Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05155 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/30/2022

                     
Researcher: MK 	Page 1 	3/30/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5155  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE SAFE STORAGE AND DISPOSAL OF 
OPIOID DRUGS, CANNABIS AND CANNABIS PRODUCTS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Department of Consumer Protection (DCP), by 
December 1, 2022, and in consultation with the Department of Mental 
Health and Addiction Services (DMHAS), to do the following: 
1. develop and distribute documents on the safe storage and 
disposal of opioid drugs, cannabis, and cannabis products and 
2. develop similar short statements for publication on opioid 
prescription packaging and consumer cannabis and cannabis 
product receipts.  
Additionally, starting January 1, 2023, the bill requires (1) 
pharmacists to include DCP’s short statement on opioid prescription 
drug packaging and (2) the DCP commissioner to issue policies and 
procedures requiring cannabis retailers, excluding dispensaries, and 
hybrid retailers (i.e., retailers licensed to buy and sell cannabis and 
medical marijuana products) to do the same on consumer receipts. The 
statements must be placed in a conspicuous location and displayed in 
all capital letters in at least twelve-point boldface type. 
Lastly, the bill requires pharmacists and cannabis retailers and hybrid 
retailers, by January 1, 2023, to post a sign in a conspicuous place on 
their premises, notifying consumers that they may visit DCP’s website 
for information concerning the department’s respective safe storage and 
disposal documents. The signs must be at least eight inches by ten inches 
in size.  
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2022  2022HB-05155-R000195-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MK 	Page 2 	3/30/22 
 
DCP’S SAFE STORAGE DOCUMENTS AND STATEMENTS 
Safe Storage and Disposal Documents 
By December 1, 2022, the bill requires DCP to develop, in consultation 
with DMHAS, documents concerning consumers’ safe storage and 
disposal of opioid drugs, cannabis, and cannabis products that include 
information on:  
1. best practices for (a) safely storing these drugs and products in a 
manner that makes them inaccessible to children and (b) 
disposing of the unused and expired ones and  
2. the risk of illness and death associated with children’s ingestion 
of these drugs and products.  
The bill requires the DCP commissioner to post the documents on the 
DCP website by December 15, 2022. 
Short Statements for Publication 
Also by December 1, 2022, the bill requires DCP, in consultation with 
DMHAS, to develop short statements for publication on consumer (1) 
packaging for opioid drug prescriptions and (2) receipts for cannabis 
and cannabis products. 
Under the bill, each statement must: 
1. alert consumers of the need to safely store and dispose of opioid 
drugs or cannabis and cannabis products, and the risk of illness 
and death associated with their ingestion by children; and 
2. provide DCP’s website address, where the safe storage and 
disposal document described above is located.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Committee on Children 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 13 Nay 0 (03/15/2022)