Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01040 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/10/2021

                        
 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4709  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1040  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 4709 
 
 
Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AN D 
BONDING  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(FIN)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E ADMISSIONS TAX. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 12-541 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021): 2 
(a) Except as provided in subsection (b) of this section, there is hereby 3 
imposed a tax of ten per cent of the admission charge to any place of 4 
amusement, entertainment or recreation. No tax shall be imposed with 5 
respect to any admission charge: 6 
(1) When the admission charge is less than one dollar or, in the case 7 
of any motion picture show, when the admission charge is not more 8 
than five dollars; 9 
(2) When a daily admission charge is imposed that entitles the patron 10 
to participate in an athletic or sporting activity; 11 
(3) To any event, other than events held at the stadium facility, as 12 
defined in section 32-651, if all of the proceeds from the event inure 13  Raised Bill No.  1040 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4709   	2 of 4 
 
exclusively to an entity that is exempt from federal income tax under the 14 
Internal Revenue Code, provided such entity actively engages in and 15 
assumes the financial risk associated with the presentation of such 16 
event; 17 
(4) To any event, other than events held at the stadium facility, as 18 
defined in section 32-651, that, in the opinion of the commissioner, is 19 
conducted primarily to raise funds for an entity that is exempt from 20 
federal income tax under the Internal Revenue Code, provided the 21 
commissioner is satisfied that the net profit that inures to such entity 22 
from such event will exceed the amount of the admissions tax that, but 23 
for this subdivision, would be imposed upon the person making such 24 
charge to such event; 25 
(5) Other than for events held at the stadium facility, as defined in 26 
section 32-651, paid by centers of service for elderly persons, as 27 
described in section 17a-310; 28 
(6) To any production featuring live performances by actors or 29 
musicians presented at Gateway's Candlewood Playhouse, Ocean Beach 30 
Park or any nonprofit theater or playhouse in the state, provided such 31 
theater or playhouse possesses evidence confirming exemption from 32 
federal tax under Section 501 of the Internal Revenue Code; 33 
(7) To any carnival or amusement ride; 34 
(8) To any interscholastic athletic event held at the stadium facility, 35 
as defined in section 32-651;  36 
(9) If the admission charge would have been subject to tax under the 37 
provisions of section 12-542 of the general statutes, revision of 1958, 38 
revised to January 1, 1999; or 39 
(10) On and after July 1, 2020, to any event at the Dunkin' Donuts Park 40 
in Hartford. 41 
(b) (1) (A) For the following venues and events, for sales occurring on 42 
or after July 1, 2019, but prior to July 1, 2020, the tax imposed under this 43  Raised Bill No.  1040 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4709   	3 of 4 
 
section shall be seven and one-half per cent of the admission charge to: 44 
[(A)] (i) Any event at the XL Center in Hartford; 45 
[(B)] (ii) Any event at Dillon Stadium in Hartford; 46 
[(C)] (iii) Any athletic event presented by a member team of the 47 
Atlantic League of Professional Baseball at the New Britain Stadium; 48 
[(D)] (iv) Any event at the Webster Bank Arena in Bridgeport; 49 
[(E)] (v) Any event at the Harbor Yard Amphitheater in Bridgeport; 50 
[(F)] (vi) Any event at Dodd Stadium in Norwich; 51 
[(G)] (vii) Any event at the Oakdale Theatre in Wallingford; and 52 
[(H)] (viii) Any event other than an interscholastic athletic event at 53 
the stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651. 54 
[(2)] (B) For sales occurring on or after July 1, 2019, but prior to July 55 
1, 2020, for any event at the Dunkin' Donuts Park in Hartford, the tax 56 
imposed under this section shall be five per cent of the admission 57 
charge. 58 
[(3)] (C) For the venues and events specified in subparagraph (A) of 59 
this subdivision, [(1) of this subsection,] for sales occurring on or after 60 
July 1, 2020, but prior to July 1, 2021, the tax imposed under this section 61 
shall be five per cent of the admission charge. 62 
(2) For the following venues and events, for sales occurring on or after 63 
July 1, 2021, the tax imposed under this section shall be five per cent of 64 
the admission charge to: 65 
(A) Any event at the XL Center in Hartford; 66 
(B) Any event at Dillon Stadium in Hartford; 67 
(C) Any event at New Britain Stadium; 68  Raised Bill No.  1040 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4709   	4 of 4 
 
(D) Any event at Webster Bank Arena in Bridgeport; 69 
(E) Any event at Harbor Yard Amphitheater in Bridgeport; 70 
(F) Any event at Dodd Stadium in Norwich; 71 
(G) Any event at the Oakdale Theatre in Wallingford;  72 
(H) Any event at the Xfinity Theatre in Hartford; and 73 
(I) Any event other than an interscholastic athletic event at the 74 
stadium facility, as defined in section 32-651. 75 
[(4)] (3) On and after July 1, 2001, the tax imposed under this section 76 
on any motion picture show shall be six per cent of the admission 77 
charge.  78 
(c) The tax shall be imposed upon the person making such charge and 79 
reimbursement for the tax shall be collected by such person from the 80 
purchase. Such reimbursement, termed "tax", shall be paid by the 81 
purchaser to the person making the admission charge. Such tax, when 82 
added to the admission charge, shall be a debt from the purchaser to the 83 
person making the admission charge and shall be recoverable at law. 84 
The amount of tax reimbursement, when so collected, shall be deemed 85 
to be a special fund in trust for the state of Connecticut.  86 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2021 12-541 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To allow any event at New Britain Stadium and the Xfinity Theatre in 
Hartford to be subject to the five per cent admissions tax rate. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]