Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00997 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/29/2021

                     
Researcher: JC 	Page 1 	3/29/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 997  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING STUDENTS AND FACULTY MEMBERS OF 
THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF 
CONNECTICUT AND THE BOARD OF REGENTS FOR HIGHER 
EDUCATION.  
 
SUMMARY 
The bill increases the number of UConn Board of Trustee (BOT) 
members from 21 to 25 by adding two additional trustees elected by 
students and two elected by University Senate members, with the 
latter restricted from voting on or participating in certain matters. The 
bill also increases the number of Board of Regents for Higher 
Education (BOR) members from 21 to 23 by adding two additional 
voting student advisory committee members. 
Under current law, the BOR includes two non-voting members from 
the BOR faculty advisory committee. The bill generally converts these 
positions into voting members, except it prohibits them from voting on 
matters relating to collective bargaining negotiations or agreements.  
The bill also prohibits these members from attending or participating 
in meetings held in executive session about personnel matters; under 
current law, the BOR chairperson may invite them to executive 
sessions.  
The bill also makes technical and conforming changes. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021 
ADDITIONAL UCONN BOT TRUSTEES 
Under existing law, the UConn BOT includes two student members: 
one elected by undergraduate students and one by graduate students, 
with the elections of one each in alternate years by July 1.  
The bill requires, for the elections held by July 1, 2022, (1) UConn  2021SB-00997-R000196-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 2 	3/29/21 
 
undergraduate students to elect an additional undergraduate trustee to 
serve a one-year term and (2) UConn graduate students to elect two 
graduate students to serve two-year terms (one under existing law and 
an additional one under the bill). As under existing law, the graduate 
student members must be enrolled in the School of Law, School of 
Medicine, School of Dentistry, or School of Social Work, or be a 
graduate student in a UConn school or college.  
These student trustee positions (1) carry two-year terms after their 
initial terms and (2) must be filled by full-time students for the 
duration of their terms. Starting in 2024, the bill requires that two 
members be elected per year, with the graduate and undergraduate 
positions elected in alternate years. 
The bill also requires UConn University Senate members, by 
November 1, 2021, to elect two trustees from among the elected voting 
members of the University Senate: one full-time faculty member to 
serve a term expiring June 30, 2022, and one member to serve a term 
expiring June 30, 2023. Both trustee positions carry two-year terms 
after their initial terms, and the successors to the term expiring June 30, 
2022, must both be full-time faculty members. The initial full-time 
faculty member position, and successors to both initial appointments, 
must be employed by the university for the duration of their terms.  
The bill prohibits University Senate-elected members on the UConn 
BOT from (1) attending or participating in meetings held in executive 
session about personnel matters or (2) voting on matters relating to 
collective bargaining negotiations or agreements. 
For both the student and University Senate members, any vacancies 
must be filled by special election for the remainder of the unexpired 
term.  
Under existing law, the BOT also includes (1) 12 trustees appointed 
by the governor, (2) two trustees elected by alumni, and (3) five ex-
officio members.  
ADDITIONAL BOR MEMBE RS  2021SB-00997-R000196-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 3 	3/29/21 
 
Under existing law, the BOR’s membership includes the chairperson 
and vice-chairperson of the student advisory committee. The bill 
increases the number of BOR members from 21 to 23 by adding two 
additional student advisory committee members: one Connecticut 
State University System or Charter Oak State College student and one 
regional community-technical college student. Under the bill, these 
new members are elected by consensus vote of the advisory 
committee. 
Under existing law, in addition to the student advisory committee 
and faculty advisory committee members, the BOR also includes (1) 
nine members appointed by the governor; (2) four appointed by 
legislative leaders; and (3) four ex-officio, nonvoting members. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 19 Nay 3 (03/11/2021)