Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00880 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/23/2021

                     
Researcher: JSB 	Page 1 	3/23/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
SB 880  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING PAYMENTS IN LIEU OF TAXES TO 
MUNICIPALITIES FOR HOUSING AUTHORITIES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill establishes a payment in lieu of taxes (PILOT) program to 
provide state grants to municipalities in which local housing 
authorities own or lease tax-exempt real property for affordable 
housing purposes.   
With certain exceptions, the bill sets the annual grant amount due to 
municipalities beginning in FY 24 at 77% of the property taxes that 
would have been due if the property was taxable. The Office of Policy 
and Management (OPM) secretary must proportionally reduce these 
PILOT grants if there is insufficient program funding.  
Under the bill, grant-eligible “municipalities” are towns, 
consolidated towns and cities, consolidated towns and boroughs, 
boroughs, special taxing districts, and unconsolidated cities.  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  October 1, 2021 
ELIGIBLE PROPERTIES AND MUNICIPALITIES 
Under the bill, PILOT grant eligible properties must be owned or 
leased by local housing authorities (or regional housing authorities or 
the State Housing Authority, if they acquire or lease property in the 
future). The bill specifies that PILOT grants do not reimburse 
municipalities for lost revenue for properties operated by the federal 
government.  
The bill makes a municipality ineligible for the new PILOT grant if 
it is receiving guaranteed payments under a contract with the 
Department of Housing (DOH) for reimbursement through the 
existing Payment in Lieu of Taxes Subsidy Program (see  2021SB-00880-R000111-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JSB 	Page 2 	3/23/21 
 
BACKGROUND). 
PILOT GRANT AMOUNT 
The bill requires the OPM secretary to annually determine the 
amount due to each municipality for the upcoming fiscal year by 
January 1. The first grants must be paid in FY 24 (i.e., the fiscal year 
beginning July 1, 2023), and continue each fiscal year after that.     
The OPM secretary must calculate the grant amount based on the 
assessment year from two years prior. (For the determination due on 
January 1, 2023, she must use October 1, 2021, assessment year data). 
(Presumably, OPM would determine the amounts due base d on 
assessment data reported by the municipalities, but the bill does not 
establish a reporting process.) 
BACKGROUND 
Payment in Lieu of Taxes Subsidy Program 
Under existing law, tax-exempt state-financed housing authorities 
for moderate rental housing projects must make payments to 
municipalities in lieu of paying property taxes, special benefit 
assessments, and sewer system use charges (CGS § 8-71). The law 
authorizes DOH to make payments on authorities' behalf as part of its 
subsidy program, pursuant to contracts between the state, 
municipalities, and housing authorities (CGS § 8-216). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Housing Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 13 Nay 2 (03/09/2021)