Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01020 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/21/2021

                     
Researcher: SM 	Page 1 	5/21/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 1020 (File 222, as amended by Senate "A")*  
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A REGIONAL ECONOMIC 
DEVELOPMENT PILOT PROGRAM.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Department of Economic and Community 
Development (DECD) to establish, within available resources, a pilot 
program to provide matching grants to  regional economic 
development corporations implementing economic development 
programs in distressed municipalities (see BACKGROUND). 
Corporations must represent at least four municipalities to be eligible 
for the pilot program, including one distressed municipality. The 
DECD commissioner may allow a corporation that represents less than 
four municipalities to participate in the program at his discretion. 
The bill allows the DECD commissioner to award up to $10 million 
in total grants to participating corporations but no more than $5 
million for any single grant. The department (1) may enter into a 
personal service agreement with an outside person, firm, corporation, 
or other entity to operate the program and (2) cannot accept new 
program applications after June 30, 2026.  
Under the bill, regional economic development corporations 
seeking to participate in the program must apply in the manner DECD 
prescribes. At a minimum, applications must include the following:  
1. the location of the applicant’s principal place of business,  
2. a description of the economic development program for which 
the matching grant will be used,  
3. the amount and source of funding the applicant wants DECD to 
match, and  2021SB-01020-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 2 	5/21/21 
 
4. any other information the department deems necessary.  
The bill requires DECD, or an outside operator, to consider at least 
the following factors when evaluating applications:  
1. the applicant’s description of the proposed economic 
development program;  
2. the applicant’s resources and record of implementing economic 
development programs in its region; and 
3. the proposed program’s potential impact on the workforce in 
the applicant’s region.  
The bill requires program participants to report annually to DECD 
beginning no later than two years after receiving funding. The report 
must (1) describe the progress of the corporation’s department-funded 
economic development program and (2) include any additional 
information the DECD commissioner deems necessary. Beginning 
January 15, 2022, the commissioner must report annually to the 
Commerce Committee on the pilot program’s operation and 
effectiveness. 
*Senate Amendment "A" (1) reduces, from five to four, the number 
of municipalities a regional economic development corporation must 
represent to be eligible for the program; (2) reduces, from two to one, 
the number of these municipalities that must be distressed; (3) allows 
the DECD commissioner to let a corporation that represents less than 
four municipalities participate; and (4) specifies that the program must 
be established using available resources, rather than available 
appropriations.  
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2021  
BACKGROUND 
Distressed Municipalities  
By law, the DECD commissioner must annually designate 
distressed municipalities based on a combination of economic,  2021SB-01020-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 3 	5/21/21 
 
education, demographic, and housing criteria. In 2020, he designated 
the following 25 municipalities as distressed: 
Ansonia Meriden  Sprague 
Bridgeport Montville Stratford  
Bristol New Britain Torrington  
Chaplin New Haven Voluntown  
Derby New London  Waterbury 
East Hartford Norwich West Haven 
East Haven Preston Winchester 
Griswold Putnam Windham 
Hartford  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Commerce Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 19 Nay 4 (03/16/2021)