Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01016 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/14/2021

                    OFFICE OF FISCAL ANALYSIS 
Legislative Office Building, Room 5200 
Hartford, CT 06106  (860) 240-0200 
http://www.cga.ct.gov/ofa 
SB-1016 
AN ACT CONCERNING MUNICIPAL ETHICS.  
 
Primary Analyst: CP 	4/9/21 
Contributing Analyst(s): DC   
 
 
 
 
OFA Fiscal Note 
 
State Impact: 
Agency Affected Fund-Effect FY 22 $ FY 23 $ 
State Ethics, Off. 	GF - Potential 
Cost 
See Below See Below 
Note: GF=General Fund  
Municipal Impact: None  
Explanation 
Section 1 of the bill requires, by January 1, 2022, the Office of State 
Ethics (OSE), in consultation with the Connecticut Conference of 
Municipalities and Connecticut Council of Small Towns, to develop 
and publish on its website a model municipal code of ethics which 
may be adopted by municipalities. The bill further requires, by 
October 1, 2022, that each municipality adopts and maintains a code of 
ethics. It exempts the requirement for municipalities that have adopted 
an ethics code prior to January 1, 2022. Finally, this section requires 
each municipality to submit a notice to OSE certifying whether it has 
complied with the requirements of this section by January 15, 2023. No 
fiscal impact is anticipated as a result of this section of the bill.  
Section 2 requires OSE to submit a report to the General Assembly 
indicating the status of the compliance of each municipality with the 
requirements of section 1 of this bill by no later than January 1, 2024. 
No fiscal impact is anticipated as a result of this provision.  
Section 3 allows OSE to conduct a municipal ethics education 
program for municipal officials or employees or for organizations  2021SB-01016-R000456-FN.DOCX 	Page 2 of 2 
 
 
made up of municipal members. Depend ing on the number of 
municipal ethics education programs conducted, OSE may need 
additional resources to fulfill this provision of the bill. 
 
The Out Years 
The annualized ongoing fiscal impact identified above would 
continue into the future subject to inflation.