Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00993 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/03/2021

                        
 
 
LCO No. 4233  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 993  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 4233 
 
 
Referred to Committee on ENERGY AND TECHNOLOGY  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(ET)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT REMOVING THE PROPERTY TAX EXEMPTI ON FOR SOLAR 
PROJECTS AND RECLASS IFYING THE TAX CALCULATION OF 
SOLAR PROJECTS ON SI NGLE PARCELS OF LAND . 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subdivision (57) of section 12-81 of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 2 
1, 2021, and applicable to tax assessment years commencing on and after 3 
October 1, 2021): 4 
(57) (A) (i) Any Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 5 
16-1, or hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection 6 
(a) of section 16-1, installed for the generation of electricity capacity 7 
greater than seven megawatts for private residential use or on a farm, 8 
as defined in subsection (q) of section 1-1, provided such installation 9 
occurs on or after October 1, 2007, and further provided such installation 10 
is for a single family dwelling, a multifamily dwelling consisting of two 11 
to four units or a farm, (ii) any passive or active solar water or space 12 
heating system, or (iii) any geothermal energy resource. In the case of 13 
clause (i) of this subparagraph, such installations occurring on a single 14  Raised Bill No.  993 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4233   	2 of 4 
 
parcel of land shall aggregate the nameplate capacity of each installation 15 
in the written application pursuant to subparagraph (E) of this section. 16 
In the case of clause (ii) or (iii) of this subparagraph, such exemption 17 
shall apply only to the amount by which the assessed valuation of the 18 
real property equipped with such system or resource exceeds the 19 
assessed valuation of such real property equipped with the 20 
conventional portion of the system or resource; 21 
(B) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2013, 22 
any Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, 23 
hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of 24 
section 16-1, or solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source, 25 
installed for generation or displacement of energy, provided (i) such 26 
installation occurs on or after January 1, 2010, (ii) such installation is for 27 
commercial or industrial purposes, (iii) the nameplate capacity of such 28 
source or facility does not exceed the load for the location where such 29 
generation or displacement is located, and (iv) such source or facility is 30 
located in a distressed municipality, as defined in section 32-9p, with a 31 
population between one hundred twenty-five thousand and one 32 
hundred thirty-five thousand; 33 
(C) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2013, 34 
any municipality may, upon approval by its legislative body or in any 35 
town in which the legislative body is a town meeting, by the board of 36 
selectmen, abate up to one hundred per cent of property tax for any 37 
Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, hydropower 38 
facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of section 16-1, or 39 
solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source, installed for 40 
generation or displacement of energy, provided (i) such installation 41 
occurs between January 1, 2010, and December 31, 2013, (ii) such 42 
installation is for commercial or industrial purposes, (iii) the nameplate 43 
capacity of such source or facility does not exceed the load for the 44 
location where such generation or displacement is located, and (iv) such 45 
source or facility is not located in a municipality described in 46 
subparagraph (B) of this subdivision; 47  Raised Bill No.  993 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4233   	3 of 4 
 
(D) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2014, 48 
any (i) Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, (ii) 49 
hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of 50 
section 16-1, or (iii) solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy 51 
source, installed for generation or displacement of energy, provided (I) 52 
such installation occurs on or after January 1, 2014, (II) is for commercial 53 
or industrial purposes, (III) the nameplate capacity of such source or 54 
facility does not exceed the load for the location where such generation 55 
or displacement is located or the aggregated load of the beneficial 56 
accounts for any Class I renewable energy source participating in virtual 57 
net metering pursuant to section 16-244u, and (IV) in the case of clause 58 
(iii) of this subparagraph, such exemption shall apply only to the 59 
amount by which the assessed valuation of the real property equipped 60 
with such source exceeds the assessed valuation of such real property 61 
equipped with the conventional portion of the source; 62 
(E) Any person claiming the exemption provided in this subdivision 63 
for any assessment year shall, on or before the first day of November in 64 
such assessment year, file with the assessor or board of assessors in the 65 
town in which such hydropower facility, Class I renewable energy 66 
source, solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source or passive 67 
or active solar water or space heating system or geothermal energy 68 
resource is located, a written application claiming such exemption. 69 
Failure to file such application in the manner and form as provided by 70 
such assessor or board within the time limit prescribed shall constitute 71 
a waiver of the right to such exemption for such assessment year. Such 72 
application shall not be required for any assessment year following that 73 
for which the initial application is filed, provided if such hydropower 74 
facility, Class I renewable energy source, solar thermal or geothermal 75 
renewable energy source or passive or active solar water or space 76 
heating system or geothermal energy resource is altered in a manner 77 
which would require a building permit, such alteration shall be deemed 78 
a waiver of the right to such exemption until a new application, 79 
applicable with respect to such altered source, is filed and the right to 80 
such exemption is established as required initially; 81  Raised Bill No.  993 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4233   	4 of 4 
 
(F) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2015, 82 
any municipality may, by vote of its legislative body or, in a 83 
municipality where the legislative body is a town meeting, by vote of 84 
the board of selectmen, abate up to one hundred per cent of the property 85 
taxes due for any tax year, for not longer than the term of the power 86 
purchase agreement, with respect to any Class I renewable energy 87 
source, as defined in section 16-1, that is the subject of such power 88 
purchase agreement approved by the Public Utilities Regulatory 89 
Authority pursuant to section 16a-3f; 90 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2021, and 
applicable to tax 
assessment years 
commencing on and after 
October 1, 2021 
12-81(57) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To remove the property tax exemption for solar projects under seven 
megawatts and reclassify the tax calculation of solar projects on single 
parcels of land. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]