Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01031 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/14/2021

                     
Researcher: JKL 	Page 1 	4/14/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 1031  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE USE OF SODIUM CHLORIDE TO 
MITIGATE ICE AND SNOW ACCUMULATIONS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Department of Energy and Environmental 
Protection (DEEP) and Department of Transportation (DOT) 
commissioners to work with UConn’s Tech Transfer (T2) Center to 
conduct training for roadside salt applicators that relies on existing 
municipal guidelines. It requires the commissioners, within one year 
after implementing the training program, to report to the Environment 
and Transportation committees on it. The report must include any 
legislative recommendations to reduce the effect of sodium chloride on 
private wells and public drinking water supplies (§ 1). 
The bill also establishes a salt applicator certification program 
within DEEP, which the commissioner must administer and enforce 
within available resources. It requires the commissioner to adopt 
implementing regulations (§ 2). The bill generally exempts a 
commercial applicator that completes the certification program, and an 
owner, operator, or lessee of property maintained by the applicator, 
from liability for damages related to the property maintenance if the 
applicator used DEEP’s and DOT’s published best practices and kept 
certain records (§ 3). 
Additionally, the bill requires each local health district, by January 
1, 2022, to establish an electronic reporting system for owners of homes 
and wells damaged by sodium chloride run-off. Health districts must 
report the information annually to the Office of Policy and 
Management (OPM), which may (1) identify available financial 
resources to help the owners with remediation, mitigation, or repair 
and (2) establish criteria and procedures for issuing financial assistance 
(§ 4).  2021SB-01031-R000458-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 2 	4/14/21 
 
Lastly, the bill requires any person who installs residential water 
treatment systems, including automatic water softeners or tanks, to 
test a customer’s drinking water for sodium and chloride before 
recommending installation of an automatic water softener or tank. A 
registered environmental laboratory must perform the testing (§ 5). 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage, except for the provisions 
requiring DEEP and DOT to work with UConn’s T2 Center on a salt 
applicator training program, which are effective October 1, 2021. 
§ 1 — SALT APPLICATOR TRAINING PROGRAM 
The bill requires DEEP and DOT to work with UConn’s T2 Center to 
conduct training for state, municipal, and private roadside applicators 
that relies on the “Green Snow Pro: Sustainable Winter Operations” 
guide for municipalities. The program must include instruction on 
each topic contained in the guide. Under the bill, either DEEP and 
DOT personnel or UConn’s T2 Center personnel must provide the 
training. They must hold at least one training session in each county.  
The bill also requires DEEP and DOT to provide information about 
the training to the regional councils of government. They must report 
to the Environment and Transportation committees within one year 
after the program begins on (1) how many applicators received the 
training, (2) goals for the program’s future, and (3) recommendations 
for proposed legislation to reduce the effects of sodium chloride on 
private wells and public drinking water supplies. 
§ 2 — SALT APPLICATOR CERT IFICATION PROGRAM 
The bill allows commercial applicators to apply for DEEP 
certification annually. Under the bill, a “commercial applicator” is 
anyone who applies, or supervises people applying, salt or salt 
alternatives on roadways, parking lots, or sidewalks for winter 
maintenance. It excludes municipal, state, and state political 
subdivision employees. 
The bill requires the DEEP commissioner to administer and enforce 
the certification program within available resources.  2021SB-01031-R000458-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 3 	4/14/21 
 
Master Certificate 
Under the bill, a business that employs multiple commercial 
applicators may obtain a master certificate for its owner or chief 
supervisor, and applicators employed by the business may obtain 
certificates to qualify under the master certificate. A business holding a 
master certificate must (1) ensure that all applicators operating under it 
receive required training and (2) keep records on behalf of all its 
applicators. 
Any annual fee DEEP establishes for an applicator’s certificate to 
qualify under a master certificate must cost significantly less than the 
fee for the master certificate. The established fees must cover the costs 
of providing training. 
Application Form 
The bill requires the DEEP commissioner to develop the certification 
application form, which must include the following information: 
1. the applicant’s name and address; 
2. the name and address for a Connecticut-domiciled person who 
is authorized to accept legal service and notices on the 
applicant’s behalf; 
3. the type of apparatus used to apply salt or salt alternative, 
whether liquid or dry; and 
4. any other information the commissioner deems necessary. 
Regulations Required 
The bill also requires the commissioner to adopt implementing 
regulations, which must, at a minimum, include provisions to: 
1. establish policies and goals for applying salt, 
2. receive and allocate federal grants and other funds or gifts to 
carry out the program, 
3. provide the types and frequency of training programs required  2021SB-01031-R000458-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 4 	4/14/21 
 
for certification, 
4. establish commercial applicator certification procedures, 
5. establish recordkeeping requirements for applicators to 
maintain certification, and 
6. establish and collect fees to cover program costs. 
Violations and Certification Revocation 
The bill authorizes the commissioner to issue orders, including 
cease and desist orders, to anyone who violates the bill’s salt applicator 
certification program provisions or regulations. Orders are effective 
immediately upon issuance. The commissioner may revoke a violator’s 
certification after notice and hearing pursuant to the state’s Uniform 
Administrative Procedures Act. 
Salt Application Account 
The bill establishes a separate, non-lapsing salt application account, 
which the DEEP commissioner must use to administer the salt 
applicator certification program. The commissioner must deposit with 
the treasurer the fees she collects under the program. The treasurer 
must credit the fees to the account and may invest them as allowed by 
law. Any investment interest must be credited to the salt application 
account. 
The bill prohibits the General Fund from being used for the salt 
applicator certification program. 
§ 3 — CERTIFIED APPLICATOR LIABILITY PROTECTION 
The bill exempts a DEEP-certified commercial applicator, and any 
owner, occupant, or lessee of land maintained by the certified 
applicator, from liability for damages arising from an insufficiency or 
hazard on the property if (1) the damages were caused solely by snow 
and ice and (2) they had implemented DEEP’s and DOT’s published 
best practices for winter road, parking lot, and sidewalk maintenance. 
It does not exempt liability for damages caused by gross negligence  2021SB-01031-R000458-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 5 	4/14/21 
 
or reckless disregard by the applicator, owner, occupant, or lessee. An 
applicator, owner, occupant, or lessee is presumed to be acting 
pursuant to the best practices in the absence of proof to the contrary. 
To qualify for this liability protection, the applicator, owner, 
occupant, or lessee must keep a written record of their winter road, 
parking lot, and sidewalk maintenance practices. The written record 
must include (1) the type and rate of application of de-icing materials 
used, (2) treatment dates, and (3) weather conditions for each event 
requiring de-icing. Records must be kept for three years. 
§ 4 — LOCAL HEALTH DISTRIC T REPORTING SYSTEM 
The bill requires each local health district, by January 1, 2022, to 
establish an electronic reporting system for owners of homes and wells 
damaged by sodium chloride run-off to report the damage. 
Beginning by January 1, 2023, each local health department must 
annually submit the reports recorded during the prior calendar year to 
OPM. The OPM secretary may (1) identify available state or federal 
financial resources to help the owners with remediation, mitigation, or 
repair of the damaged homes or wells and (2) establish criteria and 
procedures for issuing financial assistance to the owners. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Environment Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 31 Nay 1 (03/29/2021)