Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01035 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/10/2021

                        
 
 
LCO No. 4688  	1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1035  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 4688 
 
 
Referred to Committee on EDUCATION  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(ED)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E DEVELOPMENT OF A N EW 
PRESERVICE PERFORMAN CE ASSESSMENT FOR TEACHER 
PREPARATION PROGRAMS . 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective from passage) On and after July 1, 2023, the 1 
Department of Education shall cease state-wide implementation of the 2 
preservice performance assessment, edTPA, as adopted by the State 3 
Board of Education on December 7, 2016. 4 
Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) Not later than January 1, 2023, 5 
the Commissioner of Education, the president of the Connecticut State 6 
Colleges and Universities and the dean of the Neag School of Education 7 
at The University of Connecticut shall jointly develop a preservice 8 
performance assessment to be implemented in teacher preparation 9 
programs, as defined in section 10-10a of the general statutes, offered at 10 
public institutions of higher education in the state. Such preservice 11 
performance assessment shall be developed with consideration given to 12 
(1) the positive and negative qualities of previous preservice 13 
performance assessments administered in the state, (2) how such 14  Raised Bill No.  1035 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4688   	2 of 2 
 
preservice performance assessment will be implemented in teacher 15 
preparation programs in the state, (3) the financial costs associated with 16 
the implementation of such preservice performance assessment by 17 
institutions of higher education, (4) reducing or eliminating any costs or 18 
fees charged to students enrolled in teacher preparation programs as 19 
part of the implementation of such preservice performance assessment, 20 
and (5) designing such preservice performance assessment to be 21 
evidence-based with incorporation of best practices. 22 
(b) Not later than January 1, 2023, the Commissioner of Education 23 
shall submit a report on the preservice performance assessment 24 
developed under this section to the joint standing committee of the 25 
General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to education, 26 
in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. 27 
Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) On and after July 1, 2023, each 28 
teacher preparation program, as defined in section 10-10a of the general 29 
statutes, offered at an institution of higher education in the state, shall 30 
administer the preservice performance assessment developed pursuant 31 
to section 2 of this act. 32 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 New section 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2021 New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To cease implementation of EdTPA and create a new state-wide 
preservice performance assessment for teacher preparation programs. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]