Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00930 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/21/2021

                     
Researcher: KLM 	Page 1 	4/21/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 930  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING FOOD WASTE DIVERSION AND 
ANAEROBIC DIGESTION FACILITIES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill does the following with respect to organic material 
composting and food waste: 
1. broadens the scope of the law requiring certain organic material 
generators to separate the materials from other solid waste and 
recycle them at composting facilities (§ 1); 
2. requires the Department of Energy and Environmental 
Protection (DEEP) commissioner, by January 1, 2022, to (a) 
establish a voluntary pilot program for municipalities seeking to 
separate source-separated organic materials and (b) ensure that 
the materials are recycled at authorized composting facilities 
with capacity and that will accept them (see BACKGROUND) (§ 
1); 
3. requires the DEEP commissioner to (a) participate in a reach out 
and education effort to municipalities, commercial entities, and 
school systems about using certain composting facilities and (b) 
report to the Environment Committee on its efforts (§ 2); 
4. reauthorizes the DEEP commissioner to adopt regulations on 
specifications for compost from source-separated organic 
materials and mixed municipal solid waste (PA 17-218 repealed 
a similar provision) (§ 3); and 
5. exempts, under certain circumstances, permitted solid waste 
facilities from needing to modify their permit in order to start 
receiving or storing a certain amount of containerized food 
scrap, food processing residuals, and soiled or unrecycled paper  2021SB-00930-R000557-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 2 	4/21/21 
 
(§ 4).  
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2021, except the provisions on 
DEEP’s reach out and education efforts and compost regulations are 
effective upon passage. 
§ 1 — SOURCE-SEPARATED ORGANIC MA TERIALS 
The bill broadens the scope of the law requiring certain organic 
materials generators to separate the materials and recycle them at 
composting facilities by applying the law’s requirements to smaller 
generators.  
Under current law, commercial food wholesalers or distributors, 
industrial food manufacturers or processors, supermarkets, resorts, or 
conference centers generating an annual average projected volume of 
at least 52 tons of source-separated organic materials must (1) separate 
the materials from other solid waste and (2) recycle them at a 
permitted source-separated organic material composting facility 
located within 20 miles of the generation site that has available 
capacity and is willing to accept them.  
Beginning January 1, 2022, the bill applies these requirements to 
generators (1) generating an annual average projected volume of at 
least 26 tons of source-separated organic materials a year and (2) 
located within 20 miles of an authorized source-separated organic 
material composting facility. Consequently, the bill likely increases the 
number of facilities that must comply with this requirement. 
By law, generators may comply with the requirements by 
composting the organic materials or treating it with certain organic 
treatment equipment on-site.  
§ 2 — DEEP REACH OUT AND E DUCATION CAMPAIGN 
The bill requires the DEEP commissioner to participate in a reach 
out and education campaign on using certain composting facilities to 
divert food waste from the waste stream. 
Under the bill, the commissioner must engage with municipalities  2021SB-00930-R000557-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 3 	4/21/21 
 
about (1) their ability to establish an aerated static pile composting 
facility to divert food waste from the municipal solid waste stream, 
including the permit application and procedures involved, and (2) the 
potential fiscal and environmental benefits of the composting facility. 
Aerated static pile composting generally involves organic waste mixed 
in a large pile with layers of certain loosely piled materials such as 
wood chips or shredded newspaper to allow air to pass through the 
pile. 
The bill requires the commissioner to also engage with commercial 
entities and school systems about how they can divert source-
separated organic materials to authorized composting facilities 
specifically designed to accept them. 
The bill also requires the DEEP commissioner, by February 1, 2022, 
to report to the Environment Committee on its efforts, including (1) 
responses from municipalities, entities, and school systems and (2) 
municipalities’ efforts to establish composting facilities resulting from 
DEEP’s reaching out.  
§ 3 — COMPOST REGULATIONS 
The bill allows the DEEP commissioner to adopt regulations 
providing specifications for the production, quality, and use of 
compost made from source-separated organic materials and mixed 
municipal solid waste. These regulations must be made in consultation 
with the agriculture commissioner, Connecticut Agricultural 
Experiment Station, UConn extension service, and the Department of 
Public Health. 
Under the bill, these regulations must have provisions that do the 
following: 
1. promote composting processes; 
2. provide clean, high-quality, nontoxic, and marketable end-
product; 
3. protect land and water resources from contaminants;  2021SB-00930-R000557-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 4 	4/21/21 
 
4. prevent adverse environmental and public health effects from 
composting operations or applying its product; 
5. set maximum allowable levels of toxic and other contaminants 
in the composting product; 
6. include contaminant testing criteria; 
7. have at least two classes of compost, with a (a) Class I made 
from only compostable source-separated organic materials such 
as food waste, grass clippings, and yard waste and (b) Class II 
made from mixed municipal solid waste with compostable 
organic materials that were not separated at generation; 
8. set maximum allowable contaminant levels for Class I compost 
that will allow for its unrestricted use; and 
9. ban using Class II compost for agricultural or horticultural 
purposes unless it meets the maximum allowable contaminant 
levels for Class I compost, as determined by the regulations’ 
testing criteria. 
§ 4 — SOLID WASTE FACILITY PERMITS 
Current law generally prohibits anyone with a solid waste facility 
permit from altering the facility’s design or operation without 
obtaining a permit modification from DEEP.  
The bill exempts a facility from this requirement if it is adding the 
following to its operation:  
1. receiving up to 75 tons per day of containerized food scrap, 
food processing residuals, and soiled or unrecycled paper or 
2. storing up to 150 cubic yards of this containerized material. 
To qualify for the bill’s exemption, receiving these scraps, residuals, 
and paper must (1) occur in a fully enclosed building; (2) stay 
containerized, except when being transferred; and (3) be managed to 
control odor, leachate, and vector (e.g., insects or rodents) attraction.    2021SB-00930-R000557-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 5 	4/21/21 
 
The bill requires a facility’s owner or operator to, within 30 days 
after adding these items for receipt, provide written notice to the DEEP 
commissioner about it. 
BACKGROUND 
Organic Material and Composting Facilities 
By law, “source-separated organic material” includes such things as 
food scraps, food processing residue, and soiled or unrecyclable paper 
that are separated, at generation, from nonorganic material (CGS § 22a-
207(30)). 
A “composting facility” is land, appurtenances, structures, or 
equipment where organic materials originating from another process 
or location and separated at generation from nonorganic material are 
recovered through accelerated biological decomposition under 
controlled aerobic or anaerobic conditions (CGS § 22a-207(29)). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Environment Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 32 Nay 0 (03/31/2021)