Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SR00009 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 05/25/2021

                    OFFICE OF FISCAL ANALYSIS 
Legislative Office Building, Room 5200 
Hartford, CT 06106  (860) 240-0200 
http://www.cga.ct.gov/ofa 
SR-9 
RESOLUTION PROPOSING APPROVAL OF A TENTATIVE 
AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE STATE OF CONNECTICUT AND 
THE CONNECTICUT STATE EMPLOYEES ASSOCIATION (P -3B 
BARGAINING UNIT).  
 
Primary Analyst: DC 	5/19/21 
Contributing Analyst(s): CP   
 
 
 
 
OFA Fiscal Note 
 
Agencies Affected 
Fund-
Effect 
FY 21 
$ 
FY 21 
Annualized $ 
DCF, DOC, MHA  	GF - Cost 39,672 50,152 
Comptroller Misc. Accounts (Fringe Benefits) GF - Cost 6,685 8,451 
 
Municipal Impact: None  
Explanation 
The resolution proposes approval of an agreement between the 
State of Connecticut and the Connecticut State Employees Association 
(P-3B) bargaining unit for State School Principals 1 and 2. This 
agreement affects seven employees.  
This agreement would move the Principals in the Departments of 
Correction (DOC), Mental Health and Addiction Services (MHA), and 
Children and Families (DCF) into the Education Professionals (P-3B) 
bargaining unit. This agreement is effective from passage through June 
30, 2021. The estimated impact to FY 21 and the annualized cost is 
reflected in the table below. 
 
 
  2021SR-00009-R000720-FN.DOCX 	Page 2 of 3 
 
 
CT State Employees Association (P-3B) 
 School Principal 1 and School Principal 2
1
 
Components: 
FY 21 
$ 
FY 21 
Annualized 
$ 
     
FY 21 - 3.5% General Wage Increase (GWI) - DCF 7,250 7,529 
FY 21 - 3.5% General Wage Increase (GWI) - DOC 15,193 16,189 
FY 21 - 3.5% General Wage Increase (GWI) - MHA 3,922 4,179 
FY 21 - 2% Annual Increment (AI) - DCF 2,284 4,745 
FY 21 - 2% Annual Increment (AI) - DOC 4,787 9,943 
FY 21 - 2% Annual Increment (AI) - MHA 1,236 2,567 
Longevity 	5,000 5,000 
     
Total Earnings 39,672 50,152 
    
Social Security, Medicare, Unemployment - 8.15% 3,233 4,087 
OPEB - 3% 	1,190 1,505 
SERS - 5.7%
 2
 	2,261 2,859 
     
Total Fringe Benefits 6,685 8,451 
    
TOTAL 46,357 58,602 
  1 
Source: May 7, 2021 Roster from CORE-CT. 
 2 
The SERS impact will not be recognized until FY 23.  
  
Wage Provisions – This agreement establishes wage increases 
where employees will receive a General Wage Increase (GWI) of 3.5%, 
retroactive to June 19, 2020, as well as an Annual Increment (AI) of 2% 
effective January 1, 2021. All employees shall have a January 1
st
  
annual increment date. Longevity will be paid to five employees, $500 
twice a year. 
Fringe Benefits – Social Security, Medicare, unemployment, and 
retiree health related fringe benefit costs will be incurred based on the 
wage related provisions currently in the P-3B contract. The current 
social security rate is 7.65% of salary. The current unemployment rate 
is 0.5% of salary. The current state contribution towards retiree health  2021SR-00009-R000720-FN.DOCX 	Page 3 of 3 
 
 
rate is 3%. The estimated fringe benefit costs to the General Fund is 
$4,423 in FY 21, annualized at $5,592. 
Impact to Retirement - Employees covered by this contract are 
members of the State Employees' Retirement System (SERS) plan. The 
pension impact of the wage related provisions assumes an average 
normal cost SERS rate of 5.7%. The total estimated retirement cost is 
$2,261 in FY 21, annualized at $2,859. The increased costs to SERS will 
not be recognized in the state's actuarially determined employer 
contributions (ADEC) until FY 23, as the FY 21 contribution is based on 
the June 30, 2019 actuarial valuation. 
Funding Availability – The DOC, MHA, and DCF agencies did not 
include funding for this contract in their FY 20 - FY 21 budget request. 
The Reserve for Salary Adjustments (RSA)
3
 General Fund account for 
collective bargaining costs associated with unsettled contracts 
currently has adequate funding to transfer to DOC, MHA, and DCF. 
Lastly, the provisions of this agreement remain in effect until a 
subsequent agreement is negotiated by the parties. 
Member Overview – There are 7 employees currently classified as 
State School Principals (SSP) 1 and 2 who would join the P-3B union. 
The employees will remain in their existing range plans, but they will 
be retitled SSP in lieu of MP through at least the end of any successor 
agreement to the 2016-21 P-3B contract. The agreement will expire on 
June 30, 2021.  
The Out Years 
The impact of the provisions of this resolution will remain in effect 
in future years subject to the outcome of the collective bargaining 
process. 
3 The RSA account is used to finance collective bargaining and related costs that are not included in 
individual agency budgets. 
 
 
 
 
Sources: Core-CT Financial Accounting System