment 
boards to identify funding priorities for certain state grants. The CEOs 
must establish a board for each neighborhood in the municipality and 
appoint the board members who may include residents, business 
owners, and civic leaders. Beginning in FY 25, the bill authorizes these 
municipalities to spend a portion of their municipal revenue sharing 
grant on priorities identified by these boards. It also extends this 
authorization to payment in lieu of taxes (PILOT) grants funded 
through the select PILOT account, which was repealed by PA 21-3, 
effective July 1, 2021 (see BACKGROUND). 
By January 1, 2023, the bill requires the Office of Policy and 
Management (OPM), within available appropriations, to create and 
maintain a website that allows residents and organizations to submit 
proposed solutions to problems specific to urban areas (§ 4). If the 
OPM secretary or her designee deems a submitted proposal viable, she 
must identify a municipality or neighborhood in which to implement 
the proposal as a pilot program, monitor its implementation, and 
assess its results. OPM must provide a financial award, within 
available appropriations, to each resident or organization whose 
proposal becomes the basis of a pilot program that the secretary or her 
designee deems successful. 
The bill also establishes a task force to study (1) programs for which 
nonprofit providers use state funding and (2) state a gency 
requirements applicable to nonprofit providers and compliance with 
those requirements.  2021SB-00869-R000082-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JSB 	Page 2 	3/17/21 
 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2021, except the community investment 
board provisions are effective October 1, 2021, and the municipal 
revenue sharing grant provisions are effective October 1, 2024. 
 §§ 1-3 — COMMUNITY INVESTMENT BOARDS 
The bill’s requirement to establish community investment boards in 
each neighborhood applies to any municipality with a population over 
60,000 according to the 2010 Census but an area of no more than 30 
square miles (i.e., Bridgeport, Bristol, Hartford, Meriden, New Britain, 
New Haven, Norwalk, Waterbury, and West Hartford). The 
municipality’s CEO must select the board members, who may include 
residents, business owners, religious leaders, community development 
corporation representatives, and community group representatives. If 
a neighborhood revitalization zone (NRZ) has been established in a 
neighborhood, the CEO must designate the associated NRZ committee 
to serve as the neighborhood’s community investment board (see 
BACKGROUND).   
The bill requires the community investment boards to identify 
priorities for spending municipal revenue sharing and PILOT grants 
funded through the select PILOT account. (PA 21-3 repeals the select 
PILOT account and the associated grants, effective July 1, 2021; thus, 
this provision appears to have no legal effect.)   
Beginning October 1, 2024, municipalities with community 
investment boards may choose to spend these grants so that: 
1. 35% is spent on priorities identified by the community 
investment boards, 
2. 35% is spent on priorities identified by the municipality’s 
legislative body, and 
3. 30% is spent on priorities jointly agreed upon by the boards and 
legislative body. 
§ 5 — TASK FORCE ON STATE -FUNDED NONPROFIT 
PROVIDERS   2021SB-00869-R000082-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JSB 	Page 3 	3/17/21 
 
Under the bill, the task force consists of 12 members, two each 
appointed by the six legislative leaders. Their appointments may be 
legislators and must be made by July 31, 2021. The appointing 
authority fills any vacancy. 
The bill requires the Senate president pro tempore and House 
speaker to select the task force's chairpersons from among its 
members. The chairpersons must schedule and hold the first meeting 
by August 30, 2021. The Planning and Development Committee's 
administrative staff must serve as the task force's staff. 
The task force must report its findings and recommendations to the 
Planning and Development Committee by January 1, 2022. The task 
force terminates when it submits its report or on that date, whichever 
is later. 
BACKGROUND 
Related Act 
PA 21-3 (§ 8), which received emergency certification on February 
24, 2021, and was signed by the governor on March 4, 2021, eliminates 
the select PILOT account and requirement that a portion of specified 
PILOT grants be paid from the account as of July 1, 2021. 
Under prior law, this account was a separate, nonlapsing General 
Fund account funded by disbursements from the municipal revenue 
sharing account (MRSA). Prior law required the select PILOT account 
to be used to pay a specified portion of PILOT grants to municipalities 
and districts according to a statutory formula. 
Municipal Revenue Sharing Grants 
By law, municipal revenue sharing grants are funded through 
MRSA by a sales tax revenue diversion. They were last funded in FY 
17 through the Municipal Revenue Sharing Fund. 
 The statutory formula for calculating the grant amounts is based on 
each municipality's real and personal property mill rate (other than its 
motor vehicle mill rate). Grant amounts are reduced for municipalities 
whose spending exceeds a specified municipal spending cap.  2021SB-00869-R000082-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JSB 	Page 4 	3/17/21 
 
NRZs 
The state's NRZ program helps neighborhood residents and 
businesses develop and implement plans to revitalize economically- 
and socially-distressed neighborhoods. NRZs are municipally 
designated.   
NRZ committees are established after a municipality adopts the 
NRZ planning committee's strategic plan in order to implement it 
(CGS § 7-602). NRZ committees must reflect the neighborhood’s 
composition and include tenants and property owners, community 
organizations, and representatives of neighborhood businesses or 
businesses that own property in the neighborhood. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Planning and Development Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 24 Nay 2 (03/02/2021)