Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00882 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/06/2021

                     
Researcher: MF 	Page 1 	4/6/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 882  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING CLIMATE CHANGE MITIGATION AND 
HOME ENERGY AFFORDABILITY.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the state to eliminate greenhouse gas emissions 
from electricity supplied to electric customers in the state by January 1, 
2040. The bill establishes this requirement within the emission 
reduction goals under the state’s Global Warming Solutions Act. 
The bill also requires landlords to provide a Home Energy Label for 
any dwelling unit listed publicly for rent, unless the rent includes all 
charges for electricity, natural gas, or heating fuel. Under the bill, a 
Home Energy Label is (1) a U. S. Department of Energy Home Energy 
Score, (2) a Home Energy Rating System Index Score, (3) an ENERGY 
STAR score, or (4) any additional standards established in regulations 
by the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection (DEEP).  
Under the bill, landlords may comply by providing specified energy 
consumption data, which the electric and gas utilities and other energy 
providers must make available to landlords free of charge.  
If a landlord fails to comply with this requirement, the bill allows 
the tenant to deduct one month’s rent from amounts owed to the 
landlord. The bill also allows municipalities to establish civil penalties 
of up to $500 for the first violation and $1,000 for any subsequent 
violation. Landlords may appeal civil penalties to the Superior Court. 
The bill also allows homeowners to provide a Home Energy Label 
for residential properties listed for sale. Like landlords, homeowners 
may instead provide certain other information that the bill requires 
electric and gas utilities and other energy providers to make available 
to property owners free of charge. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  October 1, 2021, except the electric sector  2021SB-00882-R000283-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 2 	4/6/21 
 
greenhouse gas emissions provision is effective July 1, 2021. 
GREENHOUSE GAS EMISS IONS REDUCTION REQUI REMENTS 
Existing law requires the state to reduce greenhouse gas emissions 
to a level at least (1) 10% below the level emitted in 1990 by January 1, 
2020; (2) 45% below the level emitted in 2001 by January 1, 2030; and 
(3) 80% below the level emitted in 2001 by January 1, 2050. The bill 
adds a requirement to reduce to zero percent the greenhouse gas 
emissions from electricity supplied to electric customers in the state by 
January 1, 2040. 
By law, state agencies on the governor’s Steering Committee on 
Climate Change must report biannually to the Office of Policy and 
Management (OPM) secretary and the DEEP commissioner on, among 
other things, policies and regulations that the agencies can adopt in the 
near future to reduce greenhouse gas emissions in accordance with the 
required reductions described above.  
By law, every three years, the DEEP commissioner, in consultation 
with OPM and the governor’s Steering Committee on Climate Change, 
must report to the Energy and Technology, Environment, and 
Transportation committees on quantifiable emissions reductions 
achieved under these provisions. Among other things, the report must 
include a schedule of proposed regulations, policies, and strategies 
designed to achieve the greenhouse gas reduction requirements. 
HOME ENERGY LABELS 
Landlords and Renters 
The bill requires landlords to provide a Home Energy Label for any 
dwelling unit publicly listed for rent, unless the rent includes charges 
for electricity, natural gas, or heating fuel.  
Instead of providing this label, landlords may also comply with the 
bill’s requirements by providing the total and average monthly costs 
and amounts for electricity, natural gas, or heating fuel for the unit 
during the most recent 12 months of occupancy. 
Under the bill, if the landlord fails to comply, the tenant may deduct  2021SB-00882-R000283-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 3 	4/6/21 
 
an amount equal to one month’s rent from any rent or payment for use 
and occupancy owed to the landlord. 
The bill also allows municipalities to establish, by ordinance, civil 
penalties for noncompliance, payable to the municipality. The bill 
limits penalties to $500 for the first violation and $1,000 for any 
subsequent violation. 
Anyone assessed a civil penalty for noncompliance under the bill 
may appeal the penalty to the Superior Court within 30 days after the 
assessment was mailed. Landlords may appeal by filing a petition to 
reopen the assessment, including a small claims entry fee (currently, 
$95), in the superior court facility designated by the chief court 
administrator. Under the bill, submitting a petition and fee entitles the 
landlord to a hearing.  
Under the bill, these remedies are in addition to any other remedies 
available at law, or in equity to any person. The bill explicitly does not 
limit or restrict the authority of state or local housing or health code 
enforcement agencies. 
Homeowners  
The bill allows, but does not require, homeowners to provide Home 
Energy Labels for any residential property publicly listed for sale. Like 
landlords, homeowners may instead provide the total and average 
monthly costs and amounts for electricity, natural gas, or heating fuel 
for the unit during the most recent 12 months of occupancy. 
Utility and Provider Records and Cost Recovery  
The bill requires electric distribution companies, gas utilities, 
heating fuel dealers, and other electricity, natural gas, and heating fuel 
providers to maintain records on energy consumption data for (1) 
dwelling units a landlord owns, leases, or subleases, and (2) residential 
properties owned by a residential property owner. The energy 
providers must make energy consumption data available to the 
landlord or property owner for the preceding 12 months of occupancy 
free of charge. If the dwelling unit or property was not occupied  2021SB-00882-R000283-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 4 	4/6/21 
 
during part or all of the preceding 12 months, the bill requires the 
energy providers to provide records containing energy consumption 
data for the most recent twelve months of occupancy. 
The bill allows the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to 
authorize electric distribution companies and gas utilities to recover 
their prudently incurred information technology costs associated with 
collecting and distributing the energy consumption data. 
The bill prohibits energy providers from disclosing personally 
identifiable information in energy consumption data records when the 
associated account owner is not the landlord or property owner. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Energy and Technology Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 18 Nay 8