Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00952 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/21/2021

                     
Researcher: MF 	Page 1 	5/21/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 952 (File 291, as amended by Senate "A")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ENERGY STORAGE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill establishes deployment goals, program requirements, and 
procurement authority for energy storage.  
The bill requires the Department of Energy and Environmental 
Protection (DEEP) to report to the Energy and Technology Committee, 
annually, beginning by January 1, 2023, on its quantifiable progress 
against the following energy storage deployment goals the bill 
establishes: 
1. 300 megawatts (MW) by December 31, 2024;  
2. 650 MW by December 31, 2027; and 
3. 1,000 MW by December 31, 2030.  
The bill requires the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority (PURA), 
by January 1, 2022, to (1) initiate a proceeding to develop and 
implement one or more programs and associated funding mechanisms 
for electric energy storage resources connected to the electric 
distribution system and (2) report to the Energy and Technology 
Committee on the proceeding’s status. The bill establishes program 
objectives and allows PURA to select a third party to implement the 
program. 
The bill allows DEEP to issue requests for proposals (RFPs) for 
energy storage projects connected at the transmission or distribution 
level to achieve the bill’s goals when combined with PURA’s 
programs. The bill requires the DEEP commissioner to select proposals 
if she determines that procuring energy storage is cost effective. It 
establishes factors she must consider when making selections and  2021SB-00952-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 2 	5/21/21 
 
subjects any agreements to PURA’s review. Under the bill, the electric 
distribution companies (EDCs, i.e., Eversource and United 
Illuminating) recover agreement costs from, and credit revenues to, 
electric ratepayers. 
*Senate Amendment “A” allows DEEP to select storage projects 
paired with certain hydropower facilities and eliminates a provision 
requiring municipal utilities to report on the quantifiable progress of 
their carbon reduction. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021, except the DEEP reporting 
requirement on energy storage deployment goals is effective upon 
passage. 
§ 2 — PURA PROCEEDING AND PROGRAMS 
The bill requires PURA to initiate a proceeding to develop and 
implement one or more programs and associated funding mechanisms 
for electric energy storage resources connected to the electric 
distribution system. In its proceeding, PURA must establish: 
1. at least one program for residential electric customers,  
2. at least one program for commercial and industrial electric 
customers, and 
3. a program for energy storage systems connected to the 
distribution system in front of the meter and not located at a 
customer’s premises.  
The bill requires PURA to solicit input on developing these 
programs from DEEP, the Connecticut Green Bank, the EDCs, and the 
Office of Consumer Counsel (OCC).  
Under the bill, PURA must consider one or more programs and rate 
designs to encourage deployment of electric energy storage 
technologies connected to the distribution system that most effectively 
leverage the technology’s value to achieve objectives that: 
1. provide positive net present value to all ratepayers, or a subset  2021SB-00952-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 3 	5/21/21 
 
of ratepayers paying for the benefits that accrue to that subset; 
2. provide multiple types of benefits to the electric grid (e.g., 
resilience, ancillary services, leveling out peaks in electricity 
use, or supporting deployment of other distributed resources); 
3. foster sustained, orderly development of a state-based electric 
energy storage industry; and 
4. maximize the value from the participation of energy storage 
systems in capacity markets. 
PURA must also consider programs and rate designs to encourage 
uses of electric energy storage technologies connected to the electric 
distribution system that avoid or defer investment in traditional 
electric distribution system capacity upgrades. 
The bill requires PURA to consider all energy storage configurations 
that are connected to the distribution system, including those 
connected in front of the meter and not located at a customer’s 
premises.  
The bill allows PURA to select any combination of the Green Bank, 
DEEP, the EDCs, or another third party it deems appropriate to 
implement one or more electric energy storage programs.  
§ 3 — DEEP SOLICITATION AND PROCUREMENT 
Project Selection 
The bill allows DEEP, in consultation with the state’s procurement 
manager and the OCC, to issue RFPs for energy storage projects 
connected at the transmission or distribution level that would, when 
combined with programs PURA establishes, achieve the bill’s energy 
storage goals. Projects may include stand-alone energy storage projects 
or projects paired with (1) Class I renewable energy sources (e.g., wind 
and solar) or (2) hydropower facilities with a nameplate capacity of up 
to 100 MW.  
The bill requires the DEEP commissioner, as part of her  2021SB-00952-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 4 	5/21/21 
 
determination on whether procuring energy storage is cost effective, to 
publish and make available for public comment a cost effectiveness 
test that considers each applicable benefit provided by energy storage. 
If the commissioner determines that procuring energy storage is cost 
effective, the bill requires her to begin selecting proposals.  
The bill requires the DEEP commissioner to consider at least the 
following when selecting proposals: 
1. whether the proposal is in ratepayers’ best interest, including 
the sources’ delivered price; 
2. whether the proposal promotes electric distribution system 
reliability, including during winter peak demand; 
3. any positive impacts on the state’s economic development, as 
determined in consultation with the Department of Economic 
and Community Development commissioner; 
4. whether the proposal is consistent with the state’s greenhouse 
gas reduction requirements under the Global Warming 
Solutions Act; and 
5. whether the proposal is consistent with the state’s 
Comprehensive Energy Strategy and Integrated Resources Plan.  
PURA Review and Cost Recovery 
Under the bill, any agreement entered into (presumably, by EDCs) 
as a result of DEEP’s selection is subject to PURA’s review and 
approval. (The bill does not explicitly allow DEEP to direct EDCs to 
enter into agreements.) The bill requires PURA to (1) finish reviewing 
an agreement within 120 days after it was filed with PURA and (2) 
approve an agreement if it is cost effective and in electric ratepayers’ 
best interest.  
Under the bill, EDCs must recover an approved agreement’s net 
costs through a fully reconciling rate component on electric ratepayer 
bills. Costs include those incurred by the EDCs under the agreement  2021SB-00952-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 5 	5/21/21 
 
and reasonable costs associated with the agreement. The bill also 
requires EDCs to credit customers through the same fully reconciling 
rate component for any net revenues from selling products purchased 
under long-term contracts entered into under the bill. (The bill does 
not specify lengths or quantities for contract terms.) 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Energy and Technology Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 24 Nay 2 (03/18/2021)