Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SR00006 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/11/2021

                    OFFICE OF FISCAL ANALYSIS 
Legislative Office Building, Room 5200 
Hartford, CT 06106  (860) 240-0200 
http://www.cga.ct.gov/ofa 
SR-6 
RESOLUTION PROPOSING APPROVAL OF A MEMORANDUM OF 
AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE STATE OF CONNECTICUT AND 
THE ADMINISTRATIVE & RESIDUAL EMPLOYEES UNION.  
 
Primary Analyst: DC 	3/11/21 
Contributing Analyst(s):    
 
 
 
 
OFA Fiscal Note 
 
State Impact: 
Agency Affected Fund-Effect FY 22 $ FY 23 $ 
State Comptroller - Fringe 
Benefits
1
 
Various - Cost 49,169 53,736 
Various State Agencies Various - Cost 326,210 356,511 
Note: Various=Various; GF=General Fund 
  
Municipal Impact: None  
Explanation 
This resolution proposes approval of an agreement between the 
State of Connecticut and the Administrative and Residual (A&R) 
Employees (P-5) Union concerning certain employee classifications. 
The agreement moves 62 non-union positions into the A&R bargaining 
unit. This agreement covers FY 21 and is retroactive to July 1, 2020. The 
job classifications are: 
 Banking Department Manager 
 Banking Assistant Division Director 
 Chief Property Casualty Insurance Acting RC 
 Director of Unemployment Insurance Field Services & 
Adjudications 
 Insurance Certification Supervising Examiner (Mgr.) 
                                                
1
The fringe benefit costs for most state employees are budgeted centrally in accounts 
administered by the Comptroller. The estimated active employee fringe benefit cost 
associated with most personnel changes is 41.77% of payroll in FY 21 and FY 22.  2021SR-00006-R000043-FN.DOCX 	Page 2 of 4 
 
 
 Insurance Actuary 
 Insurance Program Manager 
 Labor Department Unit Director  
 Transportation Assistant Planning Director 
 Transportation District Maintenance Special Services Section 
Manager 
 
 Transportation Maintenance Manager 
 Transportation Transit Manager 
 Transportation Purchasing and Stores Assistant Director 
 
 
Total estimated costs associated with this agreement are $375,379 in 
FY 21 and annualized at $410,247 as reflected in the table below: 
Cost Estimate
1 
  	FY 21 $  
FY 21 $ 
Annualized 
FY 21 - 3.5% General Wage Increase (GWI) 243,017 243,017 
FY 21 – Annual Increment  	30,300 60,601 
Lump Sum at Top Step 	20,693 20,693 
Longevity 	32,200 32,200 
Total Wages 	326,210 356,511 
     
Social Security, Medicare, and Unemployment 25,709 28,097 
OPEB 3% 	9,792 10,701 
State Employee Retirement System (SERS)
2
 13,668 14,938 
TOTAL 	375,379 410,247 
 
 
1 Source: March 1 roster from CORE-CT.   
2 The SERS impact will not be recognized until FY 23.    
 
Wage Increases - This agreement establishes wage increases 
retroactively for FY 21, employees will receive a cost of living 
adjustment (COLA) of 3.5% retroactive to June 19, 2020, as well as an 
annual increment (AI) of 2 % starting January 1, 2021.  2021SR-00006-R000043-FN.DOCX 	Page 3 of 4 
 
 
These wages are estimated to cost $326,210 in FY 21, annualized at 
$356,511. Longevity payments are retroactive in FY 21 and will cost 
$30,200 in both FY 21 and FY 22. Employees at their top step in the pay 
scale will receive lump sum payments totaling a cumulative $20,693 in 
FY 21. 
Fringe Benefits – Social Security, Medicare, unemployment, and 
retiree health related fringe benefit costs will be incurred based on the 
wage related provisions negotiated in the contract. The current social 
security rate is 7.65% of salary. The current unemployment rate is 
0.23% of salary. The current state contribution towards retiree health is 
3%. The estimated fringe benefit costs are $35,501 in FY 21; annualized 
at  $38,798.  
Impact to Retirement - Employees covered by this contract are 
members of the State Employees' Retirement System (SERS). The 
pension impact of the wage related provisions assumes an average 
normal cost SERS rate of 4.19%. The total estimated retirement cost is 
$13,668 in FY 21, annualized at $14,938. The increased costs to SERS 
will not be recognized in the state's actuarially determined employer 
contributions (ADEC) until FY 23, as the FY 22 contribution is set 
based on the June 30, 2020 actuarial valuation. 
Funding Availability - The Reserve for Salary Adjustments
3
 (RSA) 
account is for collective bargaining costs associated with unsettled 
contracts.  RSA currently has adequate funding to transfer to various 
agencies. Lastly, the provisions of this agreement remain in effect until 
a subsequent agreement is negotiated by the parties. 
Member Overview – There are 62 employees covered by this 
agreement.   
The Out Years 
The agreement will expire effective June 30, 2021. The wage 
provisions of this resolution will remain in effect in future years 
subject to the outcome of the collective bargaining process.  2021SR-00006-R000043-FN.DOCX 	Page 4 of 4 
 
 
3
The RSA account is used to finance collective bargaining and related costs that are not 
included in individual agency budgets.