Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01087 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/21/2021

                     
Researcher: JO 	Page 1 	4/21/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 1087  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE RECRUITMENT AND RETENTION OF 
HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS IN THE STATE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires, rather than allows, the Department of Public 
Health (DPH) to establish a program providing three-year grants to 
community-based primary care providers, within available 
appropriations, to expand access to care for the uninsured (currently, 
the program is not funded). DPH must do so by January 1, 2022. 
Among other things, this program may provide loan repayment to 
eligible primary care clinicians and registered nurses (RNs). The bill 
expands the types of eligible clinicians to include mental health care 
providers, among others. 
The bill also requires DPH, by January 1, 2022, to establish a five-
year pilot program to recruit and retain mental health providers at 
federally qualified health centers (FQHCs, see BACKGROUND), 
including psychiatrists, psychologists, and psychiatric advanced 
practice registered nurses (APRNs). 
Additionally, the bill requires the Office of Higher Education 
(OHE), within available appropriations, to administer a loan 
reimbursement grant program for psychiatrists, psychologists, and 
psychiatric APRNs who are employed at an FQHC for at least two 
years. Under the program, eligible participants may receive student 
loan reimbursement grants of up to $25,000 a year for up to two years. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2021, except the pilot program takes 
effect upon passage.  
§ 1 — PRIMARY CARE DIRECT SERVICES PROGRAM 
Under this program, DPH may award three-year grants to 
community-based providers of primary care services to expand access  2021SB-01087-R000568-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JO 	Page 2 	4/21/21 
 
to care for the uninsured. Among other things, the grants may fund 
salary subsidies or loan repayment for primary care clinicians and RNs 
who meet program requirements. The bill requires the commissioner 
to establish the program, rather than allowing her to as under current 
law, but retains the current condition that the program operate within 
available appropriations.  
The bill adds alcohol and drug counselors, pharmacists, and mental 
health care providers to the list of primary care clinicians eligible for 
the program subsidies or loan repayment. The bill also specifies that 
RNs are classified as primary care clinicians under the program, but as 
noted above, they are already eligible for the program under current 
law. 
  Under existing law, the following providers are also classified as 
primary care clinicians and thus eligible for the program when funded: 
family practice and internal medicine physicians, general practice 
osteopaths, obstetricians, gynecologists, pediatricians, dentists, 
certified nurse midwives, APRNs, physician assistants, and dental 
hygienists.  
By law, individuals receiving salary subsidies or loan repayment 
under the program must (1) provide services to the uninsured on a 
sliding-scale basis, provide free care if necessary, accept Medicare 
assignment, and participate in Medicaid or (2) provide nursing 
services in school-based health centers and expanded school health 
sites.  
§ 2 — FQHC PILOT PROGRAM 
The bill requires DPH, by January 1, 2022, to establish a five-year 
pilot program to recruit and retain mental health care providers at 
FQHCs. This includes, at a minimum, psychiatrists, psychologists, and 
APRNs board-certified as psychiatric mental health providers by the 
American Nurses Credentialing Center. 
Under the bill, the DPH commissioner must (1) prescribe how 
FQHCs may apply to participate, (2) establish the selection criteria,  2021SB-01087-R000568-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JO 	Page 3 	4/21/21 
 
and (3) explore funding the program through public -private 
partnerships, grant programs, federal funds, and state funds. The 
program’s selection criteria must prioritize the placement of mental 
health care providers in parts of the state where (1) there is the greatest 
need for them, (2) there are economically distressed municipalities, 
and (3) residents lack access to this care near their homes. 
Starting by January 1, 2023, and until 2027, the bill requires the 
commissioner to annually report on the program to the Public Health 
Committee. The reports must evaluate the program’s operation and 
effectiveness.   
§ 3 — MENTAL HEALTH CARE P ROVIDER STUDENT LOAN 
REIMBURSEMENT PROGRA M  
Beginning in FY 21 and each fiscal year thereafter, the bill requires 
OHE to administer a mental health care provider student loan 
reimbursement grant program, within available appropriations. 
The program is for psychiatrists, psychologists, and board-certified 
psychiatric APRNs as specified above. To qualify, they must be 
employed as mental health care providers by an in-state FQHC for at 
least two years. 
Eligible individuals may receive grants for up to $25,000 per year, 
for up to two years, for reimbursement of federal or state educational 
loans. They may only be reimbursed for loan payments they made 
while employed by an FQHC. The OHE executive director prescribes 
when and how to apply to the program.  
Under the bill, any unexpended funds appropriated for the program 
do not lapse at the end of the fiscal year and are available for 
expenditure in the next fiscal year. The bill allows OHE to accept gifts, 
grants, and donations from any source, public or private, for the 
program. 
BACKGROUND 
Federally Qualified Health Centers 
Under federal law, FQHCs generally are community -based  2021SB-01087-R000568-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JO 	Page 4 	4/21/21 
 
nonprofit or public organizations that qualify for or receive grants 
under Section 330 of the Public Health Services Act. To receive federal 
funding, they must provide required primary health care services to 
medically underserved populations or certain other populations (42 
U.S.C. §§ 1396d(l)(2)(B) and -254b). 
Related Bills 
sSB 1 (File 481, § 35), favorably reported by the Public Health 
Committee, makes a $500,000 General Fund appropriation to DPH in 
FY 22 to provide three-year grants to community-based health care 
providers in primary care settings. 
sHB 6235 (File 336), favorably reported by the Higher Education 
and Employment Advancement Committee, establishes a program to 
offer eligible psychiatrists the option of segregating a portion of their 
state income tax payments into a special fund used for making a down 
payment to purchase their first home. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Health Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 33 Nay 0 (03/31/2021)