Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01094 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/10/2021

                     
Researcher: HP 	Page 1 	5/10/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 1094  
 
AN ACT AUTHORIZING BONDS OF THE STATE FOR CTNEXT AND 
THE INNOVATION PLACE PROGRAM.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill authorizes $64 million in bonds over a four-year period, 
from FY 23 to FY 26, to recapitalize CTNext’s innovation place 
program (see BACKGROUND), as shown in Table 1. The bonds are 
subject to standard statutory bond issuance procedures and repayment 
requirements. 
Under the bill, bond proceeds may generally be used for new and 
existing innovation places, except that the bill earmarks $10 million for 
deposit into the CTNext Fund in FY 24 to cover general operating 
expenses.  
Table 1: CT Next Bond Authorizations 
FY Amount ($) 
23 13,500,000 
24 23,500,000 
25 13,500,000 
26 13,500,000 
 
The bill also reestablishes and makes permanent the requirement 
that the CTNext board report annually to the Commerce and Finance, 
Revenue and Bonding committees on the innovation place program’s 
operation, effectiveness, and grant distribution. This requirement 
previously expired on September 30, 2020. 
Lastly, the bill makes a technical change (§ 2). 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2022, except that the change to CTNext’s 
annual reporting requirement takes effect July 1, 2021.  2021SB-01094-R000668-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: HP 	Page 2 	5/10/21 
 
BACKGROUND 
CTNext 
CTNext is a subsidiary of Connecticut Innovations, Inc. Its major 
purpose is to assist entrepreneurs and startup and growth-stage 
businesses by, among other things, (1) building entrepreneur 
communities, (2) serving as a catalyst to protect and enhance the state’s 
innovation ecosystem, (3) connecting entrepreneurs and growth-stage 
businesses to government and private resources, (4) facilitating 
mentoring for entrepreneurs and young business ventures, and (5) 
facilitating innovation and entrepreneurship at higher education 
institutions (CGS § 32-39f). 
Innovation Place Program 
By law, CTNext must administer an innovation place program to, 
among other things, (1) foster innovation and entrepreneurship in 
compact, mixed-use geographic areas with startups, growth-stage 
businesses, anchor institutions, and access to public transit; (2) 
encourage the leveraging of private investment in these areas; and (3) 
connect entrepreneurs facing similar opportunities and challenges 
with other entrepreneurs and public and private resources (CGS § 32-
39k). 
The law allows (1) entities such as corporations, municipalities, and 
higher education institutions to apply for the designation of an 
innovation place and (2) CTNext to provide planning grants to entities 
preparing applications and implementation grants for projects and 
initiatives in designated innovation places, among other things (CGS 
§§ 32-39l & -39m). The four cities or regions currently designated as 
innovation places are (1) Harford and East Hartford, (2) New Haven, 
(3) Stamford, and (4) Southeastern Connecticut, anchored by New 
London and Groton.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 47 Nay 0 (04/22/2021)  2021SB-01094-R000668-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: HP 	Page 3 	5/10/21