Researcher: JP Page 1 4/14/21 OLR Bill Analysis SB 1016 AN ACT CONCERNING MUNICIPAL ETHICS. SUMMARY This bill requires each municipality to adopt and maintain a code of ethics by October 1, 2022. A municipality is deemed in compliance if it: adopts an ethics code before January 1, 2022, or adopts by October 1, 2022, and after that maintains, provisions of the model ethics code that the Office of State Ethics (OSE) must establish. The bill requires OSE, in consultation with the Connecticut Conference of Municipalities and Connecticut Council of Small Towns, to (1) develop a model municipal ethics code that municipalities may adopt and (2) publish this code on its website by January 1, 2022. OSE must update the model code as it deems necessary. Under the bill, each municipality must submit a notice to OSE by January 15, 2023, certifying whether it has complied with the bill’s requirements and providing a copy of its code. It requires OSE to submit a report to the Government Administration and Elections Committee on the status of each municipality’s compliance by January 1, 2024. The bill also authorizes OSE, within available appropriations, to conduct a municipal ethics education program for municipal officials or employees, or organizations made up of municipal members. EFFECTIVE DATE: January 1, 2022, except the code adoption requirement is effective October 1, 2022. 2021SB-01016-R000456-BA.DOCX Researcher: JP Page 2 4/14/21 COMMITTEE ACTION Government Administration and Elections Committee Joint Favorable Yea 14 Nay 4 (03/29/2021)