Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01107 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/10/2021

                     
Researcher: RP 	Page 1 	5/10/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
SB 1107  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE TAXATION OF AMBULATORY 
SURGICAL CENTER SERVICES.  
 
SUMMARY 
Beginning July 1, 2021, this bill terminates the 6% ambulatory 
surgical centers (ASC) gross receipts tax and instead subjects ASC 
services to 6.35% sales tax, subject to certain exclusions.  
Under the bill, the sales tax generally applies to ASC services (i.e., 
procedures and services included in a facility fee payment to an ASC) 
rendered by an ASC for consideration. The tax does not apply to, 
among other things, (1) the first $1.5 million of gross receipts received 
during each 12-month period beginning on July 1 for the provision of 
ASC services; (2) Medicaid or Medicare payments; or (3) amounts 
received by the ASC for tangible personal property used in connection 
with ASC services. 
The bill also authorizes a refundable state tax credit against the sales 
tax for ASCs, based on a portion of the (1) Medicaid payments the ASC 
received or would have been due had services similar to ASC services 
been performed by and at a hospital instead and (2) payments received 
from ASC services provided to individuals covered under the state 
employee health plan or municipal employees health insurance 
program (MEHIP). 
Lastly, for the period from July 1, 2020, to July 1, 2021, the bill 
allows ASCs to deduct certain COVID-19 expenses from their gross 
receipts for purposes of the ASC gross receipts tax.  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021, and applicable to calendar quarters 
beginning on or after July 1, 2021, except that the changes to the 
existing ASC gross receipts tax are effective June 1, 2021, and 
applicable to calendar quarters beginning on or after July 1, 2020.  2021SB-01107-R000678-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: RP 	Page 2 	5/10/21 
 
§§ 2-5 — SALES TAX ON ASC SER VICES 
Beginning July 1, 2021, the bill subjects to sales tax ASC services 
performed by ASCs for a consideration, excluding services performed 
by an employee for his or her employer. 
ASC Services Subject to Tax 
Under the bill, “ASC services” are the procedures and services 
included in a facility fee payment to an ASC that are (1) associated 
with a surgical procedure and (2) not reimbursable ancillary or 
professional procedures or services. They (1) include facility services 
only and (2) exclude surgical procedures and physicians’, anesthetists’, 
radiology, diagnostic, and ambulance services that are separately 
reimbursed to an ASC from the facility fee payment. 
Gross Receipts for Purposes of the Tax 
The bill limits the gross receipts from ASC services that are subject 
to sales tax to the amounts received (cash or in kind) from patients, 
third-party payers, and others for the provision of ASC services, 
including retroactive adjustments under reimbursement agreements 
with third-party payers. Gross receipts exclude the following: 
1. the first $1.5 million of gross receipts received during each 12-
month period beginning July 1, excluding Medicaid and 
Medicare payments, for ASC services (presumably, the ASC 
would track its gross receipts and begin applying sales tax after 
reaching this threshold); 
2. Medicaid or Medicare payments received for ASC services; 
3. payer discounts, charity care, and bad debts (as defined below); 
4. amounts received by an ASC for tangible personal property 
used in connection with an ASC service (e.g., implants, devices, 
drugs, and biologicals), regardless of the payer; and 
5. amounts received by an ASC that were or are subject to the 
current ASC gross receipts tax;  2021SB-01107-R000678-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: RP 	Page 3 	5/10/21 
 
Under the current ASC gross receipts tax, gross receipts exclude (1) 
the first $1 million of the ASC’s gross receipts in the applicable fiscal 
year, excluding Medicaid and Medicare payments, and (2) gross 
receipts from any Medicaid and Medicare payments the ASC receives. 
Definition of ASC 
By law, and under the bill, an ASC is a distinct entity that (1) 
operates exclusively to provide surgical services to patients not 
requiring hospitalization, where the services are not expected to take 
more than 24 hours; (2) has an agreement with the Centers for 
Medicare and Medicaid Services (CMS) to participate in Medicare as 
an ASC; and (3) meets the federal requirements to do so. 
Payer Discounts, Charity Care, and Bad Debts 
“Payer discounts” is the difference between an ASC’s published 
charges and the actual payments it received from third-party payers 
for a different or discounted rate or payment method. It excludes 
charity care and bad debts. 
“Charity care” is free or discounted health care services provided to 
individuals who cannot afford to pay, including to the uninsured 
patient or patients who are not expected to pay all or part of an ASC’s 
bill based on income guidelines and other financial criteria established 
in statute or in an ASC’s charity care policies on file at its office. It does 
not include bad debts and payer discounts. 
Reporting Method 
The bill allows ASCs to report their sales of ASC services on the 
cash basis of accounting, rather than on an accrual basis. It does so by 
extending to ASCs an existing provision that allows retailers whose 
only sales are certain enumerated services and who report their sales 
on the cash basis of accounting for federal income tax purposes to do 
so for state sales tax reporting purposes. Under the cash basis method 
of accounting, the retailer reports its sales during the filing period in 
which the customer provides payment regardless of when the services 
were rendered.  2021SB-01107-R000678-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: RP 	Page 4 	5/10/21 
 
Tax Credit 
The bill establishes a tax credit against the sales tax for ASCs equal 
to the following: 
1. the greater of 50% of the aggregate amount of Medicaid 
payments (a) the ASC received during the applicable reporting 
period for ASC services or (b) that would have been due had 
those services been performed by and at a hospital instead (i.e., 
the “Medicaid investment”); plus 
2. 25% of the aggregate payments received from or on behalf of 
each individual covered under the state employee health plan 
or MEHIP for the provision of ASC services (i.e., the “state 
health plan investment”). 
If the credit amount allowed exceeds the ASC’s sales tax liability for 
the reporting period, the ASC must file a refund claim with DRS in the 
form and manner the DRS commissioner prescribes. After verifying 
the claim, the DRS commissioner must treat the excess as an 
overpayment and refund it to the ASC. DRS must add interest to the 
overpayment at a rate of 0.67% for each month or fraction of a month; 
the accrual period for this interest begins 90 days after DRS receives 
the ASC’s refund claim and runs until the date DRS provides notice 
that the refund is due. 
Under the bill, an ASC that claims this credit and receives a refund 
is entitled to retain it for its own account and is not required to refund 
or pay it to any user or payer for ASC services. 
§ 1 — ASC GROSS RECEIPTS T AX  
The bill terminates the ASC gross receipts tax as of July 1, 2021, and 
makes conforming changes.  
It also allows ASCs to retroactively deduct COVID-19 expenses 
from their gross receipts for purposes of the tax for FY 21 (i.e., for 
calendar quarters from July 1, 2020, to July 1, 2021). Specifically, they 
may deduct any amounts they incurred, directly or indirectly, as a 
result of COVID-19, for the ASC’s personnel, patients, service  2021SB-01107-R000678-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: RP 	Page 5 	5/10/21 
 
providers, visitors, facilities, or tangible personal property. This 
includes amounts for purchasing, leasing, licensing, or using tangible 
or intangible property in connection with COVID-19 tests, protection, 
prevention, or treatment.  
Under the bill, “COVID-19” means the respiratory disease 
designated by the World Health Organization (WHO) on February 11, 
2020, as coronavirus 2019 and any related mutation of it that the WHO 
recognizes as a communicable respiratory disease. 
BACKGROUND 
Related Bill 
sHB 6443, favorably reported by the Finance, Revenue and Bonding 
Committee, contains identical provisions. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 48 Nay 0 (04/22/2021)