Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01094 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/13/2021

                        
 
 
LCO No. 6381  	1 of 3 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1094  
January Session, 2021 
LCO No. 6381 
 
 
Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND 
BONDING  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(FIN)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT AUTHORIZING B ONDS OF THE STATE FO R CTNEXT AND 
THE INNOVATION PLACE PROGRAM. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2022) (a) For the purposes described in 1 
subsection (b) of this section, the State Bond Commission shall have the 2 
power from time to time to authorize the issuance of bonds of the state 3 
in one or more series and in principal amounts not exceeding in the 4 
aggregate sixty-four million dollars, provided (1) thirteen million five 5 
hundred dollars of such authorization shall be effective July 1, 2022, (2) 6 
twenty-three million five hundred dollars of such authorization shall be 7 
effective July 1, 2023, (3) thirteen million five hundred dollars of such 8 
authorization shall be effective July 1, 2024, and (4) thirteen million five 9 
hundred dollars of such authorization shall be effective July 1, 2025. 10 
(b) The proceeds of the sale of such bonds, to the extent of the amount 11 
stated in subsection (a) of this section, shall be used by CTNext for the 12 
purpose of recapitalizing the innovation place program established 13 
under section 32-39k of the general statutes for existing and new 14  Raised Bill No.  1094 
 
 
 
LCO No. 6381   	2 of 3 
 
innovation places, provided ten million dollars shall be deposited in the 15 
fiscal year commencing July 1, 2023, in the CTNext Fund established 16 
under section 32-39i of the general statutes for general operational 17 
purposes. 18 
(c) All provisions of section 3-20 of the general statutes, or the exercise 19 
of any right or power granted thereby, that are not inconsistent with the 20 
provisions of this section are hereby adopted and shall apply to all 21 
bonds authorized by the State Bond Commission pursuant to this 22 
section. Temporary notes in anticipation of the money to be derived 23 
from the sale of any such bonds so authorized may be issued in 24 
accordance with section 3-20 of the general statutes and from time to 25 
time renewed. Such bonds shall mature at such time or times not 26 
exceeding twenty years from their respective dates as may be provided 27 
in or pursuant to the resolution or resolutions of the State Bond 28 
Commission authorizing such bonds. None of such bonds shall be 29 
authorized except upon a finding by the State Bond Commission that 30 
there has been filed with it a request for such authorization that is signed 31 
by or on behalf of the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management 32 
and states such terms and conditions as said commission, in its 33 
discretion, may require. Such bonds issued pursuant to this section shall 34 
be general obligations of the state and the full faith and credit of the state 35 
of Connecticut are pledged for the payment of the principal of and 36 
interest on such bonds as the same become due, and accordingly and as 37 
part of the contract of the state with the holders of such bonds, 38 
appropriation of all amounts necessary for punctual payment of such 39 
principal and interest is hereby made, and the State Treasurer shall pay 40 
such principal and interest as the same become due. 41 
Sec. 2. Subsection (a) of section 32-39l of the general statutes is 42 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 43 
2022): 44 
(a) [On or before July 1, 2016,] Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated 45 
shall post on its Internet web site an application form, prescribed by 46 
Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated, for planning grants-in-aid 47  Raised Bill No.  1094 
 
 
 
LCO No. 6381   	3 of 3 
 
awarded pursuant to subsection (b) of this section. Such application 48 
form shall state that applications for planning grants-in-aid shall be 49 
submitted to the CTNext board. 50 
Sec. 3. Subparagraph (E) of subdivision (2) of subsection (a) of section 51 
32-39m of the general statutes is repealed and the following is 52 
substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2021): 53 
(E) The CTNext board shall report, in accordance with the provisions 54 
of section 11-4a, to the joint standing committees of the General 55 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to commerce and 56 
finance, revenue and bonding on or before September [30, 2017, and on 57 
or before July first annually thereafter until September 30, 2020] thirtieth 58 
annually, regarding the grants-in-aid distributed pursuant to this 59 
section and concerning the operation and effectiveness of the innovation 60 
place program. 61 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2022 New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2022 32-39l(a) 
Sec. 3 July 1, 2021 32-39m(a)(2)(E) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To provide funding for CTNext and the innovation place program. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]